Elaine Blanchard, et al v. City of Memphis, TN
Original Case: 2:17-cv-02120
Sixth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:20-cv-06263 |
Type | civil / private / civil rights |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Nov 05, 2020 |
Terminated: | Apr 26, 2022 |
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 27, 2022 3:20 AM CDT |
Defendant - Appellant
CITY OF MEMPHIS, TN
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor
ACLU OF TENNESSEE
|
|
Intervenor - Appellee
ACLU OF TENNESSEE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ELAINE BLANCHARD
|
|
Plaintiff
KEEDRAN FRANKLIN
|
|
Plaintiff
PAUL GARNER
|
|
Plaintiff
BRADLEY WATKINS
|
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
ELAINE BLANCHARD
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
KEEDRAN FRANKLIN
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
PAUL GARNER
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
BRADLEY WATKINS
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/27/2022 3:20 AM CDT |
Thursday, November 05, 2020 | ||
The case manager for this case is: Mr. Roy G. Ford (513) 564-7016 (RGF) | ||
3 pgs Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant City of Memphis, TN. Transcript needed: y. (RGF) | ||
1 pgs APPEARANCE filed for Appellant City of Memphis, TN by Jennie Silk. Certificate of Service: 11/05/2020. 20-6263 (JVS) | ||
1 pgs APPEARANCE filed for Appellant City of Memphis, TN by Bruce A. McMullen. Certificate of Service: 11/05/2020. 20-6263 (BAM) | ||
1 pgs APPEARANCE filed for Appellant City of Memphis, TN by R. Mark Glover. Certificate of Service: 11/05/2020. 20-6263 (RMG) |