Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-10527

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Mary F Walrath
Case #: 1:17-ap-50012
Nature of Suit11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
Case Filed:Jan 23, 2017
Terminated:Jan 27, 2021
Last checked: never
Defendant
WYNIT Distribution, LLC
Represented By
WYNIT Distribution, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
TSA Stores, Inc.
1050 West Hampden Avenue
Englewood, CO 80110
Represented By
Michael S. Neiburg
Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Wednesday, January 27, 2021
32 32 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 01/27 2:01 PM
Stipulation of Dismissal Filed by TSA Stores, Inc.. (Magaziner, Andrew)
Related: [-]
31 31 notice Withdrawal - Notice Wed 01/27 9:35 AM
Notice of Withdrawal of Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Related [+] Filed by TSA Stores, Inc. (Magaziner, Andrew)
Related: [-] 30
utility Reopen AP Case Wed 01/27 9:07 AM
Adversary Case Reopened. Notice of Dismissal should be withdrawn and Stipulation of Dismissal should be filed. (LAM)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Thu 01/28 7:06 AM
Adversary Case 1:17-ap-50012 Closed (LAM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 26, 2021
30 30 notice Dismissal - Notice Tue 01/26 3:29 PM
Notice of Dismissal Filed by TSA Stores, Inc. (Magaziner, Andrew)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Wed 01/27 7:43 AM
Adversary Case 1:17-ap-50012 Closed (LAM)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 01, 2021
29 29 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 01/02 12:51 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 01/01/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 28
Wednesday, December 30, 2020
28 28 court VAN-492 Order Requiring Status Report - Trustee Wed 12/30 9:59 AM
Order Requiring Status Report Tickle due by: 1/20/2021. (LAM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 13, 2018
27 27 mediation Mediator's Certificate of Completion Thu 12/13 12:54 PM
Mediator's Certificate of Completion (Bifferato, Ian)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 12, 2018
26 26 court Mediator Report Past Due Wed 12/12 11:00 PM
Mediator Report Past Due (ADI)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 05, 2018
25 25 court Mediator Report Past Due Wed 12/05 11:00 PM
Mediator Report Past Due (ADI)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 29, 2018
24 24 mediation Mediation Status Report Tue 05/29 5:03 PM
Mediation Status Report (Bifferato, Ian)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 07, 2018
23 23 misc Suggestion of Bankruptcy - Adversary Wed 02/07 11:12 PM
Suggestion of Bankruptcy Filed by WYNIT Distribution, LLC. (Hauswirth, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 09, 2017
22 22 order Scheduling Order Wed 08/09 2:08 PM
First Amended Scheduling Order Related [+] Order Signed on 8/9/2017. (LMD)
Related: [-] 11 ,21
Tuesday, August 08, 2017
21 21 misc Certification of Counsel(Adv) Tue 08/08 3:47 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Agreed First Amended Scheduling Order Related [+] Filed by TSA Stores, Inc.. (Neiburg, Michael)
Related: [-] 11
Sunday, July 16, 2017
20 20 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Mon 07/17 1:03 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 07/16/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 18
Friday, July 14, 2017
19 19 mediation Conflict Review Fri 07/14 9:15 AM
Conflict Review Pursuant to Local Rule 9019-2(e)(iii)(B) (Bifferato, Ian)
Related: [-]
18 18 court Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation (Alternate) Fri 07/14 7:42 AM
Order Assigning Adversary Proceeding to Mediation. Ian Connor Bifferato is Appointed as the Mediator in this Adversary Proceeding. Mediation Report due by 9/12/2017. Signed on 7/14/2017. (LAM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 13, 2017
17 17 misc Stipulation Regarding Appointment of Mediator Thu 07/13 5:13 PM
Stipulation Regarding Appointment of Mediator Ian Connor Bifferato, Esq. Between TSA Stores, Inc. and WYNIT Distribution, LLC . Filed by TSA Stores, Inc., WYNIT Distribution, LLC. (Neiburg, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 19, 2017
16 16 notice Service of Discovery - Notice Mon 06/19 11:30 PM
Notice of Service of Discovery Defendant's Objections and Responses To Plaintiff's First Combined Discovery Requests Filed by WYNIT Distribution, LLC (Hauswirth, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 19, 2017
15 15 notice Service of Discovery - Notice Fri 05/19 3:58 PM
Notice of Service of Discovery - Plaintiff's First Combined Discovery Requests Filed by TSA Stores, Inc. (Neiburg, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 10, 2017
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 05/11 1:14 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 05/10/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13
Monday, May 08, 2017
13 13 21 pgs misc Transcript Mon 05/08 1:52 PM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held 4/25/2017 RE: Omnibus. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 8/7/2017. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Office. [For information about how to contact the transcriber, call the Clerk's Office] or [Contact the Court Reporter/Transcriber Reliable, Telephone number (302)654-8080.] Related [+]. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 5/15/2017. Redaction Request Due By 5/30/2017. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 6/8/2017. Transcript access will be restricted through 8/7/2017. (BJM)
Related: [-] 10
Friday, May 05, 2017
12 12 notice Service of Discovery - Notice Fri 05/05 2:48 PM
Notice of Service of Discovery of Plaintiffs Initial Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) Disclosures Filed by TSA Stores, Inc. (Neiburg, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 24, 2017
11 11 order Scheduling Order Mon 04/24 2:47 PM
Agreed Scheduling Order Related [+] Signed on 4/24/2017. (LMD)
Related: [-] 8
10 10 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi) Mon 04/24 2:25 PM
Amended Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by TSAWD Holdings, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 4/25/2017 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Magaziner, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 21, 2017
9 9 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi) Fri 04/21 11:59 AM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by TSAWD Holdings, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 4/25/2017 at 10:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Magaziner, Andrew)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Certification of Counsel for Approval of Proposed Scheduling Order Fri 04/21 10:35 AM
Certification of Counsel for Approval of Proposed Scheduling Order Filed by TSA Stores, Inc.. (Neiburg, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Wednesday, March 15, 2017
7 7 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED) - Notice Wed 03/15 11:49 AM
Amended HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Filed by TSAWD Holdings, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 3/16/2017 at 03:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Magaziner, Andrew)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi) Wed 03/15 9:44 AM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by TSAWD Holdings, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 3/16/2017 at 03:00 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Magaziner, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 22, 2017
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 02/22 7:03 PM
Answer to Complaint Related [+] Filed by WYNIT Distribution, LLC Mediation due date: 06/22/2017. (Hauswirth, Gregory)
Related: [-] 1 ,2
Wednesday, February 01, 2017
4 4 misc Affidavit/Declaration of Service Wed 02/01 10:33 AM
Affidavit/Declaration of Service Regarding (1) Complaint, and (2) Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Related [+] Filed by TSA Stores, Inc.. (Neiburg, Michael)
Related: [-] 1 ,2
Monday, January 23, 2017
3 3 crditcrd none Mon 01/23 5:58 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 17-50012 MFW) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 8314960, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Mon 01/23 5:57 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant WYNIT Distribution, LLC. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 3/16/2017 at 11:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 3/24/2017. (Neiburg, Michael)
Related: [-] ument1
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Mon 01/23 5:47 PM
Adversary case 17-50012 Complaint by TSA Stores, Inc. against WYNIT Distribution, LLC. Fee Amount $350 (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)). AP Summons Served due date: 04/24/2017. (Neiburg, Michael)
Related: [-]