Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-10527

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Mary F Walrath
Case #: 1:17-ap-50007
Nature of Suit11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
Case Filed:Jan 17, 2017
Terminated:Jan 18, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
Jeff Schumacher
Represented By
Jeff Schumacher
contact info
Plaintiff
TSA Stores, Inc.
1050 West Hampden Avenue
Englewood, CO 80110
Represented By
Michael S. Neiburg
Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Thursday, January 18, 2018
court Close Adversary Case Thu 01/18 9:20 AM
Adversary Case 1:17-ap-50007 Closed (LAM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 10, 2017
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 05/11 1:14 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 05/10/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14
Tuesday, May 09, 2017
15 15 order Order Tue 05/09 8:46 AM
Order Approving the Settlement Agreement by and Among TSA Stores, Inc. and Jeff Schumacher Related [+] Order Signed on 5/8/2017. (LAM)
Related: [-] 10
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Att: 2 Exhibit A
Monday, May 08, 2017
14 14 21 pgs misc Transcript Mon 05/08 1:56 PM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held 4/25/2017 RE: Omnibus. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 8/7/2017. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Office. [For information about how to contact the transcriber, call the Clerk's Office] or [Contact the Court Reporter/Transcriber Reliable, Telephone number (302)654-8080.] Related [+]. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 5/15/2017. Redaction Request Due By 5/30/2017. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 6/8/2017. Transcript access will be restricted through 8/7/2017. (BJM)
Related: [-] 12
Friday, May 05, 2017
13 13 misc Certificate of No Objection(Aty) Fri 05/05 4:15 PM
Certificate of No Objection Regarding Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019 Approving the Settlement Agreement By and Among TSA Stores, Inc. and Jeff Schumacher Related [+] Filed by TSA Stores, Inc.. (Magaziner, Andrew)
Related: [-] 10
Monday, April 24, 2017
12 12 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi) Mon 04/24 2:25 PM
Amended Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by TSAWD Holdings, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 4/25/2017 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Magaziner, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 21, 2017
11 11 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi) Fri 04/21 11:59 AM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by TSAWD Holdings, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 4/25/2017 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Magaziner, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 20, 2017
10 10 motion Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019 - Motion Thu 04/20 6:28 PM
Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019 Approving the Settlement Agreement By and Among TSA Stores, Inc. and Jeff Schumacher Filed by TSA Stores, Inc., TSAWD Holdings, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 5/23/2017 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 5/4/2017. (Magaziner, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 10, 2017
9 9 order Order Mon 04/10 2:27 PM
Order Approving Stipulation Further Extending Time For Defendant To Answer Or Respond To Complaint. Related [+] Order Signed on 4/10/2017. (BJM)
Related: [-] 8
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Friday, April 07, 2017
8 8 misc Certification of Counsel(Adv) Fri 04/07 2:37 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Stipulation Further Extending Time for Defendant to Answer or Respond to Complaint Filed by TSA Stores, Inc.. (Neiburg, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Tuesday, April 04, 2017
7 7 order Order Tue 04/04 2:50 PM
Order Approving Stipulation Further Extending Time for Defendant to Answer or Respond to Complaint. Related [+] Order Signed on 4/4/2017. (LCN) Modified Text on 4/5/2017 (LB)
Related: [-] 5 ,6
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Thursday, March 30, 2017
6 6 misc Certification of Counsel(Adv) Thu 03/30 4:28 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Stipulation Further Extending Time for Defendant to Answer or Respond to Complaint Filed by TSA Stores, Inc.. (Neiburg, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Wednesday, March 22, 2017
5 5 motion Stipulation Wed 03/22 4:16 PM
Stipulation Between TSA Stores, Inc. and Defendant Jeff Schumacher Extending Time to Answer or Respond to Complaint . Filed by TSA Stores, Inc.. (Neiburg, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 10, 2017
4 4 cmp Amended Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Fri 02/10 2:26 PM
Amended Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Jeff Schumacher. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 4/25/2017 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 4/11/2017. (Neiburg, Michael)
Related: [-] ument1 ,2
Att: 1 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, January 18, 2017
3 3 crditcrd none Wed 01/18 3:59 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 17-50007 MFW) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 8309733, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 17, 2017
2 2 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Tue 01/17 4:45 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Jeff Schumacher. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 2/23/2017 at 11:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 3/20/2017. (Neiburg, Michael)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Tue 01/17 4:42 PM
Adversary case 17-50007 Complaint by TSA Stores, Inc., against Jeff Schumacher. Fee Amount $350 (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)). AP Summons Served due date: 04/17/2017. (Neiburg, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A