Golubow v. Long Island Railroad
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Joan M Azrack |
Referred: | A Kathleen Tomlinson |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00467 |
Nature of Suit | 330 Torts - Personal Injury - Federal Employers’ Liability |
Cause | 45:51 Railways: Fed. Employer's Liability Act |
Case Filed: | Jan 27, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 08, 2021 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 26, 2017 5:20 AM EDT |
Defendant
Long Island Railroad
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Golubow
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Tuesday, September 07, 2021 | ||
70 | 70
appeal
USCA Mandate
Wed 09/08 9:56 AM
MANDATE of USCA 21-1759 as to69 Notice of Appeal filed by David Golubow. A notice of appeal was filed on July 19, 2021. Appellant's Form C was due on August 2, 2021. The case is deemed in default. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the appeal will be dismissed effective August 19, 2021 if the form is not filed by that date. (Landow, Concetta) |