Member Case
Lead case is: 1:17-bk-10438

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 15
Judge:Brendan Linehan Shannon
Case #: 1:17-bk-10440
Case Filed:Feb 28, 2017
Terminated:Jun 08, 2018

Debtor
Axios Mobile Assets, Inc.
400 Grand River Ave Ste 200
Detroit, MI 48226-1508
Represented By
Mark L. Desgrosseilliers
Womble Carlyle Sandridge & Rice, LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
Foreign Representative
A. Farber & Partners, Inc.
Represented By
Mark L. Desgrosseilliers
Womble Carlyle Sandridge & Rice, LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801


Docket last updated: 11 minutes ago
Friday, June 08, 2018
court Close Bankruptcy Case Fri 06/08 4:38 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (Mml)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 07, 2018
4 4 order Final Decree Thu 06/07 12:47 PM
Final Decree And Order Closing Chapter 15 Cases And Discharging The Foreign Representative. Signed on 6/7/2018 (BJM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 01, 2017
3 3 crditcrd none Wed 03/01 5:02 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Petition Foreign Proceeding (Chapter 15) 17-10440 [misc,volpfp15] (1717.00). Receipt Number 8361007, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Order-Joint Admin Wed 03/01 3:51 PM
Order Directing Joint Administration of Related Chapter 15 Cases for Procedural Purposes Only (Case Nos. 17-10438 17-10443 17-10440 and 17-10444 . An order has been entered directing joint administration of this chapter 15 case with the chapter 15 case of Axios Logistics Solutions Inc. Docket No. 17-10438 All Further pleadings and other papers filed in this case shall be filed in, and all further docket entries shall be made in, the docket of Axios Logistics Solutions Inc. Docket No. 17-10438 Signed on 3/1/2017 (LCN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 28, 2017
1 1 misc RETIRED - Petition Foreign Proceeding (Chapter 15) Tue 02/28 12:04 PM
Chapter 15 Petition for Recognition of Foreign Proceeding. Fee Amount $1717 Filed by A. Farber & Partners, Inc., Axios Mobile Assets, Inc.. (Desgrosseilliers, Mark)
Related: [-]
court Case Assigned Tue 02/28 12:18 PM
Judge Brendan Linehan Shannon added to case (BA)
Related: [-]