Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 15
Judge:Brendan Linehan Shannon
Case #: 1:17-bk-10438
Case Filed:Feb 28, 2017
Terminated:Jun 08, 2018

Debtor
Axios Logistics Solutions Inc.
3422 Old Capitol Trl Ste 700
Wilmington, DE 19808-6124
Represented By
Mark L. Desgrosseilliers
Womble Carlyle Sandridge & Rice, LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
Foreign Representative
A. Farber & Partners, Inc.
Represented By
Mark L. Desgrosseilliers
Womble Carlyle Sandridge & Rice, LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801


Docket last updated: 34 minutes ago
Monday, June 11, 2018
95 95 misc Affidavit/Declaration of Service Mon 06/11 1:30 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Service Related [+]. Filed by A. Farber & Partners, Inc.. (Matthews, Gene)
Related: [-] 93 ,94 93 ,94
Friday, June 08, 2018
court Close Bankruptcy Case Fri 06/08 4:36 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (Mml)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 07, 2018
94 94 order Final Decree Thu 06/07 12:46 PM
Final Decree And Order Closing Chapter 15 Cases And Discharging The Foreign Representative. Related [+] Order Signed on 6/7/2018. (BJM)
Related: [-] 92
93 93 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED) - Notice Thu 06/07 11:24 AM
HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Filed by A. Farber & Partners, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 6/11/2018 at 09:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #1, Wilmington, Delaware. (Patterson, Morgan)
Related: [-]
92 92 misc Certificate of No Objection(Aty) Thu 06/07 10:23 AM
Certificate of No Objection Regarding Motion for Order and Final Decree Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 105, 330, and 1517 Closing Chapter 15 Cases and Discharging the Foreign Representative Related [+] Filed by A. Farber & Partners, Inc.. (Patterson, Morgan)
Related: [-] 86 ,87
Att: 1 Exhibit A