Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors v. Safety-Kleen Systems, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:15-bk-20107
Lead BK case is: 2:15-bk-20107
Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | David R Jones |
Case #: | 2:17-ap-02017 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Mar 06, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 26, 2024 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Safety-Kleen Systems, Inc.
5360 Legacy Drive, Building 2, Suite 100
Plano, TX 75024 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Fri 04/26 2:23 PM
Per the Order entered at doc. 804 in main case 15-20107 this adversary case is dismissed. Adversary Case 2:17-ap-2017 Closed. (rgs4) |
||
Tuesday, October 17, 2023 | ||
court
Case Reassigned-Adversary
Tue 10/17 9:30 AM
Judge Christopher M. Lopez added to case. Involvement of Judge David R Jones Terminated. (DawnaKelly) |
||
Thursday, May 11, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Notice of Default
Thu 05/11 11:41 AM
Notice of Default (Filed By Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors ). (Sather, Stephen) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit | ||
Friday, March 10, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Fri 03/10 1:01 PM
Summons Service Executed on Safety-Kleen Systems, Inc. 3/9/2017. (Sather, Stephen) |
|
Thursday, March 09, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Fri 03/10 12:06 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 03/09/2017. (Admin.) |
|
4 | 4
court
Summons Issued
Thu 03/09 3:04 PM
Summons Issued on Safety-Kleen Systems, Inc. Date Issued 3/9/2017. (wbos) |
|
Tuesday, March 07, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Summons - Request for Issuance
Tue 03/07 10:16 AM
Request for Issuance of Summons on Safety-Kleen Systems, Inc.. (Sather, Stephen) |
|
2 | 2
order
Judge Jones Order Regarding Exhibit and Witness Lists (Adversary)
Tue 03/07 6:30 AM
|
|
Monday, March 06, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint [system event]
Mon 03/06 5:28 PM
Adversary case 17-02017 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) Complaint by Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors against Safety-Kleen Systems, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (Sather, Stephen) |
|
Att: 1 Adversary Cover Sheet |