Lone Star Steakhouse & Saloon of Oklahoma, Inc.
Member Case
Lead case is: 4:17-bk-40297
Lead case is: 4:17-bk-40297
Texas Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Brenda T Rhoades |
Case #: | 4:17-bk-40341 |
Case Filed: | Feb 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | Nov 29, 2018 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $100,001 to $500,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $100,001 to $500,000 |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Lone Star Steakhouse & Saloon of Oklahoma, Inc.
5055 W Park Blvd Ste 500
Plano, TX 75093-2587 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee 110 N. College Ave. Suite 300
Tyler, TX 75702 |
Docket last updated: 02/19/2017 6:00 PM CST |
Monday, February 20, 2017 | ||
crditcrd
none
Mon 02/20 9:26 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 17-40341 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00) filing fee. Receipt number 9770890, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
1 | 1
13
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Mon 02/20 9:25 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Without Schedules, Statements and Other Required Documents.Filed by Lone Star Steakhouse & Saloon of Oklahoma, Inc. Document Due 02/27/2017.(Henry, John) |