Tangtiwatanapaibul et al v. Tom & Toon Inc et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Katharine H Parker |
Referred: | Katharine H Parker |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-00816 |
Nature of Suit | 710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause | 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act |
Case Filed: | Feb 02, 2017 |
Re-opened: | Apr 27, 2021 |
Terminated: | Aug 24, 2021 |
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 01, 2017 5:38 AM EDT |
Defendant
Toon Lau
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Roongkant Preechatammarach
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
David J. Louie
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Douglas Kai Wing Chiu
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Toon Thai Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Tom & Toon Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Thai Toon At Grand Central, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Thai Sliders & Co. LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Silom Thai Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Wai Ying Lau
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Srisuwan Tangtiwatanapaibul
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Phouviengsone Sysouvong
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Raymond Beltran
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Phouviengkhone Thammavong
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Peter Fong Chiu
Terminated: 04/05/2017
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, January 03, 2023 | ||
236 | 236
appeal
USCA Mandate
Tue 01/03 12:01 PM
MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to207 Notice of Appeal, filed by Phouviengkhone Thammavong, Srisuwan Tangtiwatanapaibul, Phouviengsone Sysouvong, Manoon Charussilapa,235 Amended Notice of Appeal, filed by Phouviengkhone Thammavong, Srisuwan Tangtiwatanapaibul, Phouviengsone Sysouvong, Manoon Charussilapa. USCA Case Number 20-3852 UPON DUE CONSIDERATION, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that the judgment of the district court is AFFIRMED... Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 1/3/2023..(nd) |
|
appeal
Transmission of USCA Mandate/Order to District Judge
Tue 01/03 12:02 PM
Transmission of USCA Mandate to the District Judge re:236 USCA Mandate,,..(nd) |