Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors v. Abrasive Products and Equipment, LLC
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:15-bk-20107
Lead BK case is: 2:15-bk-20107
Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | David R Jones |
Case #: | 2:17-ap-02002 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Mar 06, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 22, 2024 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Abrasive Products and Equipment, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Friday, March 22, 2024 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Fri 03/22 10:39 AM
Adversary Case 2:17-ap-2002 Closed. (rgs4) |
||
Tuesday, October 17, 2023 | ||
court
Case Reassigned-Adversary
Tue 10/17 9:23 AM
Judge Christopher M. Lopez added to case. Involvement of Judge David R Jones Terminated. (DawnaKelly) |
||
Friday, May 19, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding
Fri 05/19 5:18 PM
Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Filed by Abrasive Products and Equipment, LLC, Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors (Sather, Stephen) |
|
Sunday, April 30, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sun 04/30 11:59 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/30/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, April 28, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
order
Adversary Order Setting Hearing
Fri 04/28 2:36 PM
Order Setting Scheduling Conference Scheduling Conference set for 6/28/2017 at 10:30 AM at Corpus Christi, 1133 N Shoreline. (aalo) |
|
Friday, April 21, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 04/21 8:32 AM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Abrasive Products and Equipment, LLC (Marmon, Shelley) |
|
Saturday, April 08, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sat 04/08 11:49 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/08/2017. (Admin.) |
|
14 | 14
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sat 04/08 11:49 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/08/2017. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, April 07, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Generic Motion (Adversary)
Fri 04/07 3:24 PM
Motion to Vacate Stipulation and Order Filed by Underwater Services International, Inc. (Maraist, Kevin) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order - Order Granting Motion to Vacate Stipulation and Order | ||
Thursday, April 06, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Generic Order
Thu 04/06 4:44 PM
Order Granting Stipulation to Extend Date for Defendant Signed on 4/6/2017 (aalo) |
|
11 | 11
order
Generic Order
Thu 04/06 4:42 PM
Order Granting Stipulation to Extend Date for Defendant Signed on 4/6/2017 (aalo) |
|
Wednesday, April 05, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Stipulation
Wed 04/05 11:03 AM
Stipulation By Underwater Services International, Inc. and Plaintiff. Does this document include an agreed order or otherwise request that the judge sign a document? Yes. (Filed By Underwater Services International, Inc. ) (Maraist, Kevin) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order - Order Granting Stipulation to Extend Date | ||
Monday, April 03, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Stipulation
Mon 04/03 5:14 PM
Stipulation By Abrasive Products and Equipment, LLC and Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. Does this document include an agreed order or otherwise request that the judge sign a document? Yes. (Filed By Abrasive Products and Equipment, LLC ). (Marmon, Shelley) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, March 10, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Fri 03/10 6:33 PM
Summons Service Executed on Abrasive Products and Equipment, LLC 3/10/2017. (Sather, Stephen) |
|
7 | 7
court
Summons Issued
Fri 03/10 3:17 PM
Summons Issued on Abrasive Products and Equipment, LLC Date Issued 3/10/2017. (BrendaLacy) |
|
Thursday, March 09, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Fri 03/10 12:06 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 03/09/2017. (Admin.) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Summons - Request for Issuance
Thu 03/09 3:40 PM
Request for Issuance of Summons on Abrasive Products and Equipment, LLC. (Sather, Stephen) |
|
4 | 4
court
Summons Issued
Thu 03/09 9:10 AM
Summons Issued on Abrasive Products and Equipment, LLC. Date Issued 3/9/2017. (wbos) |
|
Tuesday, March 07, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Summons - Request for Issuance
Tue 03/07 9:46 AM
Request for Issuance of Summons on Abrasive Products and Equipment, LLC. (Sather, Stephen) |
|
2 | 2
order
Judge Jones Order Regarding Exhibit and Witness Lists (Adversary)
Tue 03/07 6:30 AM
|
|
Monday, March 06, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint [system event]
Mon 03/06 2:38 PM
Adversary case 17-02002 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) Complaint by Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors against Abrasive Products and Equipment, LLC. Fee Amount $350 (Sather, Stephen) |
|
Att: 1 Adversary Cover Sheet |