Original Case: 1:17-cv-00417

Seventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:24-cv-01674
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Apr 23, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 24, 2024 4:13 AM CDT
Defendant - Appellant
ANGELO PESAVENTO
Represented By
Julian Nunes Henriques Jr.
CITY OF CHICAGO LAW DEPARTMENT
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
JAMES OLIVER
Represented By
Julian Nunes Henriques Jr.
CITY OF CHICAGO LAW DEPARTMENT
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
ESTATE OF EDWARD SIWEK
Represented By
Julian Nunes Henriques Jr.
CITY OF CHICAGO LAW DEPARTMENT
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
ESTATE OF GEORGE KARL
Represented By
Julian Nunes Henriques Jr.
CITY OF CHICAGO LAW DEPARTMENT
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
CITY OF CHICAGO
Represented By
Julian Nunes Henriques Jr.
CITY OF CHICAGO LAW DEPARTMENT
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
EDDIE L. BOLDEN
Represented By
Eli J. Litoff
RILEY SAFER HOLMES & CANCILA LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 3:16 AM CDT
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
1 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing Statement due for Appellants City of Chicago, Estate of Edward Siwek, Estate of George Karl, James Oliver and Angelo Pesavento by 04/29/2024. Transcript information sheet due by 05/07/2024. Appellants' briefs due on or before 06/03/2024 for City of Chicago, Estate of Edward Siwek, Estate of George Karl, James Oliver and Angelo Pesavento. [1] [7378105] 24-1674 (PS) [Entered: 04/23/2024 12:49 PM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 169 pgs Civil Case
Att: 2 3 pgs Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing
Att: 3 1 pgs Notice to District Court
2 2 1 pgs ORDER: A review of the short record reveals that this appeal involves more than one appellant represented by different counsel. Counsel for appellants are encouraged to file a joint brief and appendix or adopt parts of a co-appellant's brief. The parties are reminded that redundant and uncoordinated briefing will be stricken. See United States v. Torres, 170 F.3d 749 (7th Cir. 1999); United States v. Ashman, 964 F.2d 596 (7th Cir. 1992). DW [7378115] [2] [7378115] 24-1674 (PS) [Entered: 04/23/2024 12:59 PM]
Related: [-]
3 3 2 pgs Appearance form filed by Attorney Julian N. Henriques, Jr. for Appellants City of Chicago, Estate of Edward Siwek, Estate of George Karl, James Oliver and Angelo Pesavento. [3] [7378151] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-Yes) 24-1674 -[Edited 04/23/2024 by ER - Terminated Attorneys Tiffany S. Fordyce and Brian John Stefanich. Added Attorney Julian N. Henriques, Jr.] (Henriques, Julian) [Entered: 04/23/2024 02:36 PM]
Related: [-]