Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 6:16-bk-10759

Kansas Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Dale L Somers
Case #: 6:17-ap-05031
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Feb 24, 2017
Terminated:Dec 11, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
Best Supply Co., Inc.
1545 E 29th St., North
Wichita, KS 67219
Represented By
Best Supply Co., Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Carl B. Davis
Davis & Jack, L.L.C. 2121 W Maple PO Box 12686
Wichita, KS 67277
Represented By
Kenneth H. Jack
Davis & Jack LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/22/2025 1:07 PM CDT
Thursday, October 14, 2021
court Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC auto) Thu 10/14 9:45 PM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Complaint. Receipt number 147203, Fee Amount $350.00. (adiuser)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 12, 2018
49 49 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Wed 12/12 11:53 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 12/12/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 48 Dismissing Case - AP
Tuesday, December 11, 2018
court Close Adversary Case Tue 12/11 12:53 PM
Adversary Case 6:17-ap-5031 Closed . (waa)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 10, 2018
48 48 order Dismissing Case - AP Mon 12/10 9:39 AM
Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice. Signed on 12/10/2018 (waa)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 22, 2018
47 47 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Wed 08/22 11:55 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 08/22/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 46 Judgment
Monday, August 20, 2018
46 46 order Judgment Mon 08/20 4:11 PM
Final Judgment On The Trustee's KAAPA Preference Claim Signed on 8/20/2018 (waa)
Related: [-]
Saturday, August 18, 2018
45 45 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 08/18 11:50 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 08/18/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 43 Order on Motion For Summary Judgment
Thursday, August 16, 2018
44 44 24 pgs order Opinion Thu 08/16 3:11 PM
Order Designated as Opinion Signed on 8/16/2018 - Memorandum Decision And Order Granting The Motion Of The KAAPA Defendants For Summary Judgment (waa)
Related: [-]
43 43 order Summary Judgment Thu 08/16 3:08 PM
Memorandum Decision And Order Granting The Motion Of The KAAPA Defendants For Summary Judgment Related [+] Signed on 8/16/2018. (waa)
Related: [-] 18
Wednesday, May 23, 2018
42 42 notice Service Wed 05/23 12:03 PM
Notice of Service of Supplemental Brief of KAAPA Defendants in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment Based on New Value Defense, with Certificate of Service. Filed by Defendant Best Supply Co., Inc. . (Gilman, W.)
Related: [-]
41 41 misc Brief Wed 05/23 11:49 AM
Supplemental ReplyBrief, with Certificate of Service. (of KAAPA Defendants) Filed by W. Thomas Gilman on behalf of Best Supply Co., Inc. Related [+] (Gilman, W.)
Related: [-] 39 Supplemental Support Brief, with Certificate of Service. On New Value Defense Filed by W. Thomas Gilman on behalf of Best Supply Co., Inc. (RE: related document(s)37 Order Requesting Additional Briefs On The Motion Of KAAPA Defendants For Summary Judgment 18 Motion For Summary Judgment And Brief In Support By KAAPA Defendants Filed by Defendant Best Supply Co., Inc. (Gilman, W.) filed by Defendant Best Supply Co., Inc. Signed on 3/14/2018 (waa) Modified on 3/14/2018 to add document link (waa).) (Gilman, W.), 40 Opposition Brief, with Certificate of Service. (Response to Defendants' Supplemental Brief on New Value) Filed by Kenneth H. Jack on behalf of Carl B. Davis (RE: related document(s)39 Supplemental Support Brief, with Certificate of Service.On New Value Defense Filed by W. Thomas Gilman on behalf of Best Supply Co., Inc. (RE: related document(s)37 Order Requesting Additional Briefs On The Motion Of KAAPA Defendants For Summary Judgment 18 Motion For Summary Judgment And Brief In Support By KAAPA Defendants Filed by Defendant Best Supply Co., Inc. (Gilman, W.) filed by Defendant Best Supply Co., Inc. Signed on 3/14/2018 (waa) Modified on 3/14/2018 to add document link (waa).) (Gilman, W.))
Wednesday, May 16, 2018
40 40 misc Brief Wed 05/16 4:03 PM
Opposition Brief, with Certificate of Service. Related [+] Filed by Kenneth H. Jack on behalf of Carl B. Davis (Jack, Kenneth)
Related: [-] sponse to Defendants' Supplemental Brief on New Value 39 Supplemental Support Brief, with Certificate of Service. On New Value Defense Filed by W. Thomas Gilman on behalf of Best Supply Co., Inc. (RE: related document(s)37 Order Requesting Additional Briefs On The Motion Of KAAPA Defendants For Summary Judgment 18 Motion For Summary Judgment And Brief In Support By KAAPA Defendants Filed by Defendant Best Supply Co., Inc. (Gilman, W.) filed by Defendant Best Supply Co., Inc. Signed on 3/14/2018 (waa) Modified on 3/14/2018 to add document link (waa).) (Gilman, W.)
Tuesday, April 17, 2018
39 39 misc Brief Tue 04/17 10:18 AM
Supplemental Support Brief, with Certificate of Service. On New Value Defense Filed by W. Thomas Gilman on behalf of Best Supply Co., Inc. Related [+] (Gilman, W.)
Related: [-] 37 Order Requesting Additional Briefs On The Motion Of KAAPA Defendants For Summary Judgment 18 Motion For Summary Judgment And Brief In Support By KAAPA Defendants Filed by Defendant Best Supply Co., Inc. (Gilman, W.) filed by Defendant Best Supply Co., Inc. Signed on 3/14/2018 (waa) Modified on 3/14/2018 to add document link (waa).
Friday, March 16, 2018
38 38 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 03/16 11:54 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 03/16/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 37 Order (Generic)
Wednesday, March 14, 2018
37 37 order Generic Wed 03/14 10:38 AM
Order Requesting Additional Briefs On The Motion Of KAAPA Defendants For Summary Judgment 18 Motion For Summary Judgment And Brief In Support By KAAPA Defendants Filed by Defendant Best Supply Co., Inc. (Gilman, W.) filed by Defendant Best Supply Co., Inc. Signed on 3/14/2018 (waa) Modified on 3/14/2018 to add document link (waa)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 23, 2018
36 36 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 02/23 11:55 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 02/23/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 35 Order on Motion to Extend/Shorten Time
Wednesday, February 21, 2018
35 35 order Extend/Shorten Time Wed 02/21 3:45 PM
Order Granting Motion to Extend/Shorten Time Related [+] Signed on 2/21/2018. (waa)
Related: [-] 33
Friday, January 05, 2018
34 34 notice Objection Deadline Fri 01/05 4:13 PM
Notice of Objection Deadline. Proposed Hearing to be held 2/8/18 at 9:00 am. Certificate of Service on 1/5/18. Filed by Defendant Best Supply Co., Inc. Related [+]. Objections due by 1/26/2018. (Gilman, W.)
Related: [-] 33 Second Motion to Extend Time to File Joint Motion for Summary Judgment by Adkins Energy Defendants Filed by Defendant Best Supply Co., Inc. (Gilman, W.)
33 33 motion Extend/Shorten Time Fri 01/05 4:11 PM
Second Motion to Extend Time to File Joint Motion for Summary Judgment by Adkins Energy Defendants Filed by Defendant Best Supply Co., Inc. (Gilman, W.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 02, 2018
32 32 notice Service Tue 01/02 4:29 PM
Notice of Service of Reply Brief, with Certificate of Service. Filed by Defendant Best Supply Co., Inc. . (Gilman, W.)
Related: [-]
31 31 answer Reply Tue 01/02 4:13 PM
Reply to Related [+] In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment of KAAPA Defendants Filed by Defendant Best Supply Co., Inc. (Gilman, W.)
Related: [-] 30 Response filed by Plaintiff Carl B. Davis
Thursday, December 21, 2017
30 30 answer Response Thu 12/21 1:03 PM
Opposition Response to Related [+] Filed by Plaintiff Carl B. Davis (Jack, Kenneth)
Related: [-] 18 Motion For Summary Judgment And Brief In Support By KAAPA Defendants filed by Defendant Best Supply Co., Inc.
Att: 1 Appendix
Att: 2 Appendix
Wednesday, December 13, 2017
29 29 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Wed 12/13 11:54 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 12/13/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 28 Order on Motion to Extend/Shorten Time
Sunday, December 10, 2017
28 28 order Extend/Shorten Time Sun 12/10 4:21 PM
Order Granting Motion to Extend/Shorten Time Related [+] Signed on 12/10/2017. (wmd)
Related: [-] 27
Friday, December 08, 2017
27 27 motion Extend/Shorten Time Fri 12/08 2:41 PM
Second Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Motion of KAAPA Defendants for Summary Judgment Filed by Plaintiff Carl B. Davis (Jack, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Sunday, December 03, 2017
26 26 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sun 12/03 11:57 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 12/03/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 25 Order on Motion to Extend/Shorten Time
Friday, December 01, 2017
25 25 order Extend/Shorten Time Fri 12/01 11:31 AM
Order Granting Motion to Extend/Shorten Time Related [+] Signed on 12/1/2017. (wmd)
Related: [-] 23
Wednesday, November 29, 2017
24 24 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Wed 11/29 11:53 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 11/29/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 22 Order on Motion to Extend/Shorten Time
23 23 motion Extend/Shorten Time Wed 11/29 5:36 PM
Agreed Motion to Extend Time to File Joint Motion for Summary Judgment By Adkins Energy Defendants Filed by Defendant Best Supply Co., Inc. (Gilman, W.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 23, 2017
22 22 order Extend/Shorten Time Fri 11/24 8:45 PM
Order Granting Motion to Extend/Shorten Time Related [+] Signed on 11/23/2017. (wmd)
Related: [-] 21
Wednesday, November 22, 2017
21 21 motion Extend/Shorten Time Wed 11/22 1:01 PM
Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Motion of KAAPA Defendants for Summary Judgment Filed by Plaintiff Carl B. Davis (Jack, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 02, 2017
20 20 misc Certificate of Service Thu 11/02 2:15 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] and Appendix (Dkt 19) Filed by W. Thomas Gilman on behalf of Best Supply Co., Inc. (Gilman, W.)
Related: [-] 18 Motion For Summary Judgment And Brief In Support By KAAPA Defendants filed by Defendant Best Supply Co., Inc. 18 Motion For Summary Judgment And Brief In Support By KAAPA Defendants Filed by Defendant Best Supply Co., Inc. (Gilman, W.)
19 19 misc Support Document Thu 11/02 2:12 PM
Document filed in support of : Motion For Summary Judgment And Brief In Support By KAAPA Defendants with Certificate of Service on 11/2/2017. APPENDIX Filed by W. Thomas Gilman on behalf of Best Supply Co., Inc. Related [+] (Gilman, W.)
Related: [-] 18 Motion For Summary Judgment And Brief In Support By KAAPA Defendants Filed by Defendant Best Supply Co., Inc. (Gilman, W.)
Att: 1 Appendix Exhibits 1 through 3-2
Att: 2 Appendix Exhibits 4 and 5
Att: 3 Appendix Exhibit 6
Att: 4 Appendix Exhibit 7 - Part 1
Att: 5 Appendix Exhibit 7 - Part 2
Att: 6 Appendix Exhibit 7 - Part 3
Att: 7 Appendix Exhibit 7 - Part 4
Att: 8 Appendix Exhibit 7 - Part 5
Att: 9 Appendix Exhibit 7 - Part 6
18 18 motion Summary Judgment Thu 11/02 2:07 PM
Motion For Summary Judgment And Brief In Support By KAAPA Defendants Filed by Defendant Best Supply Co., Inc. (Gilman, W.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 11, 2017
utility Flags Set-Reset Wed 10/11 1:37 PM
Flag Set/Reset/Terminated - CONS Flag set - Per 10/11/17 Order (DE# 389) This AP Case is consolidated with cases 17-5027 17-5033 and 17-5048 for purpose of deciding common legal issue. Joint Motion for Summary Judgment due by 12/4/17. All Discovery Ddls, etc stayed pending a ruling on the SJ motion. . (wmd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 19, 2017
17 17 notice Service Tue 09/19 10:03 AM
Notice of Service of Defendant's Supplemental Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures, with Certificate of Service. Filed by Defendant Best Supply Co., Inc. . (Gilman, W.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 06, 2017
16 16 order Scheduling Order Wed 09/06 11:01 AM
Agreed Modified Scheduling Order Signed on 9/6/2017 (wed)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 25, 2017
15 15 notice Service Tue 07/25 2:14 PM
Notice of Service of Trustee's Supplemental Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures, with Certificate of Service. Filed by Plaintiff Carl B. Davis . (Jack, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 30, 2017
14 14 notice Generic Notice Tue 05/30 6:19 PM
Notice of Change of Firm Address. Filed by Defendant Best Supply Co., Inc. . (Gilman, W.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 18, 2017
13 13 notice Service Thu 05/18 11:58 AM
Notice of Service of Trustee's Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures, with Certificate of Service. Filed by Plaintiff Carl B. Davis . (Jack, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 11, 2017
12 12 notice Service Thu 05/11 4:21 PM
Notice of Service of Defendants Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures, with Certificate of Service. Filed by Defendant Best Supply Co., Inc. . (Gilman, W.)
Related: [-]
Saturday, April 22, 2017
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 04/22 11:55 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 04/22/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Order Adopting Report of Parties Planning Meeting
Thursday, April 20, 2017
10 10 order Order Adopting Report of Parties Planning Meeting Thu 04/20 9:17 AM
Order Adopting Report of Parties Planning Meeting Signed on 4/20/2017 Status hearing to be held on 10/24/2017 at 10:15 AM at Wichita Room 228. (wed)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 19, 2017
9 9 misc Report of Parties Planning Meeting Wed 04/19 2:49 PM
Report of Parties Planning Meeting Filed by Kenneth H. Jack on behalf of Carl B. Davis . (Jack, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Saturday, March 18, 2017
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 03/18 11:52 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 03/18/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Notice of Hearing
Thursday, March 16, 2017
7 7 3 pgs notice Hearing Thu 03/16 9:00 AM
Notice of Scheduling Conference Filed by USBC. (wed)
Related: [-]
court Hearing Set (Other) Thu 03/16 9:01 AM
Hearing Set Related [+]. Pre-Trial Scheduling Conference set for 4/25/2017 at 10:15 AM at Wichita Room 150. (wed)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 17-05031 Complaint by Kenneth H. Jack on behalf of Carl B. Davis against Best Supply Co., Inc.. Receipt Number Deferred, Fee Amount $350 Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (Attachments: # 1 Adversary Cover Sheet) filed by Plaintiff Carl B. Davis
Wednesday, March 15, 2017
6 6 3 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Wed 03/15 9:54 AM
Answer to Complaint with Certificate of Service Filed by Best Supply Co., Inc. Related [+]. (Gilman, W.)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 17-05031 Complaint by Kenneth H. Jack on behalf of Carl B. Davis against Best Supply Co., Inc.. Receipt Number Deferred, Fee Amount $350 Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (Attachments: # 1 Adversary Cover Sheet) filed by Plaintiff Carl B. Davis
5 5 1 pgs misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 03/15 9:53 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by W. Thomas Gilman with Certificate of Service Filed by W. Thomas Gilman on behalf of Best Supply Co., Inc. . (Gilman, W.)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 27, 2017
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 02/27 10:41 AM
Summons Service Executed on Best Supply Co., Inc. 2/27/2017 (Jack, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
3 3 court Summons Issued Mon 02/27 7:58 AM
Summons Issued on Best Supply Co., Inc. Date Issued 2/27/2017, Answer Due 3/29/2017 . (wed)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 24, 2017
2 2 cmp Summons Request Fri 02/24 3:38 PM
Request for Issuance of Summons(es) by Kenneth H. Jack on behalf of Carl B. Davis - summons(es) requested on Best Supply Co., Inc. (Jack, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 02/24 3:23 PM
Adversary case 17-05031 Complaint by Kenneth H. Jack on behalf of Carl B. Davis against Best Supply Co., Inc.. Receipt Number Deferred, Fee Amount $350 Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (Jack, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Adversary Cover Sheet