Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:15-bk-10277

New Jersey Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Vincent F Papalia
Case #: 2:17-ap-01020
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Jan 06, 2017
Terminated:Jul 26, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
Bell Medical Services Inc
120 Vanderburg Road
Marlboro, NJ 07746
Represented By
Bell Medical Services Inc
contact info
Plaintiff
Neighborhood Health Services Corporation
1700-58 Myrtle Avenue
Plainfield, NJ 07063
Represented By
Donald F. Campbell, Jr.
Giordano Halleran & Ciesla, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/21/2025 1:08 PM EDT
Wednesday, July 26, 2017
utility Close Adversary Case Wed 07/26 10:10 AM
Adversary Case (2:17-ap-1020) Closed. (clb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 22, 2017
court Hearing Withdrawn (Document) Tue 06/27 3:12 PM
Pre Trial Hearing Withdrawn, Notice of Propposed Settlement filed Related [+] (jf)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Thursday, May 25, 2017
7 7 court Certification of No Objection Thu 05/25 11:12 AM
Certification of No Objection in re: Settlement of Controversy. Related [+]. The Clerk hereby certifies that no objection to this Notice of Information has been filed. (rh)
Related: [-] 5 Notice of Proposed Compromise or Settlement of Controversy re: Settlement Agreement. Hearing scheduled for 05/31/2017 10:00am. Filed by Donald F. Campbell Jr. on behalf of Neighborhood Health Services Corporation. Objections due by 05/24/2017. filed by Plaintiff Neighborhood Health Services Corporation
Thursday, May 11, 2017
court Hearing Rescheduled (Document) Thu 05/11 4:00 PM
Hearing Rescheduled from 5/11/2017 Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 06/22/2017 at 10:00 AM at VFP - Courtroom 3B, Newark. (mcp)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Friday, May 05, 2017
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Notice (generic) Sat 05/06 12:38 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 05/05/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 03, 2017
5 5 misc Notice of Proposed Compromise or Settlement of Controversy Wed 05/03 2:16 PM
Notice of Proposed Compromise or Settlement of Controversy re: Settlement Agreement. Hearing scheduled for 05/31/2017 10:00am. Filed by Donald F. Campbell Jr. on behalf of Neighborhood Health Services Corporation. Objections due by 05/24/2017. (Campbell, Donald)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 27, 2017
4 4 court Determination of Adjournment Request Thu 04/27 5:29 PM
Determination of Adjournment Request Granted. Hearing will be adjourned to 5/11/2017 at 10:00 AM. . Related [+] (mcp)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
court Hearing Rescheduled (Document) Thu 04/27 5:30 PM
Hearing Rescheduled from 4/27/2017 Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 05/11/2017 at 11:00 PM at VFP - Courtroom 3B, Newark. (mcp)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
court Hearing Rescheduled (Document) Thu 04/27 5:32 PM
Hearing Rescheduled from 5/11/17 at 11:00 PM Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 05/11/2017 at 10:00 AM at VFP - Courtroom 3B, Newark. (mcp)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Wednesday, March 22, 2017
court Hearing Rescheduled (Document) Wed 03/22 2:28 PM
Hearing Rescheduled from 3/23/2017 Related [+] Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 04/27/2017 at 10:00 AM at VFP - Courtroom 3B, Newark. (jf )
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Monday, February 13, 2017
3 3 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 02/13 1:54 PM
Answer to Complaint filed by Joshua S. Bauchner on behalf of Bell Medical Services Inc. (Bauchner, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 10, 2017
crditcrd Credit Card/Debit Card Receipt Tue 01/10 10:51 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint([LINK 17-01020 VFP] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A33392507, fee amount $ 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
Monday, January 09, 2017
2 2 court Summons Issued Mon 01/09 3:31 PM
Summons Issued to Neighborhood Health Services Corporation for Service on Bell Medical Services Inc Answer due on 2/8/2017 Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 3/23/2017 at 10:00 AM at VFP - Courtroom 3B, Newark. (rh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Pre Trial Instructions
Friday, January 06, 2017
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 01/06 4:50 PM
Adversary case 17-01020 Complaint by Neighborhood Health Services Corporation against Bell Medical Services Inc. Fee Amount $ 350.. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (Campbell, Donald)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Ex A
Att: 2 Summons