Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:16-bk-31239

Kentucky Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Joan A Lloyd
Case #: 3:17-ap-03006
Nature of Suit11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
Case Filed:Jan 24, 2017
Terminated:Oct 13, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
AFL Network Services Inc.
Represented By
AFL Network Services Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Michael E Wheatley
Represented By
Neil Charles Bordy
Seiller Waterman LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Friday, October 13, 2017
court Close Case -AP Fri 10/13 8:42 AM
Case Closed. (Pierce, M)
Related: [-]
Saturday, September 30, 2017
34 34 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Notice Request Sun 10/01 12:59 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice Request Related [+]. Notice Date 09/30/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 33 Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (Related Doc32 ) Entered on 9/28/2017.
Thursday, September 28, 2017
33 33 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Thu 09/28 1:32 PM
Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Related [+] Entered on 9/28/2017. (Preston, T)
Related: [-] 32
Tuesday, September 26, 2017
32 32 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Tue 09/26 3:04 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding . Filed by Plaintiff Michael E Wheatley (Bordy, Neil)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, August 28, 2017
31 31 order Settlement Agreement Mon 08/28 2:52 PM
Order Granting Motion for Settlement Agreement. The Trustee shall dismiss the AP upon payment of the funds. Related [+] Entered on 8/28/2017. (Preston, T)
Related: [-] 26
Thursday, August 03, 2017
30 30 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice for Objections Fri 08/04 1:18 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice for Objections Related [+]. Notice Date 08/03/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 29 Notice for Objections regarding (related document(s)26 Motion to Approve Settlement Agreement filed by Counter-Defendant Michael E Wheatley, Plaintiff Michael E Wheatley). Objections due by 8/22/2017. Any objection must be typewritten and in proper pleading form as required by Federal and Local Rules.
Tuesday, August 01, 2017
29 29 notice Objections Tue 08/01 7:50 AM
Notice for Objections regarding Related [+]. Objections due by 8/22/2017. Any objection must be typewritten and in proper pleading form as required by Federal and Local Rules. (Pierce, M)
Related: [-] 26 Motion to Approve Settlement Agreement filed by Counter-Defendant Michael E Wheatley, Plaintiff Michael E Wheatley
Monday, July 31, 2017
28 28 misc Proposed Order Mon 07/31 9:22 AM
Proposed Order RE: Related [+]. Filed by Michael E Wheatley (Bordy, Neil)
Related: [-] 26 Motion to Approve Settlement Agreement filed by Counter-Defendant Michael E Wheatley, Plaintiff Michael E Wheatley
27 27 court Notice of Deficiency-No Proposed Order Filed Mon 07/31 7:01 AM
Notice of Deficiency regarding failure to provide a proposed order in compliance with Local Rules. Order should be filed using the event Proposed Order located under the Miscellaneous category and should be properly linked to the related motion. Motion may be denied upon failure to comply with this notice Related [+]. Compliance due by 8/10/2017. (Preston, T)
Related: [-] 26 Motion to Approve Settlement Agreement filed by Counter-Defendant Michael E Wheatley, Plaintiff Michael E Wheatley
Friday, July 28, 2017
26 26 motion Approve Settlement Fri 07/28 2:29 PM
Motion to Approve Settlement Agreement . Filed by Plaintiff Michael E Wheatley (Bordy, Neil)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Saturday, July 15, 2017
25 25 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Notice Request Sun 07/16 12:58 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice Request Related [+]. Notice Date 07/15/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 24 Order of the Court to continue the Telephonic Pre-Trial Conference held on 7/13/20171 , so ORDERED by /s/ Judge Lloyd. Telephonic Pre-Trial Conference CONTINUED to 8/31/2017 at 10:00 AM (Eastern Time). (Graham, S) This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.
Thursday, July 13, 2017
24 24 vorder Set/Continue/Reschedule -Hearing Thu 07/13 10:45 AM
Order of the Court to continue the Telephonic Pre-Trial Conference held on 7/13/20171 , so ORDERED by /s/ Judge Lloyd. Telephonic Pre-Trial Conference CONTINUED to 8/31/2017 at 10:00 AM (Eastern Time). (Graham, S)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 20, 2017
23 23 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Tue 06/20 10:57 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Glenn A. Cohen . Filed by on behalf of Michael E Wheatley (Cohen, Glenn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 14, 2017
22 22 misc Notice of Deposition Wed 06/14 5:18 PM
Amended Notice to Take Deposition of Stephen Cerniglia. Filed by Michael E Wheatley (Bordy, Neil) Modified on 6/15/2017 (Smithson, M)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Subpoena to Testify at a Deposition
Tuesday, June 13, 2017
21 21 misc Document (Generic) Tue 06/13 11:04 AM
Document: Notice of Cancellation of Deposition Related [+]. Filed by Michael E Wheatley (Bordy, Neil)
Related: [-] 20 Notice of Deposition filed by Counter-Defendant Michael E Wheatley, Plaintiff Michael E Wheatley
Wednesday, May 24, 2017
20 20 misc Notice of Deposition Wed 05/24 4:52 PM
Notice to Take Deposition of Stephen Cerniglia. Filed by Michael E Wheatley (Bordy, Neil)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 18, 2017
19 19 misc Notice of Deposition Thu 05/18 1:37 PM
Notice to Take Deposition of Jamie Sebree. Filed by AFL Network Services Inc. (Turner, Chrisandrea)
Related: [-]
18 18 misc Notice of Deposition Thu 05/18 1:36 PM
Notice to Take Deposition of Mandy Harrimon. Filed by AFL Network Services Inc. (Turner, Chrisandrea)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Document (Generic) Thu 05/18 9:48 AM
Document: Notice of Service of Discovery. Filed by AFL Network Services Inc. (Turner, Chrisandrea)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 04, 2017
16 16 misc Withdrawal of Document Thu 05/04 10:10 AM
Withdrawal of Document (Notice to Take Deposition of Keith Burchett) Related [+]. Filed by AFL Network Services Inc. (Turner, Chrisandrea)
Related: [-] 14 Notice of Deposition filed by Counter-Claimant AFL Network Services Inc., Defendant AFL Network Services Inc.
15 15 misc Withdrawal of Document Thu 05/04 10:09 AM
Withdrawal of Document (Notice to Take Deposition of Janet Ragland) Related [+]. Filed by AFL Network Services Inc. (Turner, Chrisandrea)
Related: [-] 13 Notice of Deposition filed by Counter-Claimant AFL Network Services Inc., Defendant AFL Network Services Inc.
Friday, April 28, 2017
14 14 misc Notice of Deposition Fri 04/28 5:17 PM
Notice to Take Deposition of Keith Burchett. Filed by AFL Network Services Inc. (Turner, Chrisandrea)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Notice of Deposition Fri 04/28 5:12 PM
Notice to Take Deposition of Janet Ragland. Filed by AFL Network Services Inc. (Turner, Chrisandrea)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 30, 2017
12 12 misc Notice of Deposition Thu 03/30 10:31 AM
Notice to Take Deposition of Authorized Representative of Alliance Managment Services, LLC. Filed by Michael E Wheatley (Bordy, Neil)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 23, 2017
11 11 misc Notice of Deposition Thu 03/23 5:12 PM
Notice to Take Deposition of Corporate Representative of Alliance Management Services, LLC. Filed by Michael E Wheatley (Bordy, Neil)
Related: [-]
Saturday, March 18, 2017
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Notice Request Sun 03/19 12:58 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice Request Related [+]. Notice Date 03/18/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9 Order of the Court to continue the Telephonic Pre-Trial Conference held on March 16, 2017 on Adversary case 17-03006 a class="relatedlink" onclick="gotodi(20427248,'Wheatley_v_AFL_Network_Services_Inc',1);">1 , so ORDERED by /s/ Judge Lloyd. DISCOVERY DEADLINE IS EXTENDED TO JUNE 16, 2017. Telephonic Pre-Trial Conference continued to 7/13/2017 at 10:00 AM (Eastern Time). cc: Parties of Record (Rupe, B) This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.
Thursday, March 16, 2017
9 9 vorder Set/Continue/Reschedule -Hearing Thu 03/16 10:54 AM
Order of the Court to continue the Telephonic Pre-Trial Conference held on March 16, 2017 on Adversary case 17-03006 a class="relatedlink" onclick="gotodi(20427248,'Wheatley_v_AFL_Network_Services_Inc',1);">1 , so ORDERED by /s/ Judge Lloyd. DISCOVERY DEADLINE IS EXTENDED TO JUNE 16, 2017. Telephonic Pre-Trial Conference continued to 7/13/2017 at 10:00 AM (Eastern Time). cc: Parties of Record (Rupe, B)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 09, 2017
8 8 answer Answer to Counterclaim Thu 03/09 2:29 PM
Answer to Counterclaim . Filed by Plaintiff Michael E Wheatley (Bordy, Neil)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 17, 2017
7 7 answer|cmp Answer to Complaint|Counterclaim Fri 02/17 8:53 AM
Answer to Complaint , Counterclaim by AFL Network Services Inc. against Michael E Wheatley . Filed by Defendant AFL Network Services Inc., Plaintiff Michael E Wheatley (Turner, Chrisandrea)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 27, 2017
6 6 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Fri 01/27 1:33 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Chrisandrea L. Turner . Filed by on behalf of AFL Network Services Inc. (Turner, Chrisandrea)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 25, 2017
5 5 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 01/25 4:03 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Zanda Myers . Filed by on behalf of The Cecilian Bank (Myers, Zanda)
Related: [-]
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 01/25 3:19 PM
Summons Service Executed on AFL Network Services Inc. on January 25, 2017. (Bordy, Neil)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Notice of Compliance Wed 01/25 11:44 AM
Notice of Compliance Related [+]. Filed by Michael E Wheatley (Bordy, Neil)
Related: [-] Notice of Required Action
2 2 court Summons and Scheduling Order Issued Wed 01/25 8:50 AM
Summons and Scheduling Order Issued to Plaintiff for Service on AFL Network Services Inc. Answer Due 2/24/2017.. Pre-Trial Conference scheduled on 3/16/2017 at 10:00 AM (EASTERN) at Telephonic Hearing. (Smithson, M)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 24, 2017
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 01/24 4:29 PM
Adversary case 17-03006 (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)) Complaint by Neil Charles Bordy on behalf of Michael E Wheatley against AFL Network Services Inc.. Fee Amount $350(Bordy, Neil)
Related: [-]