Kansas Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Dale L Somers
Case #: 6:16-bk-10759
Case Filed:Apr 28, 2016
Creditor Meeting:May 23, 2016
Terminated:Jul 21, 2022
Discharge Objection Deadline:Jul 22, 2016

Debtor
WB Services, LLC
300 E Industrial Dr
Sedgwick, KS 67135-8823
Represented By
William H. Zimmerman, Jr.
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
J Michael Morris
301 North Main Suite 1600
Wichita, KS 67202
Trustee
Carl B Davis
2121 W Maple Street PO Box 12686
Wichita, KS 67213
Represented By
Carl B Davis
contact info
Kenneth H. Jack
Davis & Jack LLC
contact info
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee 301 North Main Suite 1150
Wichita, KS 67202


Docket last updated: 02/21/2022 6:55 PM CST
Thursday, April 28, 2016
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7, Credit Card ) 16-10759 [misc,volp7cc] ( 335.00). Receipt number 12935130,amount $ 335.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of Trustee J Michael Morris, to be held on 05/23/2016 at 10:00 AM at Wichita Room B-56. Last day to Oppose Discharge: 07/22/2016 Autogenerated
Related: [-]
1 1 Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual . Fee Amount $335 Filed by WB Services, LLC Section 521 Incomplete Filings Due: 06/13/2016. Atty Disclosure Statement due 05/12/2016. Attorney Signature due 05/12/2016. Schedule A/B due 05/12/2016. Schedule C due 05/12/2016. Schedule D due 05/12/2016. Schedule E/F due 05/12/2016. Schedule G due 05/12/2016. Schedule H due 05/12/2016. Schedule I due 05/12/2016. Schedule J due 05/12/2016. Schedule J-2 due 05/12/2016. Statement of Financial Affairs due 05/12/2016. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 05/12/2016. Incomplete Filings due by 05/12/2016. Debtor Declaration Re: Electronic Filing due by 05/5/2016. (Zimmerman, William)
Related: [-]
2 2 Order to Correct Voluntary Petition in Bankruptcy. Signed on 4/28/2016 Incomplete Filings due by 5/12/2016. (wkh)
Related: [-]