New Jersey Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Vincent F Papalia
Case #: 2:15-bk-10277
Case Filed:Jan 07, 2015
Creditor Meeting:Feb 11, 2015
Claims Deadline:May 12, 2015
Terminated:May 11, 2020
Plan Confirmed:Nov 12, 2019

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors200-999
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Health Care Business

Debtor
Neighborhood Health Services Corporation
1700 Myrtle Ave # 58
Plainfield, NJ 07063-1000
Represented By
Donald F. Campbell, Jr.
Giordano Halleran & Ciesla, P.C.
contact info
Afiyfa Ellington
Giordano, Halleran & Ciesla, PC
contact info
Last checked: never
Creditor Committee
Official Committee for Unsecured Creditors, Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
Represented By
Kelsi J Hunt
Brinkman Portillo Ronk, Apc
contact info
Laura Portillo
Brinkman Portillo Ronk, Apc
contact info
Daren R. Brinkman
Brinkman Portillo Ronk, Apc
contact info
Brinkman Portillo Ronk, APC
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee One Newark Center Suite 2100
Newark, NJ 07102

GPO Oct 18 2018
Order Scheduling Case Management Conference (related document:1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Filed by Donald F. Campbell Jr. on behalf of Neighborhood Health Services Corporation). The Court will conduct a Case Management Conference in this case on November 14, 2018 at 2:30 p.m. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 10/18/2018. (jf)

Docket last updated: 1 minutes ago
Tuesday, November 16, 2021
709 709 misc Substitution of Attorney Tue 11/16 2:42 PM
Substitution of Attorney, terminating Denise A Kuhn and adding Carol E. Momjian for Commonwealth of PA - Dept. of Revenue. Filed by Carol E. Momjian on behalf of Commonwealth of PA - Dept. of Revenue. (Momjian, Carol)
Related: [-]