Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:15-bk-10458

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Christopher S Sontchi
Case #: 1:17-ap-50190
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Mar 02, 2017
Terminated:Jul 28, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
Ince & Co.
Represented By
Ince & Co.
contact info
Plaintiff
Cal Dive Offshore Contractors, Inc.
2500 CityWest Boulevard Suite 2200
Houston, TX 77042
Represented By
Jason A. Gibson
The Rosner Law Group LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Wednesday, November 15, 2017
13 13 order Scheduling Order Wed 11/15 3:20 PM
Scheduling Order Signed on 11/15/2017 (DMC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 05, 2017
12 12 2 pgs order Order Tue 09/05 12:17 PM
Order Denying Trustee's Motion for Orders Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought by Debtors. Signed on 9/5/2017 (GM)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED) - Notice Tue 09/05 10:20 AM
HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Filed by David W. Carickhoff. Hearing scheduled for 9/5/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. (Faris, S. Alexander)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 31, 2017
10 10 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi) Thu 08/31 11:49 AM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by David W. Carickhoff. Hearing scheduled for 9/5/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. (Faris, S. Alexander)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 28, 2017
court Close Adversary Case Fri 07/28 10:51 AM
Adversary Case 1:17-ap-50190 Closed (JAF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 27, 2017
9 9 notice Dismissal - Notice Thu 07/27 3:02 PM
Notice of Dismissal Filed by David W Carickhoff, Ch. 7 Trustee (Gellert, Ronald)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Substitution of Counsel - Notice Thu 07/27 10:25 AM
Notice of Substitution of Counsel and Notice of Substitution of Plaintiff Filed by David W. Carickhoff. (Gellert, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 13, 2017
7 7 misc Affidavit of Service Tue 06/13 12:54 PM
Affidavit of Service for Order Granting Chapter 7 Trustee's Motion to Enlarge the Deadline to Effect Service of Original Process in Adversary Proceedings Through and Including August 29, 2017 Filed by David W. Carickhoff. (Carickhoff, David)
Related: [-]
6 6 order Order Tue 06/13 11:02 AM
Order Granting Chapter 7 Trustee's Motion To Enlarge The Deadline To Effect Service Of Original Process In Adversary Proceedings Through And Including August 29, 2017. Signed on 6/12/2017 (JAF)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED) - Notice Tue 06/13 10:56 AM
HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Filed by David W. Carickhoff. Hearing scheduled for 6/14/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. (Carickhoff, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 09, 2017
4 4 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi) Fri 06/09 4:32 PM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by David W. Carickhoff. Hearing scheduled for 6/14/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. (Carickhoff, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 23, 2017
3 3 motion Extend - Motion Tue 05/23 4:21 PM
Motion to Extend Time to Effect Service of Original Process Filed by David W. Carickhoff. Hearing scheduled for 6/14/2017 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #6, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 6/7/2017. (Carickhoff, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 06, 2017
2 2 crditcrd none Mon 03/06 11:57 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint 17-50190 CSS) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number 8365716, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 02, 2017
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Thu 03/02 7:08 PM
Adversary case 17-50190 Complaint to Avoid and Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547, 548 and 550 by Cal Dive Offshore Contractors, Inc. against Ince & Co.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 05/31/2017. (Gibson, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A