Illinois Northern District Court
Judge:Milton I Shadur
Case #: 1:17-cv-00417
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Jan 19, 2017
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 18, 2017 4:11 AM CDT
Defendant
As-Yet Unknown Current or Former Employees of the City of Chicago
Defendant
Michael Baker
Represented By
Avi T. Kamionski
Nathan & Kamionski LLP
contact info
Shneur Z. Nathan
Nathan & Kamionski LLP
contact info
Mohammed Khan
Hale Law, LLC
contact info
Alexander Walter Tapling
Hale Law LLC
contact info
Andrew M. Hale
Hale Law LLC
contact info
Amy A. Hijjawi
Hale Law LLC
contact info
Defendant
City Of Chicago
Represented By
Elizabeth Susan Ralph
Greenberg Traurig LLP
contact info
John F. Gibbons
Greenberg Traurig, Llp.
contact info
Elan Arthur Shpigel
Greenberg Traurig, LLP
contact info
Tiffany S. Fordyce
Greenberg Traurig, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Edward Hicks
Defendant
Michael Kill
Represented By
George E. Becker
George E. Becker Esq.
contact info
Defendant
James Oliver
Represented By
Avi T. Kamionski
Nathan & Kamionski LLP
contact info
Shneur Z. Nathan
Nathan & Kamionski LLP
contact info
Mohammed Khan
Hale Law, LLC
contact info
Alexander Walter Tapling
Hale Law LLC
contact info
Andrew M. Hale
Hale Law LLC
contact info
Amy A. Hijjawi
Hale Law LLC
contact info
Defendant
Angelo Pesavento
Represented By
Avi T. Kamionski
Nathan & Kamionski LLP
contact info
Shneur Z. Nathan
Nathan & Kamionski LLP
contact info
Mohammed Khan
Hale Law, LLC
contact info
Alexander Walter Tapling
Hale Law LLC
contact info
Andrew M. Hale
Hale Law LLC
contact info
Amy A. Hijjawi
Hale Law LLC
contact info
Defendant
Edward Siwek
Represented By
Avi T. Kamionski
Nathan & Kamionski LLP
contact info
Shneur Z. Nathan
Nathan & Kamionski LLP
contact info
Mohammed Khan
Hale Law, LLC
contact info
Alexander Walter Tapling
Hale Law LLC
contact info
Andrew M. Hale
Hale Law LLC
contact info
Amy A. Hijjawi
Hale Law LLC
contact info
Defendant
Barbara Temple
Represented By
Avi T. Kamionski
Nathan & Kamionski LLP
contact info
Shneur Z. Nathan
Nathan & Kamionski LLP
contact info
Mohammed Khan
Hale Law, LLC
contact info
Alexander Walter Tapling
Hale Law LLC
contact info
Andrew M. Hale
Hale Law LLC
contact info
Amy A. Hijjawi
Hale Law LLC
contact info
Defendant
Joseph Barnes
Represented By
Avi T. Kamionski
Nathan & Kamionski LLP
contact info
Shneur Z. Nathan
Nathan & Kamionski LLP
contact info
Mohammed Khan
Hale Law, LLC
contact info
Alexander Walter Tapling
Hale Law LLC
contact info
Andrew M. Hale
Hale Law LLC
contact info
Amy A. Hijjawi
Hale Law LLC
contact info
Defendant
Michael Rowan
Represented By
Avi T. Kamionski
Nathan & Kamionski LLP
contact info
Shneur Z. Nathan
Nathan & Kamionski LLP
contact info
Mohammed Khan
Hale Law, LLC
contact info
Alexander Walter Tapling
Hale Law LLC
contact info
Andrew M. Hale
Hale Law LLC
contact info
Amy A. Hijjawi
Hale Law LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Eddie L. Bolden
Represented By
Ronald S. Safer
Riley Safer Holmes & Cancila LLP
contact info
Valarie Hays
Riley Safer Holmes & Cancila LLP
contact info
Sandra Lynn Musumeci
Riley Safer Holmes & Cancila LLP
contact info
Eli Joseph Litoff
Riley Safer Holmes & Cancila LLP
contact info
Nathan James Howze
Riley Safer Holmes & Cancila LLP
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
George Karl
Terminated: 03/14/2017
Defendant
William Higgins
Terminated: 04/19/2017
Defendant
Personal Representative of the Estate of George Karl
Terminated: 04/19/2017

GPO Mar 15 2017
MEMORANDUM Order Signed by the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 3/15/2017:Mailed notice(jms, )
GPO May 19 2017
MOTION by Defendant City Of Chicago for judgment - Motion for Entry of Guaranty of Satisfaction of Judgment (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Shpigel, Elan)
GPO Aug 02 2017
the Honorable Milton I. Shadur on 8/2/2017:Mailed notice(clw, ) MEMORANDUM Order: For the reasons stated in this memorandum order, codefendant City of Chicago's Motion To Bifurcate Plaintiff's Monell Claims" (Dkt. No. 95), later joined in by other defendants in Dkt. No. 99 are denied. Signed by
GPO Dec 12 2017
MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order. Signed by the Honorable Manish S. Shah on 12/12/2017: The defendant officers' motion to dismiss 57 is granted in part and denied in part. Count I is dismissed as to the Brady claim for destruction of the 911 call recording and as to the separate due process claim for failure to investigate. Count VI is dismissed to the extent it is based on the Fourteenth Amendment. The City of Chicago's motion to dismiss 61 is denied. [For further detail see attached order.] Notices mailed. (psm, )
GPO Aug 09 2019
MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Manish S. Shah on 8/9/19.Mailed notice(ca, )
GPO Aug 25 2022
MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Steven C. Seeger on 8/25/2022. Mailed notice. (jjr, )
GPO Oct 28 2022
MOTION by Defendants George Karl, James Oliver, Angelo Pesavento, Edward J. Siwek for judgment Defendants' Joint Rule 50(b) Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law (Stefanich, Brian)


Create an account to get the full docket for this case.