Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors v. McAllister Towing and Transportation Co., Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:15-bk-20107
Lead BK case is: 2:15-bk-20107
Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | David R Jones |
Case #: | 2:17-ap-02014 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Mar 06, 2017 |
Terminated: | Nov 26, 2018 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
McAllister Towing and Transportation Co., Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Tuesday, October 17, 2023 | ||
court
Case Reassigned-Adversary
Tue 10/17 9:29 AM
Judge Christopher M. Lopez added to case. Involvement of Judge David R Jones Terminated. (DawnaKelly) |
||
Wednesday, November 28, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Thu 11/29 12:09 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 11/28/2018. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, November 26, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
order
Dismissing Adversary Case
Mon 11/26 4:40 PM
Order Dismissing Adversary Case on 11/26/2018 (aalo) |
|
Wednesday, October 10, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Wed 10/10 1:34 PM
Joint Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding. Objections/Request for Hearing Due in 21 days. Filed by McAllister Towing and Transportation Co., Inc. (Simms, J) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, April 10, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 04/10 3:06 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by McAllister Towing and Transportation Co., Inc. (Simms, J) |
|
Friday, March 10, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Fri 03/10 12:56 PM
Summons Service Executed on McAllister Towing and Transportation Co., Inc. 3/9/2017. (Sather, Stephen) |
|
Thursday, March 09, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Fri 03/10 12:06 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 03/09/2017. (Admin.) |
|
4 | 4
court
Summons Issued
Thu 03/09 1:39 PM
Summons Issued on McAllister Towing and Transportation Co., Inc. Date Issued 3/9/2017. (wbos) |
|
Tuesday, March 07, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Summons - Request for Issuance
Tue 03/07 10:09 AM
Request for Issuance of Summons on MCAllister Towing & Transportation Co., Inc.. (Sather, Stephen) |
|
2 | 2
order
Judge Jones Order Regarding Exhibit and Witness Lists (Adversary)
Tue 03/07 6:30 AM
|
|
Monday, March 06, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint [system event]
Mon 03/06 4:09 PM
Adversary case 17-02014 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) Complaint by Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors against McAllister Towing and Transportation Co., Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (Sather, Stephen) |
|
Att: 1 Adversary Cover Sheet |