Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:15-bk-31086

Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:David R Jones
Case #: 4:17-ap-03107
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Feb 24, 2017
Terminated:Mar 27, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Cook Medical LLC
Represented By
Cook Medical LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Michael D. Warner, Liquidating Trustee
Represented By
John J. Kane
Kane Russell, Et Al.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 1:11 PM CDT
Wednesday, March 27, 2024
court Close Adversary Case Wed 03/27 12:46 PM
Adversary Case 4:17-ap-3107 Closed. (rgs4)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 17, 2023
12 12 trustee Remark (batch) Tue 10/17 10:38 PM
Remark: Judge Christopher M. Lopez added to case. Involvement of Judge David R Jones Terminated. . (DawnaKelly)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 16, 2017
11 11 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 08/16 11:28 AM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Of Cook Medical, LLC Filed by Michael D. Warner, Liquidating Trustee (Kane, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 19, 2017
10 10 misc Involuntary Summons Service Executed Mon 06/19 2:39 PM
Summons Service Executed in an Involuntary Case on Cook Medical LLC 3/28/2017, Answer Due 4/17/2017 (Filed By Michael D. Warner, Liquidating Trustee ). (Kane, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 18, 2017
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 05/18 11:55 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 05/18/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Generic Order
Thursday, May 11, 2017
8 8 order Generic Order Tue 05/16 11:52 AM
Order Authorizing Trustees Motion for Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing adversary Proceedings Commenced by Trustee Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 502, 547, 549 and 550 Signed on 5/11/2017 Related [+] (dsta)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,6 Adversary Order Setting Hearing
Sunday, April 30, 2017
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 04/30 11:59 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 04/30/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Adversary Order Setting Hearing
Friday, April 28, 2017
6 6 order Adversary Order Setting Hearing Fri 04/28 1:56 PM
Order Setting Scheduling Conference Related [+] Scheduling Conference set for 5/19/2017 at 10:00 AM at Houston, Courtroom 400 (DRJ). (aalo)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Tuesday, March 21, 2017
5 5 court Summons Issued Tue 03/21 11:04 AM
Summons Issued on Cook Medical LLC Date Issued 3/21/2017. (mmap)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 17, 2017
4 4 misc Summons - Request for Issuance Fri 03/17 2:18 PM
Request for Issuance of Summons on Cook Medical LLC. (Kane, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 01, 2017
3 3 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 03/02 12:06 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 03/01/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Order Regarding the Exchange of Exhibits and Witness lists in all contested matters and adversary proceedings
Tuesday, February 28, 2017
crditcrd none Tue 02/28 10:16 AM
Receipt of Complaint 17-03107 [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 18767561. Fee amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Saturday, February 25, 2017
2 2 order Judge Jones Order Regarding Exhibit and Witness Lists (Adversary) Sat 02/25 6:30 AM
Related: [-]
Friday, February 24, 2017
1 1 cmp Complaint [system event] Fri 02/24 10:49 PM
Adversary case 17-03107 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) Complaint by Michael D. Warner, Liquidating Trustee against Cook Medical LLC. Fee Amount $350 (Kane, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Adversary Cover Sheet