Jones v. Department of Education et al
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:16-bk-52871
Lead BK case is: 5:16-bk-52871
Texas Western Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Craig A Gargotta |
Case #: | 5:17-ap-05006 |
Nature of Suit | 63 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(8), student loan |
Case Filed: | Jan 27, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 27, 2018 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Department of Education
Fedloan Servicing P.O. Box 530210
Atlanta, GA 30353 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Federal Loan
P.O. Box 60610
Harrisburg, PA 17106 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Blanche Jones
8026 Pioneer Trail
San Antonio, TX 78244 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 1:10 PM CDT |
Thursday, March 01, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Thu 03/01 11:48 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 03/01/2018. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, February 27, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
order
AP-Dismiss Case (PDF)
Tue 02/27 2:33 PM
Agreed Order Dismissing Adversary Case (Order entered on 2/27/2018) (Hernandez, Rachel) |
|
court
Close Adversary Case
Tue 02/27 2:35 PM
Adversary Case Closed for Statistical Purposes Only (Hernandez, Rachel) |
||
Monday, February 26, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
motion
~Motion (Generic)
Mon 02/26 3:36 PM
Unopposed Motion for and Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Pursuant to Rule 7041 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Rule 41(A) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure filed by Johnny W. Thomas for Plaintiff Blanche Jones(Thomas, Johnny) Modified on 2/27/2018 (Hernandez, Rachel) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, December 04, 2017 | ||
court
Docket Call Held (Adversary)
Mon 12/04 3:53 PM
Docket Call Held. ***ORDER ABATING ADVERSARY PROCEEDING EOD 12/1/17***. (Rodriguez, Vidal) |
||
Sunday, December 03, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sun 12/03 11:47 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 12/03/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, December 01, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
order
AP-Abating (pdf)
Fri 12/01 1:34 PM
Order Abating Adversary (Order entered on 12/1/2017) (Hernandez, Rachel) |
|
24 | 24
motion
~Motion (Generic) (Adversary)
Fri 12/01 10:19 AM
Motion Unopposed Motion to Abate Adversary Proceeding and/or Suspend Scheduling Order Filed by Gary W. Wright for Defendant Department of Education. (Wright, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, August 30, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Wed 08/30 11:46 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 08/30/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, August 28, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
order
AP-Dismissing Party (pdf)
Mon 08/28 3:41 PM
Order Allowing Dismissal of Parties (Order entered on 8/28/2017) (Paez, Daniel) |
|
Thursday, August 17, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
misc
~Document
Thu 08/17 3:56 PM
Statement Regarding Consent filed by Johnny W. Thomas for Plaintiff Blanche Jones. (Thomas, Johnny) |
|
Tuesday, August 01, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Dismiss Party
Tue 08/01 10:44 AM
Motion to Dismiss Party - Federal Loan, U.S. Department of Justice, Fedloan Servicing: Dept of Education, and U.S. Attorney Office, (21 Day Objection Language ) filed by Johnny W. Thomas for Plaintiff Blanche Jones(Thomas, Johnny) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Saturday, July 15, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sat 07/15 11:46 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 07/15/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, July 13, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
order
AP-Scheduling Order (F)
Thu 07/13 10:06 AM
Scheduling Order Docket Call Set For 12/4/2017 at 01:30 PM at SA Courtroom 3 Discovery due 10/11/2017, Pre-Trial Order due by 11/27/2017, Dispositive Motions Due By 10/23/2017. (Order entered on 7/13/2017) (Elizondo, Lisa) |
|
Wednesday, July 05, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Statement Regarding Consent
Wed 07/05 1:31 PM
Statement Regarding Consent filed by Gary W. Wright for Defendant Department of Education (Wright, Gary) |
|
Friday, June 30, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 06/30 8:55 AM
Answer to Complaint filed by Department of Education, (Wright, Gary) |
|
Thursday, April 27, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Thu 04/27 11:43 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Notice Date 04/27/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, April 25, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
BK-Extend Time (pdf)
Tue 04/25 4:40 PM
Order Granting Extension of Time, 6/30/17 ,; (Order entered on 4/25/2017) (Rodriguez, Vidal) |
|
Thursday, April 20, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Extend Time (Adversary)
Thu 04/20 7:53 AM
Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to File Answer, Filed by Gary W. Wright for Defendant Department of Education. (Wright, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, April 10, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
AP-Seek Default (F)
Mon 04/10 10:07 AM
Order for Johnny Thomas For Blanche Jones to Seek Default against U.S. Attorney Office . Default Judgment Motion due by 5/10/2017 (Order entered on 4/10/2017) (Rodriguez, Vidal) |
|
11 | 11
order
AP-Seek Default (F)
Mon 04/10 10:04 AM
Order for Johnny Thomas For Blanche Jones to Seek Default against Fedloan Servicing: Dept. Of Education . Default Judgment Motion due by 5/10/2017 (Order entered on 4/10/2017) (Rodriguez, Vidal) |
|
10 | 10
order
AP-Seek Default (F)
Mon 04/10 10:02 AM
Order for Johnny Thomas For Blanche Jones to Seek Default against U.S. Department Of Justice, Attorney General . Default Judgment Motion due by 5/10/2017 (Order entered on 4/10/2017) (Rodriguez, Vidal) |
|
9 | 9
order
AP-Seek Default (F)
Mon 04/10 10:01 AM
Order for Johnny Thomas For Blanche Jones to Seek Default against Federal Loan . Default Judgment Motion due by 5/10/2017 (Order entered on 4/10/2017) (Rodriguez, Vidal) |
|
8 | 8
order
AP-Seek Default (F)
Mon 04/10 10:00 AM
Order for Johnny Thomas for Blanche Jones to Seek Default against Department Of Education . Default Judgment Motion due by 5/10/2017 (Order entered on 4/10/2017) (Rodriguez, Vidal) |
|
Sunday, February 05, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
cmp
Adversary Summons Served
Sun 02/05 11:11 AM
Summons Served on Department of Education - served on 2/3/2017 (Thomas, Johnny) |
|
6 | 6
cmp
Adversary Summons Served
Sun 02/05 11:10 AM
Summons Served on U.S. Attorney Office - served on 2/3/2017 (Thomas, Johnny) |
|
5 | 5
cmp
Adversary Summons Served
Sun 02/05 11:07 AM
Summons Served on Fedloan Servicing: Dept of Education - served on 2/3/2017 (Thomas, Johnny) |
|
4 | 4
cmp
Adversary Summons Served
Sun 02/05 11:04 AM
Summons Served on Federal Loan - served on 2/3/2017 (Thomas, Johnny) |
|
3 | 3
cmp
Adversary Summons Served
Sun 02/05 11:02 AM
Summons Served on U.S. Department of Justice, Attorney General - served on 2/3/2017 (Thomas, Johnny) |
|
Friday, January 27, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued (Auto)
Fri 01/27 6:26 PM
Summons Issued on Department of Education Answer Due 02/27/2017; Federal Loan Answer Due 02/27/2017 (Thomas, Johnny) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 01/27 6:25 PM
Adversary case 17-05006 Complaint To Determine Dischargeability Of Student Loans filed by Blanche Jones (attorney Johnny W. Thomas) against Department of Education, Federal Loan (Filing Fee: $ 350.00) (Nature(s) of Suit:(63 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(8), student loan))). (Thomas, Johnny) Modified on 1/30/2017 (Rodriguez, Vidal) |