Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors v. Komatsu Financial Limited Partnership
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:15-bk-20107
Lead BK case is: 2:15-bk-20107
Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | David R Jones |
Case #: | 2:17-ap-02011 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Mar 06, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 26, 2024 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Komatsu Financial Limited Partnership
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Fri 04/26 2:21 PM
Adversary Case 2:17-ap-2011 Closed. (rgs4) |
||
Tuesday, October 17, 2023 | ||
court
Case Reassigned-Adversary
Tue 10/17 9:27 AM
Judge Christopher M. Lopez added to case. Involvement of Judge David R Jones Terminated. (DawnaKelly) |
||
Wednesday, April 05, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
answer
Response
Wed 04/05 9:58 AM
Response to Complaint to Recover Transfers . Filed by Komatsu Financial Limited Partnership (Aderholt, Ben) |
|
Friday, March 10, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Fri 03/10 12:47 PM
Summons Service Executed on Komatsu Financial Limited Partnership 3/9/2017. (Sather, Stephen) |
|
Thursday, March 09, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Fri 03/10 12:06 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 03/09/2017. (Admin.) |
|
5 | 5
court
Summons Issued
Thu 03/09 9:47 AM
Summons Issued on Komatsu Financial Limited Partnership Date Issued 3/9/2017. (wbos) |
|
Tuesday, March 07, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice
Tue 03/07 10:03 AM
Notice Adversary Coversheet . Filed by Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors (Sather, Stephen) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Summons - Request for Issuance
Tue 03/07 10:00 AM
Request for Issuance of Summons on Komatsu Financial Limited Partnership. (Sather, Stephen) |
|
2 | 2
order
Judge Jones Order Regarding Exhibit and Witness Lists (Adversary)
Tue 03/07 6:30 AM
|
|
Monday, March 06, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint [system event]
Mon 03/06 3:20 PM
Adversary case 17-02011 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) Complaint by Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors against Komatsu Financial Limited Partnership. Fee Amount $350 (Sather, Stephen) |
|
Att: 1 Adversary Cover Sheet |