Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:15-bk-31086

Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:David R Jones
Case #: 4:17-ap-03136
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Feb 25, 2017
Terminated:Mar 27, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Texas Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By
Texas Mutual Insurance Company
contact info
Plaintiff
Michael D. Warner, Liquidating Trustee
Represented By
John J. Kane
Kane Russell, Et Al.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 1:11 PM CDT
Wednesday, March 27, 2024
court Close Adversary Case Wed 03/27 1:32 PM
Adversary Case 4:17-ap-3136 Closed. (rgs4)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 17, 2023
23 23 trustee Remark (batch) Tue 10/17 10:38 PM
Remark: Judge Christopher M. Lopez added to case. Involvement of Judge David R Jones Terminated. . (DawnaKelly)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 18, 2019
22 22 notice Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Mon 02/18 11:59 AM
Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Against Texas Mutual Insurance Company Filed by Michael D. Warner, Liquidating Trustee (Kane, John)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 16, 2018
court Certificate of Notice Fri 11/16 9:05 AM
Certificate of Email Notice. The parties have settled this matter and will be filing settlement documents soon. The pretrial conference set for 11/19/2018 is cancelled. Related [+] The parties will contact the court once the stipulation of dismissal has been filed. (aalo)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Friday, November 09, 2018
21 21 misc Stipulation Fri 11/09 3:21 PM
Stipulation By Texas Mutual Insurance Company and Plaintiff Michael D. Warner, Liquidating Trustee. Does this document include an agreed order or otherwise request that the judge sign a document? No. (Filed By Texas Mutual Insurance Company ). (Cumings, Brian)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 05, 2018
20 20 misc Exhibit List Fri 10/05 4:04 PM
Witness List, Exhibit List (Filed By Michael D. Warner, Liquidating Trustee ) Related [+] (Kane, John)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,17 Order Setting Hearing
19 19 misc Witness List Fri 10/05 2:21 PM
Witness List (Filed By Texas Mutual Insurance Company ). (Cumings, Brian)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 20, 2018
18 18 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 09/21 12:01 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 09/20/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 17 Order Setting Hearing
Monday, September 17, 2018
17 17 order Setting Hearing Tue 09/18 10:36 AM
Agreed Scheduling Order Signed on 9/17/2018 Hearing scheduled for 11/19/2018 at 02:00 PM at Houston, Courtroom 400 (DRJ). (aalo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 11, 2018
16 16 misc Proposed Order Submission After Hearing (Greensheet) Tue 09/11 4:46 PM
Proposed Order Submission After Hearing (Filed By Michael D. Warner, Liquidating Trustee ) Related [+] (Kane, John)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Tuesday, September 04, 2018
court Courtroom Minutes (Text) Tue 09/04 5:43 PM
Courtroom Minutes. Time Hearing Held: 2:56 PM. Appearances: John Kane for the Plaintiff, Brian Cumings for Texas Mutual Related [+] The Parties to upload a proposed agreed order regarding dates. The Proposed Agreed Order to be filed this week. A Final Pre-Trial is scheduled for 11/19/2018 at 10:30 AM at Houston, Courtroom 400 (DRJ). (VrianaPortillo)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,13 Adversary Order Setting Hearing
Friday, August 31, 2018
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 08/31 11:54 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 08/31/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13 Adversary Order Setting Hearing
Wednesday, August 29, 2018
14 14 notice Notice Wed 08/29 4:35 PM
Notice of Status/Scheduling Conference . Related [+] Filed by Michael D. Warner, Liquidating Trustee (Kane, John)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
13 13 order Adversary Order Setting Hearing Wed 08/29 10:07 AM
Order Setting Scheduling Conference Related [+] Scheduling Conference set for 9/4/2018 at 02:30 PM at Houston, Courtroom 400 (DRJ). (aalo)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Thursday, November 16, 2017
12 12 notice Notice Thu 11/16 10:55 AM
Notice of Initial Disclosures . Filed by Michael D. Warner, Liquidating Trustee (Kane, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 21, 2017
11 11 misc Involuntary Summons Service Executed Wed 06/21 4:56 PM
Summons Service Executed in an Involuntary Case on Texas Mutual Insurance Company 3/28/2017, Answer Due 4/17/2017 (Filed By Michael D. Warner, Liquidating Trustee ). (Kane, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 18, 2017
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 05/18 11:55 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 05/18/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9 Generic Order
Thursday, May 11, 2017
9 9 order Generic Order Tue 05/16 12:28 PM
Order Authorizing Trustees Motion for Order Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing adversary Proceedings Commenced by Trustee Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 502, 547, 549 and 550 Signed on 5/11/2017 Related [+] (dsta)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,7 Adversary Order Setting Hearing
Sunday, April 30, 2017
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 04/30 11:59 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 04/30/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Adversary Order Setting Hearing
Friday, April 28, 2017
7 7 order Adversary Order Setting Hearing Fri 04/28 2:33 PM
Order Setting Scheduling Conference Related [+] Scheduling Conference set for 5/19/2017 at 10:45 AM at Houston, Courtroom 400 (DRJ). (aalo)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Tuesday, April 18, 2017
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 04/18 1:15 PM
Answer to Complaint Related [+] Filed by Texas Mutual Insurance Company (Cumings, Brian)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Tuesday, March 21, 2017
5 5 court Summons Issued Tue 03/21 1:54 PM
Summons Issued on Texas Mutual Insurance Company Date Issued 3/21/2017. (mmap)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 17, 2017
4 4 misc Summons - Request for Issuance Fri 03/17 5:20 PM
Request for Issuance of Summons on Texas Mutual Insurance Company. (Kane, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 01, 2017
3 3 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 03/02 12:06 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 03/01/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Order Regarding the Exchange of Exhibits and Witness lists in all contested matters and adversary proceedings
Tuesday, February 28, 2017
crditcrd none Tue 02/28 10:23 AM
Receipt of Complaint 17-03136 [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 18767702. Fee amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Saturday, February 25, 2017
2 2 order Judge Jones Order Regarding Exhibit and Witness Lists (Adversary) Sat 02/25 6:30 AM
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint [system event] Sat 02/25 12:38 AM
Adversary case 17-03136 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) Complaint by Michael D. Warner, Liquidating Trustee against Texas Mutual Insurance Company. Fee Amount $350 (Kane, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Adversary Cover Sheet