ESCO Marine, Inc. and Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Christopher M Lopez |
Case #: | 2:15-bk-20107 |
Case Filed: | Mar 07, 2015 |
Creditor Meeting: | Jun 09, 2015 |
Claims Deadline: | Jul 28, 2015 |
Dismissed: | May 07, 2018 |
Type | Corporation |
# of Creditors | 100-199 |
Est. Assets | $10,000,001 to $50 million |
Est. Liabilities | $10,000,001 to $50 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
ESCO Marine, Inc.
16200 Joe Garza, Sr. Road
Brownsville, TX 78521 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Creditor Committee
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
|
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
606 N Carancahua
Corpus Christi, TX 78401 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 38 minutes ago |
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Fri 04/26 2:16 PM
Per the Order entered at doc. 804 in main case 15-20107 this adversary case is dismissed. Adversary Case 2:17-ap-2005 Closed. (rgs4) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Fri 04/26 2:18 PM
Per the Order entered at doc. 804 in main case 15-20107 this adversary case is dismissed. Adversary Case 2:17-ap-2006 Closed. (rgs4) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Fri 04/26 2:19 PM
Per the Order entered at doc. 804 in main case 15-20107 this adversary case is dismissed. Adversary Case 2:17-ap-2007 Closed. (rgs4) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Fri 04/26 2:20 PM
Per the Order entered at doc. 804 in main case 15-20107 this adversary case is dismissed. Adversary Case 2:17-ap-2009 Closed. (rgs4) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Fri 04/26 2:21 PM
Per the Order entered at doc. 804 in main case 15-20107 this adversary case is dismissed. Adversary Case 2:17-ap-2010 Closed. (rgs4) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Fri 04/26 2:21 PM
Adversary Case 2:17-ap-2011 Closed. (rgs4) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Fri 04/26 2:22 PM
Adversary Case 2:17-ap-2016 Closed. (rgs4) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Fri 04/26 2:23 PM
Per the Order entered at doc. 804 in main case 15-20107 this adversary case is dismissed. Adversary Case 2:17-ap-2017 Closed. (rgs4) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Fri 04/26 2:24 PM
Adversary Case 2:17-ap-2019 Closed. (rgs4) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Fri 04/26 2:24 PM
Per the Order entered at doc. 804 in main case 15-20107 this adversary case is dismissed. Adversary Case 2:17-ap-2021 Closed. (rgs4) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Fri 04/26 2:25 PM
Per the Order entered at doc. 804 in main case 15-20107 this adversary case is dismissed. Adversary Case 2:17-ap-2022 Closed. (rgs4) |