Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:15-bk-10458

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Christopher S Sontchi
Case #: 1:17-ap-50060
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Mar 02, 2017
Terminated:Dec 19, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
Airgas Southwest Inc.
Represented By
Airgas Southwest Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Cal Dive Offshore Contractors, Inc.
2500 CityWest Boulevard Suite 2200
Houston, TX 77042
Represented By
Jason A. Gibson
The Rosner Law Group LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 1:05 PM EDT
Tuesday, December 19, 2017
court Close Adversary Case Tue 12/19 1:07 PM
Adversary Case 1:17-ap-50060 Closed (LMD)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 18, 2017
24 24 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 12/18 4:17 PM
Stipulation of Dismissal Filed by David W. Carickhoff. (Gellert, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 15, 2017
23 23 order Scheduling Order Wed 11/15 3:20 PM
Scheduling Order Signed on 11/15/2017 (DMC)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 13, 2017
22 22 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi) Mon 11/13 12:00 PM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by David W. Carickhoff. Hearing scheduled for 11/15/2017 at 12:45 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. (Faris, S. Alexander)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 13, 2017
21 21 misc Certificate of Service Fri 10/13 12:00 PM
Certificate of Service Regarding Notice of Adjourment Filed by David W. Carickhoff. (Gellert, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 09, 2017
20 20 notice Adjourned/Rescheduled Hearing - Notice Mon 10/09 9:18 AM
Notice of Adjourned/Rescheduled Hearing Regarding Pre-Trial Conference Filed by David W. Carickhoff. Hearing scheduled for 11/15/2017 at 12:45 PM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. (Gellert, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 07, 2017
19 19 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 09/07 10:37 AM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Airgas Southwest Inc. Mediation due date: 01/5/2018.(Miller, Kathleen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, September 05, 2017
18 18 2 pgs order Order Tue 09/05 11:44 AM
Order Denying Trustee's Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Debtors. Signed on 9/5/2017 (GM)
Related: [-]
17 17 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED) - Notice Tue 09/05 10:20 AM
HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Filed by David W. Carickhoff. Hearing scheduled for 9/5/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. (Faris, S. Alexander)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 01, 2017
16 16 3 pgs order Order Fri 09/01 2:22 PM
Order Granting Chapter 7 Trustee's Motion to Enlarge the Deadline to Effect Service of Original Process in Adversary Proceedings through and Including (I) October 30, 2017 with Respect to Defendants Located within the United States and (II) August 29,2018 with Respect to Defendants Located Outside the United States Order Signed on 9/1/2017 (LMD)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 31, 2017
15 15 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi) Thu 08/31 11:49 AM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by David W. Carickhoff. Hearing scheduled for 9/5/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. (Faris, S. Alexander)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 16, 2017
14 14 misc Certificate of Service Wed 08/16 12:16 PM
Certificate of Service of the Motion of Chapter 7 Trustee for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Debtors Pursuant to Sections 544, 547, 548, 549 and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by David W. Carickhoff. (Faris, S. Alexander)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Certificate of Service Wed 08/16 11:59 AM
Certificate of Service of the Second Motion of the Chapter 7 Trustee for an Order Enlarging Time to Effect Service of Original Process Filed by David W. Carickhoff. (Faris, S. Alexander)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 15, 2017
12 12 motion Approve - Motion Tue 08/15 5:21 PM
Motion to Approve Chapter 7 Trustee's Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Debtors Pursuant to Sections 544, 547, 548, 549, and 550 of the Bankruptcy Code Filed by David W. Carickhoff. Hearing scheduled for 9/5/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 8/29/2017. (Faris, S. Alexander)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Extend - Motion Tue 08/15 2:26 PM
Second Motion to Extend Time to Effectuate Service of Original Process Filed by David W. Carickhoff. Hearing scheduled for 9/5/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 8/29/2017. (Faris, S. Alexander)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 11, 2017
10 10 cmp Amended Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Fri 08/11 2:15 PM
Amended Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Airgas Southwest Inc.. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 10/13/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 10/10/2017. (Gellert, Ronald)
Related: [-] ument1
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, August 01, 2017
9 9 notice Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Tue 08/01 1:24 PM
Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Airgas Southwest Inc.. Related [+] Pretrial Conference set for 10/13/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. Tickle due by: 10/2/2017. (Gellert, Ronald)
Related: [-] ument1 ,8
Att: 1 Notice of Dispute Resolution Alternatives
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
Thursday, July 27, 2017
8 8 notice Substitution of Counsel - Notice Thu 07/27 10:25 AM
Notice of Substitution of Counsel and Notice of Substitution of Plaintiff Filed by David W. Carickhoff. (Gellert, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 13, 2017
7 7 misc Affidavit of Service Tue 06/13 12:54 PM
Affidavit of Service for Order Granting Chapter 7 Trustee's Motion to Enlarge the Deadline to Effect Service of Original Process in Adversary Proceedings Through and Including August 29, 2017 Filed by David W. Carickhoff. (Carickhoff, David)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED) - Notice Tue 06/13 10:56 AM
HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Filed by David W. Carickhoff. Hearing scheduled for 6/14/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. (Carickhoff, David)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Order Tue 06/13 9:26 AM
Order Granting Chapter 7 Trustee's Motion To Enlarge The Deadline To Effect Service Of Original Process In Adversary Proceedings Through And Including August 29, 2017. Signed on 6/12/2017 (JAF)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 09, 2017
4 4 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi) Fri 06/09 4:32 PM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by David W. Carickhoff. Hearing scheduled for 6/14/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. (Carickhoff, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 23, 2017
3 3 motion Extend - Motion Tue 05/23 4:21 PM
Motion to Extend Time to Effect Service of Original Process Filed by David W. Carickhoff. Hearing scheduled for 6/14/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 6/7/2017. (Carickhoff, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 03, 2017
2 2 crditcrd none Fri 03/03 9:14 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 17-50060 CSS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 8363183, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 02, 2017
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Thu 03/02 12:37 PM
Adversary case 17-50060 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547, 548 and 550 by Cal Dive Offshore Contractors, Inc. against Airgas Southwest Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 05/31/2017. (Gibson, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A