Lone Star Steaks, Inc
Member Case
Lead case is: 4:17-bk-40297
Lead case is: 4:17-bk-40297
Texas Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Brenda T Rhoades |
Case #: | 4:17-bk-40330 |
Case Filed: | Feb 17, 2017 |
Creditor Meeting: | Sep 29, 2017 |
Claims Deadline: | Jun 26, 2018 |
Converted: | Sep 07, 2017 |
Terminated: | Nov 29, 2018 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 100-199 |
Est. Assets | $0 to $50,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $500,001 to $1 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Lone Star Steaks, Inc
5055 W. Park Blvd., #500
Plano, TX 75093 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: Wednesday May 23, 2018 12:02 PM CDT |
Creditor
Forsyth County Tax Collector
201 N. Chestnut St.
Winston Salem, NC 27101 |
|
Creditor
Wasserstrom
477 South Front Street
Columbus, OH 43215 |
|
Creditor
US Foods, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
US Food, Inc.
2838 Collections Ctr. Dr.
Chicago, IL 60693 |
|
Creditor
Thompson & Knight, LLP
PO Box 660684
Dallas, TX 75266 |
|
Creditor
Surry Tax Collector
PO Box 588
Dobson, NC 27017 |
|
Creditor
State of North Carolina
PO Box 25000
Raleigh, NC 27640 |
|
Creditor
Simon Property Group, Inc.
225 West Washington Street
Indianapolis, IN 46204 |
|
Creditor
Senn Bros. Produce
327 Wholesale Ln.
West Columbia, SC 29172 |
|
Creditor
Public Service Co. of North Carolina
PO Box 100256
Columbia, SC 29202 |
|
Creditor
National Wholesale Supply, Inc.
PO Box 54007
Dallas, TX 75354 |
|
Creditor
Law Office of John T. Benjamin Jr. P.A.
1115 Hillsborough St,
Raleigh, NC 27603 |
|
Creditor
LSF5 COI Holdings, LLC
c/o Lauren K. Drawhorn 100 Throckmorton Street Suite 1500
Fort Worth, TX 76102 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Iredell County Tax Collector
135 E. Water St.
Statesville, NC 28677 |
|
Creditor
Greater Charlotte Refrigeration
6120-J Brookshire Blvd.
Charlotte, NC 28216 |
|
Creditor
Durham County Tax Collector
200 E. Main St.
Durham, NC 27701 |
|
Creditor
Duke Energy
PO Box 70515
Charlotte, NC 28272 |
|
Creditor
City of Statesville
PO Box 1111
Statesville, NC 28687 |
|
Creditor
City of Mount Airy Tax Collector
300 S. Main St.
Mount Airy, NC 27030 |
|
Creditor
Cintas Corporation
4601 Creekstone Drive Suite 200
Durham, NC 27703 |
|
Creditor
Carolina Power and Light
PO Box 1003
Charlotte, NC 28201 |
|
Creditor
CBL & Associates Management, Inc.
2030 Hamilton Place Blvd. Suite 500
Chattanooga, TN 37421 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Buncombe County Tax Collector
94 Coxe Avenue
Asheville, NC 28801 |
|
Creditor
Brixmor Property Group, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Aramark Uniform Group, Inc.
22808 Network PL
Chicago,, IL 60673 |
|
Trustee
Christopher Moser
2001 Bryan Street, Suite 1800
Dallas, TX 75201 |
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee 110 N. College Ave. Suite 300
Tyler, TX 75702 |
Docket last updated: 05/23/2018 12:24 PM CDT |
Friday, February 17, 2017 | ||
crditcrd
none
Fri 02/17 9:10 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 17-40330 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00) filing fee. Receipt number 9769199, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
1 | 1
18
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Fri 02/17 9:09 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Without Schedules, Statements and Other Required Documents.Filed by Lone Star Steaks, Inc Document Due 02/24/2017.(Henry, John) |