Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:15-bk-31086

Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:David R Jones
Case #: 4:17-ap-03129
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Feb 25, 2017
Terminated:Mar 27, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Medical Concepts, LLC
Represented By
Medical Concepts, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Michael D. Warner, Liquidating Trustee
Represented By
John J. Kane
Kane Russell, Et Al.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 1:11 PM CDT
Wednesday, March 27, 2024
court Close Adversary Case Wed 03/27 1:19 PM
Adversary Case 4:17-ap-3129 Closed. (rgs4)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 17, 2023
15 15 trustee Remark (batch) Tue 10/17 10:38 PM
Remark: Judge Christopher M. Lopez added to case. Involvement of Judge David R Jones Terminated. . (DawnaKelly)
Related: [-]
Saturday, September 08, 2018
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 09/08 11:50 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 09/08/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13 Order on Motion for Default Judgment
Tuesday, September 04, 2018
13 13 order Default Judgment Wed 09/05 5:47 PM
Order Granting Request for Entry of Default Against Defendant Medical Concepts, LLC Related [+] Signed on 9/4/2018. (VrianaPortillo)
Related: [-] 10
court Courtroom Minutes (Text) Tue 09/04 5:25 PM
Courtroom Minutes. Time Hearing Held: 2:34 PM. Appearances: John Kane for the Plaintiff Related [+] For the reasons stated on the record, the Court will grant the Request for Entry of Default Against Defendant Medical Concepts, LLC. Order to be entered. (VrianaPortillo)
Related: [-] 10 Motion for Default Judgment
Friday, August 31, 2018
12 12 misc Exhibit List Fri 08/31 3:03 PM
Exhibit List (Filed By Michael D. Warner, Liquidating Trustee ) Related [+] (Kane, John)
Related: [-] 10 Motion for Default Judgment
Thursday, August 16, 2018
11 11 notice Notice Thu 08/16 11:19 AM
Notice of Hearing - September 4, 2018 @ 2:30 PM . Related [+] Filed by Michael D. Warner, Liquidating Trustee (Kane, John)
Related: [-] 10 Motion for Default Judgment
Wednesday, August 15, 2018
court Certificate of Notice Wed 08/15 8:40 AM
Certificate of Email Notice. Contacted John Kane. Movant to notice all interested parties and file a certificate of service with the court Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 9/4/2018 at 02:30 PM at Houston, Courtroom 400 (DRJ). (aalo)
Related: [-] 10 Motion for Default Judgment
Tuesday, June 12, 2018
10 10 motion Default Judgment Tue 06/12 4:34 PM
Motion for Default Judgment. Filed by Michael D. Warner, Liquidating Trustee (Kane, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Thursday, November 16, 2017
9 9 notice Notice Thu 11/16 10:38 AM
Notice of Initial Disclosures . Filed by Michael D. Warner, Liquidating Trustee (Kane, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 27, 2017
8 8 misc Involuntary Summons Service Executed Tue 06/27 10:13 AM
Summons Service Executed in an Involuntary Case on Medical Concepts, LLC 3/24/2017, Answer Due 4/13/2017 (Filed By Michael D. Warner, Liquidating Trustee ). (Kane, John)
Related: [-]
Sunday, April 30, 2017
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 04/30 11:59 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 04/30/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Adversary Order Setting Hearing
Friday, April 28, 2017
6 6 order Adversary Order Setting Hearing Fri 04/28 2:29 PM
Order Setting Scheduling Conference Related [+] Scheduling Conference set for 5/19/2017 at 10:30 AM at Houston, Courtroom 400 (DRJ). (aalo)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Tuesday, March 21, 2017
5 5 court Summons Issued Tue 03/21 1:44 PM
Summons Issued on Medical Concepts, LLC Date Issued 3/21/2017. (mmap)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 17, 2017
4 4 misc Summons - Request for Issuance Fri 03/17 5:10 PM
Request for Issuance of Summons on Medical Concepts, LLC. (Kane, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 01, 2017
3 3 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 03/02 12:06 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 03/01/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Order Regarding the Exchange of Exhibits and Witness lists in all contested matters and adversary proceedings
Tuesday, February 28, 2017
crditcrd none Tue 02/28 10:22 AM
Receipt of Complaint 17-03129 [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 18767670. Fee amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Saturday, February 25, 2017
2 2 order Judge Jones Order Regarding Exhibit and Witness Lists (Adversary) Sat 02/25 6:30 AM
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint [system event] Sat 02/25 12:03 AM
Adversary case 17-03129 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) Complaint by Michael D. Warner, Liquidating Trustee against Medical Concepts, LLC. Fee Amount $350 (Kane, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Adversary Cover Sheet