TX. C. C., Inc.
Texas Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Brenda T Rhoades |
Case #: | 4:17-bk-40297 |
Case Filed: | Feb 13, 2017 |
Creditor Meeting: | Sep 29, 2017 |
Converted: | Sep 07, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 24, 2023 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 100-199 |
Est. Assets | $0 to $50,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
TX. C. C., Inc.
5055 W Park Blvd Ste 500
Plano, TX 75093-2587 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Christopher Moser
2001 Bryan Street, Suite 1800
Dallas, TX 75201 |
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee 110 N. College Ave. Suite 300
Tyler, TX 75702 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 08/26/2021 11:34 AM CDT |
Monday, February 13, 2017 | ||
crditcrd
none
Mon 02/13 4:03 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 17-40297 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00) filing fee. Receipt number 9758387, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
1 | 1
18
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Mon 02/13 3:59 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Without Schedules, Statements and Other Required Documents.Filed by TX. C. C., Inc. Document Due 02/20/2017.(Henry, John) |