Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:15-bk-31086

Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:David R Jones
Case #: 4:17-ap-03117
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Feb 24, 2017
Terminated:Mar 27, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Henry Small
Represented By
Henry Small
contact info
Plaintiff
Michael D. Warner, Liquidating Trustee
Represented By
John J. Kane
Kane Russell, Et Al.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 1:11 PM CDT
Wednesday, March 27, 2024
court Close Adversary Case Wed 03/27 1:08 PM
Adversary Case 4:17-ap-3117 Closed. (rgs4)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 17, 2023
16 16 trustee Remark (batch) Tue 10/17 10:38 PM
Remark: Judge Christopher M. Lopez added to case. Involvement of Judge David R Jones Terminated. . (DawnaKelly)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 08, 2018
15 15 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 10/08 3:36 PM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Michael D. Warner, Liquidating Trustee (Kane, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 04, 2018
court Courtroom Minutes (Text) Tue 09/04 5:21 PM
Courtroom Minutes. Time Hearing Held: 2:34 PM. Appearances: John Kane for the Plaintiff Related [+] The Plaintiff's Counsel to contact the Court's Case Manager for a reset date on a hearing on the Motion for Default Judgment. (VrianaPortillo)
Related: [-] 12 Motion for Default Judgment
Friday, August 31, 2018
14 14 misc Exhibit List Fri 08/31 3:01 PM
Exhibit List (Filed By Michael D. Warner, Liquidating Trustee ) Related [+] (Kane, John)
Related: [-] 12 Motion for Default Judgment
Thursday, August 16, 2018
13 13 notice Notice Thu 08/16 11:13 AM
Notice of Hearing - September 4, 2018 @ 2:30 PM . Related [+] Filed by Michael D. Warner, Liquidating Trustee (Kane, John)
Related: [-] 12 Motion for Default Judgment
Wednesday, August 15, 2018
court Certificate of Notice Wed 08/15 8:37 AM
Certificate of Email Notice. Contacted John Kane. Movant to notice all interested parties and file a certificate of service with the court Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 9/4/2018 at 02:30 PM at Houston, Courtroom 400 (DRJ). (aalo)
Related: [-] 12 Motion for Default Judgment
Tuesday, June 12, 2018
12 12 motion Default Judgment Tue 06/12 4:14 PM
Motion for Default Judgment. Filed by Michael D. Warner, Liquidating Trustee (Kane, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Thursday, November 16, 2017
11 11 notice Notice Thu 11/16 10:29 AM
Notice of Initial Disclosures . Filed by Michael D. Warner, Liquidating Trustee (Kane, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 26, 2017
10 10 misc Involuntary Summons Service Executed Mon 06/26 5:03 PM
Summons Service Executed in an Involuntary Case on Henry Small 6/9/2017, Answer Due 6/29/2017 (Filed By Michael D. Warner, Liquidating Trustee ). (Kane, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 18, 2017
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 05/18 11:55 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 05/18/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Generic Order
Thursday, May 11, 2017
8 8 order Generic Order Tue 05/16 12:00 PM
Order Authorizing Trustees Motion for Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing adversary Proceedings Commenced by Trustee Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 502, 547, 549 and 550 Signed on 5/11/2017 Related [+] (dsta)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,6 Adversary Order Setting Hearing
Sunday, April 30, 2017
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 04/30 11:59 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 04/30/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Adversary Order Setting Hearing
Friday, April 28, 2017
6 6 order Adversary Order Setting Hearing Fri 04/28 2:19 PM
Order Setting Scheduling Conference Related [+] Scheduling Conference set for 5/19/2017 at 10:15 AM at Houston, Courtroom 400 (DRJ). (aalo)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Tuesday, March 21, 2017
5 5 court Summons Issued Tue 03/21 11:20 AM
Summons Issued on Henry Small Date Issued 3/21/2017. (mmap)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 17, 2017
4 4 misc Summons - Request for Issuance Fri 03/17 3:57 PM
Request for Issuance of Summons on Henry Small. (Kane, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 01, 2017
3 3 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 03/02 12:06 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 03/01/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Order Regarding the Exchange of Exhibits and Witness lists in all contested matters and adversary proceedings
Tuesday, February 28, 2017
crditcrd none Tue 02/28 10:19 AM
Receipt of Complaint 17-03117 [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 18767641. Fee amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Saturday, February 25, 2017
2 2 order Judge Jones Order Regarding Exhibit and Witness Lists (Adversary) Sat 02/25 6:30 AM
Related: [-]
Friday, February 24, 2017
1 1 cmp Complaint [system event] Fri 02/24 11:23 PM
Adversary case 17-03117 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) Complaint by Michael D. Warner, Liquidating Trustee against Henry Small. Fee Amount $350 (Kane, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Adversary Cover Sheet