Kentucky Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Joan A Lloyd
Case #: 3:16-bk-31239
Case Filed:Apr 15, 2016
Creditor Meeting:Nov 15, 2016
Converted:Aug 30, 2016
Terminated:Jul 01, 2021

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors100-199
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Alliance Management Services, LLC
PO Box 646
Leitchfield, KY 42755-0646
Represented By
Jesse E. Offill
Cooley Law Office
contact info
Nick C. Thompson
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Michael E. Wheatley
PO Box 1072
Prospect, KY 40059
Represented By
Neil Charles Bordy
Seiller Waterman LLC
contact info
Keith J. Larson
contact info
US Trustee
Charles R. Merrill
Asst. U.S.Trustee 601 West Broadway #512
Louisville, KY 40202
Represented By
Tyler Yeager
contact info


1. Alliance Management Services files for Chapter 11 bankruptcy (bizjournals.com)
Submitted Thu 05/05/2016
Docket last updated: 10/02/2018 7:56 PM EDT
Friday, April 15, 2016
crditcrd none Fri 04/15 6:44 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition 16-31239 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt number 7531380 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 18 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Fri 04/15 6:43 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Fee Amount $1717. Filed by Alliance Management Services, LLC. Remaining Petition Due by 04/29/2016. This case may be dismissed without further notice if the schedules are not filed timely. (Offill, Jesse)
Related: [-]