Blanchard et al v. City Of Memphis, Tennessee
Tennessee Western District Court | |
Judge: | Jon Phipps Mccalla |
Referred: | Jon A York |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02120 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1983 Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Feb 22, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 21, 2020 |
Case in other court: | Sixth Circuit COA, 17-05868 |
Last checked: Monday Aug 21, 2017 4:04 AM CDT |
Defendant
City Of Memphis, Tennessee
125 N. Main Street, Room 336
Memphis, TN 38103 |
Represented By
|
Intervenor Plaintiff
ACLU of Tennessee, Inc.
P.O. Box 120160
Nashville, TN 37212 |
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Plaintiff
Elaine Blanchard
Terminated: 06/30/2017
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Keedran Franklin
Terminated: 06/30/2017
Apperson Crump c/o Bruce S. Kramer 6070 Poplar Avenue 6th Floor
Memphis, TN 38119 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Paul Garner
Terminated: 06/30/2017
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bradley Watkins
Terminated: 06/30/2017
|
Represented By
|
1. | Citizens file federal lawsuit after being placed on Memphis Police's "blacklist" (commercialappeal.com) |
Submitted Thu 02/23/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM CDT |