Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 6:16-bk-10759

Kansas Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Dale L Somers
Case #: 6:17-ap-05035
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Feb 28, 2017
Terminated:Mar 28, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
Kevin Kaiser
875 Birch Drive, Unit 1
Lena, IL 61048
Represented By
Kevin Kaiser
contact info
Plaintiff
Carl B. Davis
Davis & Jack, L.L.C. 2121 W Maple PO Box 12686
Wichita, KS 67277
Represented By
Kenneth H. Jack
Davis & Jack LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/22/2025 1:07 PM CDT
Thursday, October 14, 2021
court Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC auto) Thu 10/14 9:45 PM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Complaint. Receipt number 147203, Fee Amount $350.00. (adiuser)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 30, 2018
29 29 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 03/30 11:54 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 03/30/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 28 Order on Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Wednesday, March 28, 2018
28 28 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Wed 03/28 10:16 AM
Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Related [+] Signed on 3/28/2018. (waa)
Related: [-] 27
court Close Adversary Case Wed 03/28 10:17 AM
Adversary Case 6:17-ap-5035 Closed . (waa)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 27, 2018
27 27 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Tue 03/27 1:56 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Carl B. Davis (Jack, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 08, 2018
26 26 notice Withdraw Document Thu 02/08 2:04 PM
Notice to Withdraw Document Filed by Plaintiff Carl B. Davis Related [+]. (Jack, Kenneth)
Related: [-] 24 Motion to Compel Answers to Interrogatories from Defendant Filed by Plaintiff Carl B. Davis
Friday, October 20, 2017
25 25 notice Objection Deadline Fri 10/20 3:41 PM
Notice of Objection Deadline. Proposed Hearing to be held 12/07/2017 at 9:00 am. Certificate of Service on 10/20/2017. Filed by Plaintiff Carl B. Davis Related [+]. Objections due by 11/9/2017. (Jack, Kenneth)
Related: [-] 24 Motion to Compel Answers to Interrogatories from Defendant Filed by Plaintiff Carl B. Davis
24 24 motion Compel Fri 10/20 3:38 PM
Motion to Compel Answers to Interrogatories from Defendant Filed by Plaintiff Carl B. Davis (Jack, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 08, 2017
23 23 notice Service Fri 09/08 2:38 PM
Notice of Service of Discovery, with Certificate of Service. Filed by Plaintiff Carl B. Davis . (Jack, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Sunday, July 16, 2017
22 22 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sun 07/16 11:51 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 07/16/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 21 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Friday, July 14, 2017
21 21 order Withdraw As Attorney Fri 07/14 12:29 PM
Order Granting Motion To Withdraw As Attorney Related [+] Signed on 7/14/2017. (wdd)
Related: [-] 18
Wednesday, June 28, 2017
20 20 misc Affidavit Wed 06/28 3:39 PM
Affidavit Re: Service of Motion to Withdraw Filed by W. Thomas Gilman on behalf of Kevin Kaiser Related [+] (Gilman, W.)
Related: [-] 18 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney filed by W. Thomas Gilman Filed by Defendant Kevin Kaiser (Gilman, W.)
Wednesday, June 14, 2017
19 19 notice Objection Deadline Wed 06/14 10:04 AM
Notice of Objection Deadline. Proposed Hearing to be held 8/10/2017 at 9:00 am. Certificate of Service on 6/14/2017. Filed by Defendant Kevin Kaiser Related [+]. Objections due by 7/12/2017. (Gilman, W.)
Related: [-] 18 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney filed by W. Thomas Gilman Filed by Defendant Kevin Kaiser (Gilman, W.)
18 18 motion Withdraw As Attorney Wed 06/14 10:03 AM
Motion to Withdraw as Attorney filed by W. Thomas Gilman Filed by Defendant Kevin Kaiser (Gilman, W.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 01, 2017
17 17 notice Service Thu 06/01 2:18 PM
Notice of Service of Defendants' Rule 26(a)(1) and Rule 7026 Disclosures, with Certificate of Service. Filed by Defendant Kevin Kaiser . (Gilman, W.)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Generic Notice Thu 06/01 2:15 PM
Notice of Change of Firm Address. Filed by Defendant Kevin Kaiser . (Gilman, W.)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Service Thu 06/01 1:18 PM
Notice of Service of Trustee's Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures, with Certificate of Service. Filed by Plaintiff Carl B. Davis . (Jack, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 18, 2017
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 05/18 11:51 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 05/18/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13 Order Adopting Report of Parties Planning Meeting
Tuesday, May 16, 2017
13 13 order Order Adopting Report of Parties Planning Meeting Tue 05/16 11:34 AM
Order Adopting Report of Parties Planning Meeting Signed on 5/16/2017 Status hearing to be held on 11/21/2017 at 10:15 AM at Wichita Room 228. (wed)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 15, 2017
12 12 misc Report of Parties Planning Meeting Mon 05/15 9:12 AM
Report of Parties Planning Meeting Filed by W. Thomas Gilman on behalf of Kevin Kaiser . (Gilman, W.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 13, 2017
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Thu 04/13 11:56 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 04/13/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Notice of Hearing
Tuesday, April 11, 2017
10 10 notice Hearing Tue 04/11 9:44 AM
Notice of Hearing Filed by USBC. . (wed)
Related: [-]
court Hearing Set (Other) Tue 04/11 9:45 AM
Hearing Set Related [+]. Pre-Trial Scheduling Conference set for 5/23/2017 at 10:15 AM at Wichita Room 228. (wed)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 17-05035 Complaint by Kenneth H. Jack on behalf of Carl B. Davis against Kevin Kaiser. Receipt Number Deferred, Fee Amount $350 Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (Attachments: # 1 Adversary Cover Sheet) filed by Plaintiff Carl B. Davis
Monday, April 10, 2017
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 04/10 2:36 PM
Answer to Complaint with Certificate of Service Filed by Kevin Kaiser Related [+]. (Gilman, W.)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 17-05035 Complaint by Kenneth H. Jack on behalf of Carl B. Davis against Kevin Kaiser. Receipt Number Deferred, Fee Amount $350 Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (Attachments: # 1 Adversary Cover Sheet) filed by Plaintiff Carl B. Davis
Wednesday, April 05, 2017
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Thu 04/06 12:07 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 04/05/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Order on Motion to Extend/Shorten Time
Monday, April 03, 2017
7 7 order Extend/Shorten Time Mon 04/03 8:58 AM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time Related [+] Signed on 4/3/2017. (wed)
Related: [-] 6
Friday, March 31, 2017
6 6 motion Extend/Shorten Time Fri 03/31 3:47 PM
Motion to Extend Time to File Answer or Otherwise Plead Filed by Defendant Kevin Kaiser (Gilman, W.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Clerk's Order
5 5 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Fri 03/31 3:45 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by W. Thomas Gilman with Certificate of Service Filed by W. Thomas Gilman on behalf of Kevin Kaiser . (Gilman, W.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 01, 2017
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 03/01 11:39 AM
Summons Service Executed on Kevin Kaiser 3/1/2017 (Jack, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
3 3 court Summons Issued Wed 03/01 8:09 AM
Summons Issued on Kevin Kaiser Date Issued 3/1/2017, Answer Due 3/31/2017 . (wed)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 28, 2017
2 2 cmp Summons Request Tue 02/28 1:15 PM
Request for Issuance of Summons(es) by Kenneth H. Jack on behalf of Carl B. Davis - summons(es) requested on Kevin Kaiser (Jack, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 02/28 1:13 PM
Adversary case 17-05035 Complaint by Kenneth H. Jack on behalf of Carl B. Davis against Kevin Kaiser. Receipt Number Deferred, Fee Amount $350 Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (Jack, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Adversary Cover Sheet