Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Mary F Walrath
Case #: 1:15-bk-10458
Case Filed:Mar 03, 2015
Creditor Meeting:Apr 13, 2015
Claims Deadline:Aug 10, 2015

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors50-99
Est. Assets$100,000,001 to $500 million
Est. Liabilities $100,000,001 to $500 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Cal Dive International, Inc.
2500 CityWest Boulevard Suite 2200
Houston, TX 77042
Represented By
Mark D. Collins
Richards, Layton & Finger, P.A.
contact info
Andrew M. Parlen
Times Square Tower
contact info
George Davis
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
contact info
Daniel S. Shamah
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
contact info
Suzzanne Uhland
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
contact info
Michael Joseph Merchant
Richards Layton & Finger, P.A.
contact info
Rachel Layne Biblo
Richards, Layton & Finger, P.A.
contact info
Peter Friedman
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
contact info
Amanda R. Steele
Richards, Layton And Finger
contact info
Last checked: Monday Apr 13, 2015 6:16 PM EDT
Claims Agent
Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC
www.kccllc.com 2335 Alaska Ave
El Segundo, CA 90245
Represented By
Albert Kass
Kurtzman Carson Consultants, LLC
contact info
Creditor
Maritime Management Services, Inc.
Hanson Baker Ludlow Drumheller, PS 2229 112th Avenue NE, #200
Bellevue, WA 98004
Represented By
Douglas R. Cameron
Hanson Baker Ludlow Drumheller P.S.
contact info
Merrilee A. MacLean
Hanson Baker Ludlow Drumheller, P.S.
contact info
Creditor
Fugro Satellite Positioning, Inc.
Represented By
Stephen L. Williamson
Montgomery Barnett,llp
contact info
Jeremy David Rush
Montgomery Barnett, LLP
contact info
Thomas D. Walsh
Marshall Dennehey
contact info
Creditor
Gulf Atlantic Towing, L.L.C.
Represented By
Stephen L. Williamson
Montgomery Barnett,llp
contact info
Jeremy David Rush
Montgomery Barnett, LLP
contact info
Thomas D. Walsh
Marshall Dennehey
contact info
Creditor
Gulf Resource Management, Inc.
Represented By
Michael Joseph Joyce
Cross & Simon, LLC
contact info
Christopher T. Caplinger
Lugenbuhl Wheaton Peck Ranki
contact info
Benjamin Kadden
Lugenbuhl, Wheaton, Peck, Rankin & Hubbard
contact info
Stewart F. Peck
Lugenbuhl Wheaton Peck, Etal
contact info
Creditor
Harris CapRock Communications, Inc.
Represented By
Edward L. Rothberg
Hoover Slovacek LLP
contact info
Terry Josh Judd
Hoover Slovacek LLP
contact info
Scott J. Leonhardt
The Rosner Law Group LLC
contact info
Creditor
Harris County
Post Office Box 3064
Houston, TX 77253
Represented By
John P. Dillman
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Jefferson County
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP 1148 Park Street
Beaumont, TX 77701
Represented By
John P. Dillman
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Louisiana Machinery Co., L.L.C.
Represented By
Michael Joseph Joyce
Cross & Simon, LLC
contact info
Christopher T. Caplinger
Lugenbuhl Wheaton Peck Ranki
contact info
Benjamin Kadden
Lugenbuhl, Wheaton, Peck, Rankin & Hubbard
contact info
Stewart F. Peck
Lugenbuhl Wheaton Peck, Etal
contact info
Creditor
Gulf Copper & Manufacturing Corp.
Represented By
Mark Minuti
Saul Ewing LLP
contact info
Creditor
Jeffrey Allen Mauldin
Represented By
Charles J. Brown
Gellert Scali Busenkell & Brown LLC
contact info
Creditor
Natixis, New York Branch
Represented By
Brian M. Schenker
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Kimberly Ellen Connolly Lawson
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Kurt F. Gwynne
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Claudia Z. Springer
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Creditor
Smith Marine Towing Corporation
Represented By
Norman C. Sullivan, Jr.
Fowler Rodriguez
contact info
W. Jacob Gardner, Jr.
Fowler Rodriguez
contact info
Creditor
Tennessee Gas Pipeline Company, LLC
Law Office of Patricia Williams Prewitt Attn: Patti Prewitt 10953 Vista Lake Ct.
Navasota, TX 77868
Represented By
Patricia Williams Prewitt
Law Office Of Patricia Williams Prewitt
contact info
Creditor
Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts
Represented By
Rachel Obaldo
C/o Texas Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Creditor
The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, N.A.
Represented By
Stephanie Wickouski
Bryan Cave
contact info
Mark Andrew Fink
Montgomery, Mccracken, Walker & Rhoads
contact info
Michelle McMahon
Bryan Cave LLP
contact info
Creditor
United Tugs, Inc.
Represented By
Michael Joseph Joyce
Cross & Simon, LLC
contact info
Christopher T. Caplinger
Lugenbuhl Wheaton Peck Ranki
contact info
Benjamin Kadden
Lugenbuhl, Wheaton, Peck, Rankin & Hubbard
contact info
Stewart F. Peck
Lugenbuhl Wheaton Peck, Etal
contact info
Creditor
Fugro Chance, Inc.
Represented By
Stephen L. Williamson
Montgomery Barnett,llp
contact info
Jeremy David Rush
Montgomery Barnett, LLP
contact info
Thomas D. Walsh
Marshall Dennehey
contact info
Creditor
Ad Hoc Group of Convertible Noteholders
Represented By
Evelyn J. Meltzer
Pepper Hamilton LLP
contact info
David B. Stratton
Pepper Hamilton LLP
contact info
Meredith A. Lahaie
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP
contact info
Michael S. Stamer
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer Feld LLP
contact info
John Henry Schanne, II
Pepper Hamilton LLP
contact info
Creditor
Airgas USA, LLC
Represented By
KJ van Krieken
Airgas, Inc.
contact info
Kathleen M. Miller
Smith, Katzenstein & Jenkins LLP
contact info
Creditor
Aspen Insurance Company
Represented By
Gina D Shearer
Langley LLP
contact info
Keith A Langley
Langley LLP
contact info
Creditor
Blue Marlin Services of Acadiana, LLC
Represented By
Brian L. Arban
Hiller & Arban, LLC
contact info
Creditor
Bollinger Larose, L.L.C.
Represented By
Stephen L. Williamson
Montgomery Barnett,llp
contact info
Jeremy David Rush
Montgomery Barnett, LLP
contact info
Thomas D. Walsh
Marshall Dennehey
contact info
Creditor
Bollinger Morgan City, L.L.C.
Represented By
Stephen L. Williamson
Montgomery Barnett,llp
contact info
Jeremy David Rush
Montgomery Barnett, LLP
contact info
Thomas D. Walsh
Marshall Dennehey
contact info
Creditor
Bollinger Quick Repair, L.L.C.
Represented By
Stephen L. Williamson
Montgomery Barnett,llp
contact info
Jeremy David Rush
Montgomery Barnett, LLP
contact info
Thomas D. Walsh
Marshall Dennehey
contact info
Creditor
Bollinger Texas, L.P.
Represented By
Stephen L. Williamson
Montgomery Barnett,llp
contact info
Jeremy David Rush
Montgomery Barnett, LLP
contact info
Thomas D. Walsh
Marshall Dennehey
contact info
Creditor
Cochrane Technologies, Inc.
Represented By
Michael Joseph Joyce
Cross & Simon, LLC
contact info
Christopher T. Caplinger
Lugenbuhl Wheaton Peck Ranki
contact info
Benjamin Kadden
Lugenbuhl, Wheaton, Peck, Rankin & Hubbard
contact info
Stewart F. Peck
Lugenbuhl Wheaton Peck, Etal
contact info
Creditor
Fugro McClelland Marine Geosciences, Inc.
Represented By
Stephen L. Williamson
Montgomery Barnett,llp
contact info
Jeremy David Rush
Montgomery Barnett, LLP
contact info
Creditor Committee
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
Represented By
Evelyn J. Meltzer
Pepper Hamilton LLP
contact info
David B. Stratton
Pepper Hamilton LLP
contact info
Meredith A. Lahaie
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP
contact info
Michael S. Stamer
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer Feld LLP
contact info
Kevin M. Eide
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP
contact info
Abid Qureshi
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP
contact info
Nicholas P. Stabile
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP
contact info
John Henry Schanne, II
Pepper Hamilton LLP
contact info
Lauren R. Lifland
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Jacob O'Neil and Adam Tuma
Represented By
Mark T Hurford
Campbell & Levine, LLC
contact info
Interested Party
Wells Fargo Bank, National Association
Represented By
Jeffrey M. Wolf
Greenberg Traurig, LLP
contact info
Nancy A. Mitchell
Greenberg Traurig, LLP
contact info
Dennis A. Meloro
Greenberg Traurig
contact info
Interested Party
Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By
Glenn E. Siegel
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Rachel Jaffe Mauceri
Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Stuart M. Brown
Dla Piper Llp (us)
contact info
P. Sabin Willett
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Elaine Fenna
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Daniel N. Brogan
Dla Piper LLP
contact info
R. Craig Martin
contact info
Interested Party
BNP Paribas
Represented By
Howard S. Beltzer
Mayer Brown LLP
contact info
Michael F Lotito
Mayer Brown LLP
contact info
Michael R. Nestor
Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor
contact info
Kara Hammond Coyle
Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Oceaneering International, Inc.
Represented By
Stacy L. Newman
Ashby & Geddes
contact info
Gregory A. Taylor
Ashby & Geddes
contact info
Interested Party
PacerPro, Inc.
Four Embarcadero Center Suite 1400
San Francisco, CA 94111
Represented By
Gavin McGrane
Mcgrane LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Essex Crane Rental Corp.
Represented By
Joseph Emil Shickich, Jr.
Riddell Williams P.S.
contact info
Jami B. Nimeroff
Brown Wynn Mcgarry Nimeroff LLC
contact info
Joseph E. Shickich, Jr.
Riddell Williams P.S.
contact info
Interested Party
Adams and Reese, LLP
701 Poydras Street, Suite 4500
New Orleans, LA 70139
Represented By
John M. Duck
Adams And Reese, LLP
contact info
Other Prof.
ABC Funding, LLC
Represented By
Gregory Francis Pesce
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Alan Michael Root
Blank Rome LLP
contact info
Patrick Nash
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Regina S. Kelbon
Bank Rome LLP
contact info
Stockholder
Ken LeSuer
115 Broad Cove Drive
Montgomery, TX 77356
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19899
Represented By
Benjamin A. Hackman
Office Of The United States Trustee
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
844 King Street, Room 2207 Lockbox #35
Wilmington, DE 19899
Represented By
Benjamin A. Hackman
Office Of The United States Trustee
contact info


1. Bankruptcy opens another chapter in oil downturn (houstonchronicle.com)
Submitted Sat 03/07/2015
2. Oil and gas contractor Cal Dive files for bankruptcy (reuters.com)
Submitted Tue 03/03/2015
Docket last updated: 03/02/2015 7:00 PM EST
Tuesday, March 03, 2015
1 1 18 pgs misc RETIRED - Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Tue 03/03 5:29 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1717. Filed by Cal Dive International, Inc.. (Collins, Mark)
Related: [-]
2 2 14 pgs motion Joint Administration - Motion (Multi) Tue 03/03 5:45 PM
Motion for Joint Administration Filed by Affiliated Marine Contractors, Inc., CDI Renewables, LLC, Cal Dive International, Inc., Cal Dive Offshore Contractors, Inc., Fleet Pipeline Services, Inc., Gulf Offshore Construction, Inc.. (Collins, Mark)
Related: [-]
3 3 37 pgs motion Motion to Pay Critical Trade Vendor Claims Tue 03/03 5:47 PM
Motion to Pay Critical Trade Vendor Claims (Debtors' Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders Authorizing the Debtors to Pay Prepetition Claims of Critical Vendors and Granting Related Relief) Filed By Cal Dive International, Inc. (Steele, Amanda)
Related: [-]
4 4 26 pgs motion Chapter 11 First Day Motions Tue 03/03 5:49 PM
Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions (Debtors' Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders (I) Authorizing Payment of Certain Prepetition Taxes and (II) Granting Related Relief) Filed By Cal Dive International, Inc. (Merchant, Michael)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Chapter 11 First Day Motions Tue 03/03 5:50 PM
Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions (Debtors' Motion for Entry of an Order Confirming the Protections of Sections 362, 365, and 525, of the Bankruptcy Code and Restraining any Action in Contravention Thereof) Filed By Cal Dive International, Inc. (Steele, Amanda)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Chapter 11 First Day Motions Tue 03/03 5:53 PM
Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions (Debtors' Motion for Entry of an Order Authorizing Quinn Hebert to Act as Foreign Representative Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 1505 ) Filed By Cal Dive International, Inc. (Merchant, Michael)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Motion to Maintain Bank Accounts Tue 03/03 5:56 PM
Motion to Maintain Bank Accounts (Debtors' Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders (I) Authorizing Continued Use of Existing Cash Management System and Bank Accounts; (II) Waiving Certain United States Trustee Requirements; (III) Authorizing Continued Performance of Intercompany Transactions; and (IV) Granting Related Relief ) Filed By Cal Dive International, Inc. (Merchant, Michael)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Chapter 11 First Day Motions Tue 03/03 5:59 PM
Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions (Debtors' Motion for the Entry of Interim and Final Orders Establishing (I) Notice and Hearing Procedures for Transferring, or Claiming a Worthless Stock Deduction for, Equity Securities of Cal Dive International, Inc. and (II) an Effective Date for Notice and Sell-Down Procedures for Transferring Claims Against the Debtors) Filed By Cal Dive International, Inc. (Steele, Amanda)
Related: [-]
9 9 31 pgs motion Chapter 11 First Day Motions Tue 03/03 6:00 PM
Motion Regarding Chapter 11 First Day Motions (Debtors' Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders (I) Authorizing the Debtor to (A) Maintain, Continue, and Renew Their Prepetition Insurance Policies and Pay All Obligations in Respect Thereof and (B) Continue Their Premium Financing Program and Pay All Obligations in Respect Thereof; and (II) Granting Related Relief) Filed By Cal Dive International, Inc. (Merchant, Michael)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Application to Appoint Claims/Noticing Agent Tue 03/03 6:03 PM
Application to Appoint Claims/Noticing Agent KURTZMAN CARSON CONSULTANTS, LLC Filed By Cal Dive International, Inc. (Merchant, Michael)
Related: [-]
11 11 38 pgs motion Motion Prohibiting Utilities from Discontinuing Service Tue 03/03 6:04 PM
Motion Prohibiting Utilities from Discontinuing Service (Debtors' Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders (I) Prohibiting Utilities from Altering, Refusing, or Discontinuing Service; (II) Approving the Debtors' Proposed Form of Adequate Assurance of Payment to Utilities; and (III) Establishing Procedures for Resolving Objections to the Debtors' Proposed Form of Adequate Assurance) Filed By Cal Dive International, Inc. (Steele, Amanda)
Related: [-]
12 12 37 pgs motion Motion to Pay Employee Wages Tue 03/03 6:13 PM
Motion to Pay Employee Wages (Debtors' Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders (I) Authorizing the Debtors to (A) Pay Certain Employee Compensation and Benefits, (B) Maintain and Continue Such Benefits and Other Employee-Related Programs and (II) Authorizing Financial Institutions to Honor and Process Checks and Transfers ) Filed By Cal Dive International, Inc. (Merchant, Michael)
Related: [-]
13 13 crditcrd none Tue 03/03 6:37 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 15-10458 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt Number 7476127, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc List of Creditors Tue 03/03 6:45 PM
List of Creditors (Notice of Filing of Creditor Matrix) Filed by Cal Dive International, Inc.. (Biblo, Rachel)
Related: [-]
15 15 66 pgs first Affidavit/Declaration in Support of First Day Motion Tue 03/03 10:51 PM
Affidavit/Declaration in Support of First Day Motion (Quinn J. Hebert's Declaration in Support of the Debtors' Chapter 11 Petition and First Day Pleadings) Filed By Cal Dive International, Inc. (Steele, Amanda)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion File Under Seal - Motion (B) Tue 03/03 11:38 PM
Motion to File Under Seal (Debtors' Motion for Entry of an Order Authorizing the Debtors to File Under Seal Certain Schedules to the DIP Facility Agreement) Filed by Cal Dive International, Inc.. (Collins, Mark)
Related: [-]
17 17 399 pgs motion Approve Debtor In Possession Financing - Motion Tue 03/03 11:42 PM
Motion to Approve Debtor In Possession Financing Related [+] Filed By Cal Dive International, Inc. (Collins, Mark)
Related: [-] 16
18 18 motion Approve Debtor In Possession Financing - Motion Tue 03/03 11:48 PM
[SEALED] Motion to Approve Debtor In Possession Financing Related [+] Filed By Cal Dive International, Inc. (Collins, Mark)
Related: [-] 16 ,17
19 19 9 pgs misc Declaration in Support Tue 03/03 11:53 PM
Declaration in Support (Declaration of John D. Bittner in Support of Debtors' Motion (I) Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 105, 361, 362, 363, 364, and 507 Authorizing the Debtors to (A) Obtain Postpetition Financing, (B) Grant Senior Liens and Superpriority Administrative Expense Status, and (C) Utilize Cash Collateral of Pre-Petition Secured Parties; (II) Granting Adequate Protection to Pre-Petition Secured Parties Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 361, 362, 363, and 364; (III) Scheduling a Final Hearing; and (IV) Granting Related Relief) Related [+] Filed by Cal Dive International, Inc.. (Collins, Mark)
Related: [-] 17 ,18