Koropey v. Penn Virginia Corporation et al
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:16-bk-32395
Lead BK case is: 3:16-bk-32395
Virginia Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Keith L Phillips |
Case #: | 3:17-ap-03030 |
Nature of Suit | 51 Bankruptcy - Revocation of confirmation |
Case Filed: | Feb 07, 2017 |
Terminated: | Nov 20, 2018 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Penn Virginia Corporation et al
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Roman J. Koropey
14 S. Bryn Mawr Avenue, Suite 210
Bryn Mawr, PA 19010 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/10/2024 1:11 PM EDT |
Thursday, November 22, 2018 | ||
37 | 37
court
BNC certificate of mailing of order
Fri 11/23 12:42 AM
BNC certificate of mailing of order (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, November 20, 2018 | ||
36 | 36
court
Adversary Proceeding Closed
Tue 11/20 8:42 AM
Adversary Proceeding Closed (Cummings, James) |
|
35 | 35
order
Appellate Court
Tue 11/20 8:38 AM
Order of District Court Affirming Bankruptcy Court Ruling and Dismissing the Appeal Number: 1700530 (Cummings, James) |
|
Sunday, September 10, 2017 | ||
34 | 34
notice
CerDocTyp - Notice of Filing of Official Transcript
Mon 09/11 12:22 AM
Notice of Filing of Official Transcript. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript has been filed. Pursuant to the new policy adopted by the Judicial Conference, transcripts are available for inspection only at the clerk's office or may be purchased from the court transcriber for a 90 day period. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, September 06, 2017 | ||
33 | 33
court
Transcript filed
Wed 09/06 10:58 AM
Transcript filed Re: Hearing Held 3/22/2017, regarding PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 12/5/2017. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Office. [For information about how to contact the transcriber, call the Clerk's Office] or [Contact the Court Reporter/Transcriber eScribers, Telephone number 973-406-2250.] [Transcript Purchased by Roman Koropey.] . Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 09/13/2017. Redaction Request Due By 09/27/2017. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 10/10/2017. Transcript access will be restricted through 12/5/2017. (Gottlieb, Jason) |
|
Wednesday, August 30, 2017 | ||
32 | 32
appeal
Transmittal of Record on Appeal to Appellate Court
Wed 08/30 2:45 PM
Transmittal of Record on Appeal to Appellate Court (Cummings, James) |
|
Wednesday, August 23, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
appeal
Appellee Designation
Wed 08/23 6:06 PM
Appellee Designation of Additional Items to Be Included in the Record on Appeal filed by Jeremy S. Williams of Kutak Rock LLP on behalf of Penn Virginia Corporation et al. (Williams, Jeremy) |
|
Wednesday, August 09, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
appeal
Appellant Designation
Thu 08/10 12:27 PM
Appellant Designation , Statement of Issues filed by Roman J. Koropey. Appellee Designation due by 8/23/2017. (Cummings, James) |
|
29 | 29
notice
CerDocTyp - Notice of Filing of Official Transcript
Thu 08/10 12:23 AM
Notice of Filing of Official Transcript. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript has been filed. Pursuant to the new policy adopted by the Judicial Conference, transcripts are available for inspection only at the clerk's office or may be purchased from the court transcriber for a 90 day period. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, August 04, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
court
Transcript filed
Fri 08/04 11:31 AM
Transcript filed Re: Hearing Held 4/5/2017, regarding MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT AND MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT THEREOF FILED BY PENN VIRGINIA CORPORATION (FILED 3/10/17). Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 11/2/2017. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Office. [For information about how to contact the transcriber, call the Clerk's Office] or [Contact the Court Reporter/Transcriber eScribers, Telephone number 973-406-2250.] [Transcript Purchased by Lynda Wood.] . Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 08/11/2017. Redaction Request Due By 08/25/2017. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 09/5/2017. Transcript access will be restricted through 11/2/2017. (Gottlieb, Jason) |
|
Friday, July 28, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
appeal
Civil Action Number/Court of Appeals Number
Fri 07/28 8:03 AM
Notification of Civil Action Number 3:17cv530 (Cummings, James) |
|
Thursday, July 27, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
appeal
Receipt of Notice of Appeal Filing Fee
Thu 07/27 6:00 PM
Receipt of Notice of Appeal Filing Fee. Receipt Number 116369. Fee Amount $298.00. (baumgartnerc) |
|
25 | 25
appeal
Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to District Court
Thu 07/27 3:08 PM
Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to District Court (Cummings, James) |
|
24 | 24
court
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing
Thu 07/27 2:56 PM
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing. A copy of this document was mailed by electronic means or first class mail postage prepaid to all parties in interest herein as required by the Bankruptcy Code, Bankruptcy Rules and Local Rules. Copy of Notice of Appeal and Procedural Instructions mailed 7/27/2017 to Roman J. Koropey and The U.S. Trustee. Electronic Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal was provided to Michael A. Condyles & Jeremy S. Williams on 07/27/2017. Parties Receiving Electronic Notification May Access Procedural Instructions at https://www.vaeb.uscourts.gov/wordpress/?page_id=690#appeal (Cummings, James) |
|
23 | 23
appeal
Notice of Appeal (fee)
Thu 07/27 2:40 PM
Notice of Appeal filed by Roman J. Koropey. Appellant Designation due by 8/10/2017. (Cummings, James) |
|
Sunday, July 23, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
court
BNC certificate of mailing of order
Mon 07/24 12:24 AM
BNC certificate of mailing of order (Admin.) |
|
21 | 21
court
BNC certificate of mailing of order
Mon 07/24 12:24 AM
BNC certificate of mailing of order (Admin.) |
|
Friday, July 21, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Fri 07/21 3:28 PM
Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (Ramirez-Lowe, Suzan) |
|
19 | 19
18
pgs
order
Memorandum Opinion
Fri 07/21 3:13 PM
Memorandum Opinion (Ramirez-Lowe, Suzan) |
|
Monday, April 10, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
order
Directing
Mon 04/10 3:08 PM
Order Staying Discovery (Cummings, James) |
|
Wednesday, April 05, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
court
Pre-Trial Conference Continued
Wed 04/05 5:18 PM
Pre-Trial Conference Continued Generally Pending Ruling on Motion to Dismiss; Appearance(s): Jeremy Williams; Roman Koropey . (Rintye, Peggy) |
|
16 | 16
court
Hearing held
Wed 04/05 5:17 PM
Hearing held; Taken Under Advisement; Appearance(s): Jeremy Williams; Roman Koropey . Discovery Stayed Pending Ruling on Motion to Dismiss. (Rintye, Peggy) |
|
Tuesday, April 04, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
answer
Reply
Tue 04/04 10:35 AM
Reply to Answer of Plaintiff filed by Jeremy S. Williams of Kutak Rock LLP on behalf of Penn Virginia Corporation et al. (Williams, Jeremy) |
|
Thursday, March 30, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
court
BNC certificate of mailing of order
Fri 03/31 12:28 AM
BNC certificate of mailing of order (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, March 28, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
answer
Response
Tue 03/28 3:42 PM
Response to Motion to Dismiss Complaint and Memorandum In Support Thereof filed by Roman J. Koropey. (Cummings, James) |
|
11 | 11
order
Cancelling/Continuing/Rescheduling/Setting Pre-Trial Conference
Tue 03/28 1:12 PM
Order Continuing Pre-Trial Conference and Staying Discovery; Pre-Trial Conference set for 4/5/2017 at 02:00 PM at Judge Phillips' Courtroom, 701 E. Broad St., Rm. 5100, Richmond, Virginia, (Cummings, James) |
|
Thursday, March 23, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Affidavit of Service
Thu 03/23 3:55 PM
Affidavit of Service (DNs 6 & 7) filed by Jeremy S. Williams of Kutak Rock LLP on behalf of Penn Virginia Corporation et al. (Williams, Jeremy) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
court
Pre-Trial Conference Continued
Thu 03/23 11:56 AM
Pre-Trial Conference Continued; Appearance : Roman J. Koropey; Jeremy Williams. Pre-Trial Conference set for 04/05/2017 at 02:00 PM at Judge Phillips' Courtroom, 701 E. Broad St., Rm. 5100, Richmond, Virginia. Discovery suspended through April 5, 2017. (gibbsp) |
|
Friday, March 10, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Hearing
Fri 03/10 12:27 PM
Notice of Hearing and Notice of Motion filed by Michael A. Condyles of Kutak Rock LLP on behalf of Penn Virginia Corporation et al. Hearing scheduled for 4/5/2017 at 02:00 PM at Judge Phillips' Courtroom, 701 E. Broad St., Rm. 5100, Richmond, Virginia. (Condyles, Michael) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Fri 03/10 12:26 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Motion to Dismiss Complaint and Memorandum in Support Thereof filed by Michael A. Condyles of Kutak Rock LLP on behalf of Penn Virginia Corporation et al. (Condyles, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, February 14, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Certificate of Service
Thu 02/16 2:48 PM
Certificate of Service filed by Roman J. Koropey. (Cummings, James) |
|
Friday, February 10, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
summon
CerDocTyp - Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference
Sat 02/11 3:29 AM
Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, February 08, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
summon
Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference
Wed 02/08 9:30 AM
Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference. Summons Issued to Penn Virginia Corporation et al Answer Due 3/10/2017 Pre-Trial Conference set for 3/22/2017 at 09:30 AM at Judge Phillips' Courtroom, 701 E. Broad St., Rm. 5100, Richmond, Virginia, (Cummings, James) |
|
Tuesday, February 07, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
court
Receipt of Adversary/Miscellaneous Proceeding Filing Fee
Tue 02/07 6:00 PM
Receipt of Adversary/Miscellaneous Filing Fee. Receipt Number 115983. Fee Amount $350.00. (ramirez-lowes) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (fee)
Tue 02/07 2:36 PM
Adversary case 17-03030 Complaint against Penn Virginia Corporation et al filed by Roman J. Koropey. Nature of Suit: (51 (Revocation of confirmation)) Associated Bankruptcy Case Number: 3:16-bk-32395 (Ramirez-Lowe, Suzan) |