Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:15-bk-31086

Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:David R Jones
Case #: 4:17-ap-03099
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Feb 24, 2017
Terminated:Mar 27, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
American Express
Represented By
American Express
contact info
Plaintiff
Michael D. Warner, Liquidating Trustee
Represented By
John J. Kane
Kane Russell, Et Al.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 1:11 PM CDT
Wednesday, March 27, 2024
court Close Adversary Case Wed 03/27 11:55 AM
Adversary Case 4:17-ap-3099 Closed. (rgs4)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 17, 2023
18 18 trustee Remark (batch) Tue 10/17 10:38 PM
Remark: Judge Christopher M. Lopez added to case. Involvement of Judge David R Jones Terminated. . (DawnaKelly)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 21, 2018
17 17 notice Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Thu 06/21 2:12 PM
Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Filed by Michael D. Warner, Liquidating Trustee (Kane, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 22, 2018
16 16 notice Notice Thu 03/22 2:55 PM
Notice of Change of Firm Affiliation of Gary L. Pate . Filed by American Express (Pate, Gary)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 16, 2017
15 15 notice Notice Thu 11/16 3:57 PM
Notice of Initial Disclosures . Filed by American Express (Pate, Gary)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice Thu 11/16 9:55 AM
Notice of Initial Disclosures . Filed by Michael D. Warner, Liquidating Trustee (Kane, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 15, 2017
13 13 notice Notice Wed 11/15 3:51 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice . Filed by American Express (Pate, Gary)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 30, 2017
12 12 misc Statement Fri 06/30 8:38 AM
Statement Corporate Disclosure (Filed By American Express ). (Cooper, Jamie)
Related: [-]
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 06/30 8:12 AM
Answer to Complaint Related [+] Filed by American Express (Cooper, Jamie)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Wednesday, June 14, 2017
10 10 misc Involuntary Summons Service Executed Wed 06/14 2:06 PM
Summons Service Executed in an Involuntary Case on American Express 3/27/2017, Answer Due 4/17/2017 (Filed By Michael D. Warner, Liquidating Trustee ). (Kane, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 18, 2017
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 05/18 11:55 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 05/18/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Generic Order
Thursday, May 11, 2017
8 8 order Generic Order Tue 05/16 11:44 AM
Order Authorizing Trustees Motion for Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing adversary Proceedings Commenced by Trustee Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 502, 547, 549 and 550 Signed on 5/11/2017 Related [+] (dsta)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,6 Adversary Order Setting Hearing
Sunday, April 30, 2017
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 04/30 11:59 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 04/30/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Adversary Order Setting Hearing
Friday, April 28, 2017
6 6 order Adversary Order Setting Hearing Fri 04/28 1:50 PM
Order Setting Scheduling Conference Related [+] Scheduling Conference set for 5/19/2017 at 09:45 AM at Houston, Courtroom 400 (DRJ). (aalo)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Tuesday, March 21, 2017
5 5 court Summons Issued Tue 03/21 10:55 AM
Summons Issued on American Express Date Issued 3/21/2017. (mmap)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 17, 2017
4 4 misc Summons - Request for Issuance Fri 03/17 9:53 AM
Request for Issuance of Summons on American Express. (Kane, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 01, 2017
3 3 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 03/02 12:06 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 03/01/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Order Regarding the Exchange of Exhibits and Witness lists in all contested matters and adversary proceedings
Monday, February 27, 2017
crditcrd none Mon 02/27 3:05 PM
Receipt of Complaint 17-03099 [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 18765087. Fee amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Saturday, February 25, 2017
2 2 order Judge Jones Order Regarding Exhibit and Witness Lists (Adversary) Sat 02/25 6:30 AM
Related: [-]
Friday, February 24, 2017
1 1 cmp Complaint [system event] Fri 02/24 10:23 PM
Adversary case 17-03099 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) Complaint by Michael D. Warner, Liquidating Trustee against American Express. Fee Amount $350 (Kane, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Adversary Cover Sheet