Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:15-bk-31086

Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:David R Jones
Case #: 4:17-ap-03096
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Feb 24, 2017
Terminated:Mar 27, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Zirmed, Inc.
Represented By
Zirmed, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Michael D. Warner, Liquidating Trustee
Represented By
John J. Kane
Kane Russell, Et Al.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 1:11 PM CDT
Wednesday, March 27, 2024
court Close Adversary Case Wed 03/27 11:52 AM
Adversary Case 4:17-ap-3096 Closed. (rgs4)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 17, 2023
19 19 trustee Remark (batch) Tue 10/17 10:38 PM
Remark: Judge Christopher M. Lopez added to case. Involvement of Judge David R Jones Terminated. . (DawnaKelly)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 27, 2018
18 18 notice Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Fri 04/27 3:56 PM
Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Filed by Michael D. Warner, Liquidating Trustee (Kane, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 16, 2017
17 17 notice Notice Thu 11/16 10:58 AM
Notice of Initial Disclosures . Filed by Michael D. Warner, Liquidating Trustee (Kane, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 28, 2017
16 16 misc Proposed Order Wed 06/28 2:27 PM
Proposed Order RE: Withdrawal of Docket No. 13 (Filed By Zirmed, Inc. ) Related [+] (Landon, Gerald)
Related: [-] 15 Motion to Withdraw Document
15 15 motion Withdraw Document Wed 06/28 1:24 PM
Motion to Withdraw Document Related [+]. Filed by Zirmed, Inc. (Landon, Gerald)
Related: [-] 13 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim
14 14 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 06/28 1:14 PM
Answer to Complaint Related [+] Filed by Zirmed, Inc. (Landon, Gerald)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
13 13 answer|cmp Answer to Complaint|Counterclaim Wed 06/28 1:06 PM
Answer to Complaint Related [+], Counterclaim by Zirmed, Inc. against Michael D. Warner, Liquidating Trustee Filed by Zirmed, Inc. (Landon, Gerald)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Tuesday, June 27, 2017
12 12 misc Involuntary Summons Service Executed Tue 06/27 11:12 AM
Summons Service Executed in an Involuntary Case on Zirmed, Inc. 6/23/2017, Answer Due 7/13/2017 (Filed By Michael D. Warner, Liquidating Trustee ). (Kane, John)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 16, 2017
11 11 court Summons Issued Fri 06/16 9:45 AM
Summons Issued on Zirmed, Inc. Date Issued 6/16/2017. (smur)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 14, 2017
10 10 misc Summons - Request for Issuance Wed 06/14 11:05 AM
Request for Issuance of Summons on Zirmed, Inc.. (Filed By Michael D. Warner, Liquidating Trustee ). (Kane, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 18, 2017
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 05/18 11:55 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 05/18/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Generic Order
Thursday, May 11, 2017
8 8 order Generic Order Tue 05/16 11:51 AM
Order Authorizing Trustees Motion for Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing adversary Proceedings Commenced by Trustee Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 502, 547, 549 and 550 Signed on 5/11/2017 Related [+] (dsta)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,6 Adversary Order Setting Hearing
Sunday, April 30, 2017
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 04/30 11:59 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 04/30/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Adversary Order Setting Hearing
Friday, April 28, 2017
6 6 order Adversary Order Setting Hearing Fri 04/28 1:48 PM
Order Setting Scheduling Conference Related [+] Scheduling Conference set for 5/19/2017 at 09:45 AM at Houston, Courtroom 400 (DRJ). (aalo)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Tuesday, March 21, 2017
5 5 court Summons Issued Tue 03/21 10:47 AM
Summons Issued on Zirmed, Inc. Date Issued 3/21/2017. (mmap)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 17, 2017
4 4 misc Summons - Request for Issuance Fri 03/17 9:49 AM
Request for Issuance of Summons on Zirmed, Inc.. (Kane, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 01, 2017
3 3 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 03/02 12:06 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 03/01/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Order Regarding the Exchange of Exhibits and Witness lists in all contested matters and adversary proceedings
Monday, February 27, 2017
crditcrd none Mon 02/27 3:05 PM
Receipt of Complaint 17-03096 [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 18765087. Fee amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Saturday, February 25, 2017
2 2 order Judge Jones Order Regarding Exhibit and Witness Lists (Adversary) Sat 02/25 6:30 AM
Related: [-]
Friday, February 24, 2017
1 1 cmp Complaint [system event] Fri 02/24 10:14 PM
Adversary case 17-03096 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) Complaint by Michael D. Warner, Liquidating Trustee against Zirmed, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (Kane, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Adversary Cover Sheet