University General Health System, Inc.
Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | David R Jones |
Case #: | 4:15-bk-31086 |
Case Filed: | Feb 27, 2015 |
Terminated: | Jan 28, 2021 |
Plan Confirmed: | Jan 11, 2016 |
Discharge Objection Deadline: | Sep 01, 2015 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Est. Liabilities | $10,000,001 to $50 million |
Nature of Business | Health Care Business |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
University General Health System, Inc.
7501 Fannin St
Houston, TX 77054-1938 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
UGHS Autimis Billing, Inc.
7501 Fannin St
Houston, TX 77054-1938 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
UGHS Autimis Coding, Inc.
7501 Fannin St
Houston, TX 77054-1938 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
UGHS ER Services, Inc.
7501 Fannin St
Houston, TX 77054-1938 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
UGHS Hospitals, Inc.
7501 Fannin St
Houston, TX 77054-1938 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
UGHS Management Services, Inc.
7501 Fannin St
Houston, TX 77054-1938 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
UGHS Support Services, Inc.
7501 Fannin St
Houston, TX 77054-1938 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
University General Hospital, LP
7501 Fannin St
Houston, TX 77054-1938 |
Represented By
|
Debtor
University Hospital Systems, LLP
7501 Fannin St
Houston, TX 77054-1938 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
3rd Party Plaintiff
Timothy Duffey
312 S. Friendswood Drive 312 S. Friendswood Drive
Friendswood, TX 77546 |
Represented By
|
Creditor Committee
The Official Joint Committee of Unsecured Creditors
600 Travis Street, Ste. 2800
Houston, TX 77002 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ANN LOVE and ANGELA MARSHALL on their own behalf and on behalf of all other persons similarly situated
Post Office Drawer 3103
Mobile, AL 36652 |
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Office of the US Trustee 515 Rusk Ave Ste 3516
Houston, TX 77002 |
Represented By
|
1. | University General Health System files for Chapter 11 to restructure finances, operations - Houston Business Journal (bizjournals.com) |
Submitted Mon 03/02/2015 | |
Docket last updated: 11 minutes ago |
Wednesday, March 27, 2024 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 03/27 11:08 AM
Adversary Case 4:17-ap-3073 Closed. (rgs4) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 03/27 11:09 AM
Adversary Case 4:17-ap-3074 Closed. (rgs4) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 03/27 11:10 AM
Adversary Case 4:17-ap-3075 Closed. (rgs4) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 03/27 11:10 AM
Adversary Case 4:17-ap-3076 Closed. (rgs4) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 03/27 11:11 AM
Adversary Case 4:17-ap-3077 Closed. (rgs4) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 03/27 11:12 AM
Adversary Case 4:17-ap-3078 Closed. (rgs4) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 03/27 11:13 AM
Adversary Case 4:17-ap-3080 Closed. (rgs4) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 03/27 11:14 AM
Adversary Case 4:17-ap-3079 Closed. (rgs4) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 03/27 11:15 AM
Adversary Case 4:17-ap-3081 Closed. (rgs4) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 03/27 11:15 AM
Adversary Case 4:17-ap-3082 Closed. (rgs4) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 03/27 11:16 AM
Adversary Case 4:17-ap-3083 Closed. (rgs4) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 03/27 11:17 AM
Adversary Case 4:17-ap-3084 Closed. (rgs4) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 03/27 11:18 AM
Adversary Case 4:17-ap-3085 Closed. (rgs4) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 03/27 11:36 AM
Adversary Case 4:17-ap-3087 Closed. (rgs4) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 03/27 11:37 AM
Adversary Case 4:17-ap-3088 Closed. (rgs4) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 03/27 11:37 AM
Adversary Case 4:17-ap-3089 Closed. (rgs4) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 03/27 11:38 AM
Adversary Case 4:17-ap-3090 Closed. (rgs4) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 03/27 11:39 AM
Adversary Case 4:17-ap-3091 Closed. (rgs4) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 03/27 11:40 AM
Adversary Case 4:17-ap-3092 Closed. (rgs4) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 03/27 11:50 AM
Adversary Case 4:17-ap-3093 Closed. (rgs4) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 03/27 11:51 AM
Adversary Case 4:17-ap-3094 Closed. (rgs4) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 03/27 11:51 AM
Adversary Case 4:17-ap-3095 Closed. (rgs4) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 03/27 11:52 AM
Adversary Case 4:17-ap-3096 Closed. (rgs4) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 03/27 11:55 AM
Adversary Case 4:17-ap-3099 Closed. (rgs4) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 03/27 12:37 PM
Adversary Case 4:17-ap-3101 Closed. (rgs4) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 03/27 12:42 PM
Adversary Case 4:17-ap-3102 Closed. (rgs4) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 03/27 12:43 PM
Adversary Case 4:17-ap-3103 Closed. (rgs4) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 03/27 12:43 PM
Adversary Case 4:17-ap-3104 Closed. (rgs4) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 03/27 12:44 PM
Adversary Case 4:17-ap-3105 Closed. (rgs4) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 03/27 12:46 PM
Adversary Case 4:17-ap-3107 Closed. (rgs4) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 03/27 12:47 PM
Adversary Case 4:17-ap-3108 Closed. (rgs4) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 03/27 12:48 PM
Adversary Case 4:17-ap-3109 Closed. (rgs4) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 03/27 12:49 PM
Adversary Case 4:17-ap-3110 Closed. (rgs4) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 03/27 12:50 PM
Adversary Case 4:17-ap-3111 Closed. (rgs4) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 03/27 12:51 PM
Adversary Case 4:17-ap-3112 Closed. (rgs4) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 03/27 12:52 PM
Adversary Case 4:17-ap-3113 Closed. (rgs4) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 03/27 12:52 PM
Adversary Case 4:17-ap-3114 Closed. (rgs4) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 03/27 12:53 PM
Adversary Case 4:17-ap-3115 Closed. (rgs4) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 03/27 12:54 PM
Adversary Case 4:17-ap-3116 Closed. (rgs4) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 03/27 1:08 PM
Adversary Case 4:17-ap-3117 Closed. (rgs4) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 03/27 1:11 PM
Adversary Case 4:17-ap-3118 Closed. (rgs4) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 03/27 1:12 PM
Adversary Case 4:17-ap-3119 Closed. (rgs4) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 03/27 1:13 PM
Adversary Case 4:17-ap-3120 Closed. (rgs4) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 03/27 1:14 PM
Adversary Case 4:17-ap-3121 Closed. (rgs4) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 03/27 1:14 PM
Adversary Case 4:17-ap-3123 Closed. (rgs4) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 03/27 1:15 PM
Adversary Case 4:17-ap-3124 Closed. (rgs4) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 03/27 1:16 PM
Adversary Case 4:17-ap-3125 Closed. (rgs4) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 03/27 1:16 PM
Adversary Case 4:17-ap-3127 Closed. (rgs4) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 03/27 1:18 PM
Adversary Case 4:17-ap-3128 Closed. (rgs4) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 03/27 1:19 PM
Adversary Case 4:17-ap-3129 Closed. (rgs4) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 03/27 1:28 PM
Adversary Case 4:17-ap-3131 Closed. (rgs4) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 03/27 1:29 PM
Adversary Case 4:17-ap-3132 Closed. (rgs4) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 03/27 1:30 PM
Adversary Case 4:17-ap-3133 Closed. (rgs4) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 03/27 1:31 PM
Adversary Case 4:17-ap-3134 Closed. (rgs4) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 03/27 1:31 PM
Adversary Case 4:17-ap-3135 Closed. (rgs4) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 03/27 1:32 PM
Adversary Case 4:17-ap-3136 Closed. (rgs4) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 03/27 1:34 PM
Adversary Case 4:17-ap-3137 Closed. (rgs4) |
||
Friday, March 22, 2024 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Fri 03/22 11:02 AM
Adversary Case 4:17-ap-3063 Closed. (rgs4) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Fri 03/22 11:03 AM
Adversary Case 4:17-ap-3064 Closed. (rgs4) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Fri 03/22 11:04 AM
Adversary Case 4:17-ap-3065 Closed. (rgs4) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Fri 03/22 11:05 AM
Adversary Case 4:17-ap-3066 Closed. (rgs4) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Fri 03/22 11:14 AM
Adversary Case 4:17-ap-3068 Closed. (rgs4) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Fri 03/22 11:15 AM
Adversary Case 4:17-ap-3070 Closed. (rgs4) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Fri 03/22 11:16 AM
Adversary Case 4:17-ap-3071 Closed. (rgs4) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Fri 03/22 12:41 PM
Adversary Case 4:17-ap-3072 Closed. (rgs4) |