Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:16-bk-30406

Oregon Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Case #: 3:17-ap-03027
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Feb 17, 2017
Terminated:May 23, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
Signature Flight Support Corporation, Defendant
Represented By
Signature Flight Support Corporation
contact info
Plaintiff
Stephen P Arnot
POB 1963
Lake Oswego, OR 97035
Represented By
STEPHEN P ARNOT
Williams Kastner Greene & Markley
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/01/2025 1:06 PM PDT
Tuesday, May 23, 2017
court Close Adversary Case Tue 05/23 11:44 AM
Adversary Case 3:17-ap-3027 Closed (bd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 06, 2017
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Generic Thu 04/06 9:19 PM
Certificate of Notice Re:6 Order Re: Dismissal or Other Final Disposition Effective Within 45 Days. Last Date to Comply 5/19/2017, (bls). (Admin.)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Settle & Compromise Adversary Proceeding (LBF 761 - 6/15/16) Thu 04/06 9:04 AM
Motion and Notice of Intent to Settle and Compromise Adversary Proceeding and Order Thereon (bd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 04, 2017
6 6 order Dismissal or Other Final Disposition Tue 04/04 12:05 PM
Order Re: Dismissal or Other Final Disposition Effective Within 45 Days. Last Date to Comply 5/19/2017, (bls)
Related: [-]
5 5 court Record of Proceeding (Hearing Held) Tue 04/04 12:04 PM
Pretrial Hearing Held. (bls)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 27, 2017
utility Update Answer Deadline Mon 02/27 11:20 AM
Signature Flight Support Corporation Answer Deadline Reset for 3/24/2017 (cmr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 22, 2017
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 02/22 10:57 AM
Summons Served on Signature Flight Support Corporation 2/22/2017 (ARNOT, STEPHEN)
Related: [-]
3 3 court Summons Issued (or Alias) Wed 02/22 8:47 AM
Summons Issued for service on Stephen P Arnot Date Issued 2/22/2017, Answer Due 3/24/20171 Complaint Pre-Trial Hearing Set for 04/04/2017 at 10:30 AM in/by Telephone Hearing. Scheduling Order due 04/7/2017. (bd)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 17, 2017
2 2 crditcrd none Fri 02/17 11:48 AM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Complaint([LINK 17-03027 ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number A15102172. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 02/17 11:47 AM
Adversary case 17-03027 Complaint by Stephen P Arnot against Signature Flight Support Corporation. $350 Filing Fee Paid. Nature of Suit:(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference))(Arnot, Stephen)
Related: [-]