Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-10527

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Mary F Walrath
Case #: 1:17-ap-50006
Nature of Suit11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
Case Filed:Jan 17, 2017
Terminated:Mar 22, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
Simon MacGibbon
Represented By
Simon MacGibbon
contact info
Plaintiff
TSA Stores, Inc.
1050 West Hampden Avenue
Englewood, CO 80110
Represented By
Michael S. Neiburg
Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Wednesday, March 22, 2017
court Close Adversary Case Wed 03/22 7:28 AM
Adversary Case 1:17-ap-50006 Closed (LAM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 21, 2017
12 12 notice Dismissal - Notice Tue 03/21 2:06 PM
Notice of Dismissal Filed by TSA Stores, Inc. (Neiburg, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 15, 2017
11 11 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED) - Notice Wed 03/15 11:49 AM
Amended HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Filed by TSAWD Holdings, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 3/16/2017 at 03:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Magaziner, Andrew)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi) Wed 03/15 9:44 AM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by TSAWD Holdings, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 3/16/2017 at 03:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Magaziner, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Sunday, February 26, 2017
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Mon 02/27 1:08 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 02/26/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Mon 02/27 1:08 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 02/26/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6
Friday, February 24, 2017
7 7 1 pgs misc Transcript Fri 02/24 11:17 AM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held 2/23/2017 Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 5/25/2017. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Office. [For information about how to contact the transcriber, call the Clerk's Office] or [Contact the Court Reporter/Transcriber Reliable, Telephone number (302) 654-8080.] . Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 3/3/2017. Redaction Request Due By 3/17/2017. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 3/27/2017. Transcript access will be restricted through 5/25/2017. (AJL)
Related: [-]
6 6 1 pgs misc Transcript Fri 02/24 11:15 AM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held 2/23/2017 RE: Omnibus. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 5/25/2017. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Office. [For information about how to contact the transcriber, call the Clerk's Office] or [Contact the Court Reporter/Transcriber Reliable, Telephone number (302)654-8080.] Related [+]. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 3/3/2017. Redaction Request Due By 3/17/2017. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 3/27/2017. Transcript access will be restricted through 5/25/2017. (BJM)
Related: [-] 5
Tuesday, February 21, 2017
5 5 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi) Tue 02/21 12:15 PM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by TSAWD Holdings, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 2/23/2017 at 11:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Magaziner, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 27, 2017
4 4 misc Affidavit/Declaration of Service Fri 01/27 1:49 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Service Regarding (1) Complaint, and (2) Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Related [+] Filed by TSA Stores, Inc.. (Neiburg, Michael)
Related: [-] 1 ,2
Wednesday, January 18, 2017
3 3 crditcrd none Wed 01/18 3:59 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 17-50006 MFW) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 8309733, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 17, 2017
2 2 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Tue 01/17 4:35 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Simon MacGibbon. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 2/23/2017 at 11:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 3/20/2017. (Neiburg, Michael)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Tue 01/17 4:24 PM
Adversary case 17-50006 Complaint by TSA Stores, Inc., against Simon MacGibbon. Fee Amount $350 (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)). AP Summons Served due date: 04/17/2017. (Neiburg, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A