Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:15-bk-44839

Michigan Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Maria L Oxholm
Case #: 2:17-ap-04211
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Mar 13, 2017
Terminated:May 02, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
James R Phillips, Defendant
104 Tennis Villas Dr.
Dana Point, CA 92629
Represented By
James R Phillips
contact info
Defendant
Michael Walker, Defendant
2549 East Bluff Drive No. 312
Newport Beach, CA 92660
Represented By
Michael Walker
contact info
Defendant
Pegasus Capital Management, LLC, Defendant
610 Newport Center Drive Suite 1285
Newport Beach, CA 92660
Represented By
Pegasus Capital Management, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Basil T. Simon
645 Griswold Ste. 3466
Detroit, MI 48226
Represented By
Andrew L. Finn
contact info
Lawrence J. Acker
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:07 PM EDT
Wednesday, October 18, 2017
17 17 order Striking Document (text) Wed 10/18 2:07 PM
Order of the Court to Strike: This pleading is stricken from the record because of the failure to comply with the Notice of Deficient Pleading entered on October 6, 2017 (Docket No. 15) Related [+]. So Ordered by /s/ Judge Maria L. Oxholm (csiku)
Related: [-] Motion to Vacate/Set Aside14 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside filed by Defendant James R Phillips
court Certificate of Mailing (generic virtual) Wed 10/18 2:29 PM
Certificate of Mailing: A Copy of this Related Document was Mailed on 10/18/2019 by the United States Postal Service to the non-ECF Participant, Defendant James R. Phillips, at His/Her Respective Address Appearing in the Records of the Court, 137 Woden Way, Winter Haven, FL 33884. Related [+] (csiku)
Related: [-] 17 Order of the Court to Strike
Sunday, October 08, 2017
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Mon 10/09 12:40 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 10/08/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 15 Deficiency Notice
Friday, October 06, 2017
15 15 court Deficiency Notice (AP) Fri 10/06 9:30 AM
Notice of Deficient Pleading: Notice to Respondent, Proof of Service and Proposed Order Missing Related [+] - Missing Documents Due on 10/13/2017. (Mum, J)
Related: [-] No.14 Motion to Set Aside Default Judgment filed by Defendant James R Phillips
Monday, October 02, 2017
14 14 motion Vacate/Set Aside Fri 10/06 8:15 AM
Letter from James R. Phillips, (construed by the Court as a Motion to Set Aside Default Judgment). (Mum, J)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 02, 2017
13 13 1 pgs order Default Judgment Tue 05/02 3:13 PM
DEFAULT JUDGMENT (Against All Defendants) Related [+]. (Mum, J)
Related: [-] 12
utility Disposition of Adversary Tue 05/02 3:13 PM
Disposition of Adversary 2:17-ap-4211 : Granted by Default Judgment. (Mum, J)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Tue 05/02 3:14 PM
Adversary Case 2:17-ap-4211 Closed. (Mum, J)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 01, 2017
12 12 motion Default Judgment Mon 05/01 11:45 AM
Motion for Default Judgment as to all defendants Filed by Plaintiff Basil T. Simon (Finn, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 18, 2017
11 11 court Clerk's Entry of Default Tue 04/18 8:07 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default of All Defendants - Default Judgment Motion due by 05/02/2017. (Mum, J)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 29, 2017
10 10 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 03/29 12:50 PM
Summons Service Executed on Pegasus Capital Management, LLC 3/16/2017 (Finn, Andrew)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Striking Document (text) Wed 03/29 10:11 AM
Order of the Court to Strike: This pleading is stricken from the record because the PDF is non-compliant - missing case caption Related [+]. So Ordered by /s/ Judge Maria L. Oxholm (csiku)
Related: [-] Summons Service Executed8 Summons Service Executed
Monday, March 27, 2017
8 8 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 03/27 2:01 PM
Summons Service Executed on Pegasus Capital Management, LLC 3/16/2017 (Finn, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 23, 2017
7 7 order Improper Service of Summons/Complaint on Defendant Thu 03/23 11:38 AM
Order Regarding Improper Service of Summons and Complaint on Defendant Pegasus Capital Management, LLC - Proper Service of Summons and Complaint Due on 03/30/2017. (Mum, J)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 14, 2017
6 6 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 03/14 12:13 PM
Summons Service Executed on Michael Walker 3/14/2017 (Finn, Andrew)
Related: [-]
5 5 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 03/14 12:12 PM
Summons Service Executed on James R Phillips 3/14/2017 (Finn, Andrew)
Related: [-]
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 03/14 12:11 PM
Summons Service Executed on Pegasus Capital Management, LLC 3/14/2017 (Finn, Andrew)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Tue 03/14 10:03 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Plaintiff Basil T. Simon. (Acker, Lawrence)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 13, 2017
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Mon 03/13 4:05 PM
Summons Issued on James R Phillips Answer Due 04/12/2017; Michael Walker Answer Due 04/12/2017; Pegasus Capital Management, LLC Answer Due 04/12/2017 (Finn, Andrew)
Related: [-]
1 1 14 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 03/13 4:05 PM
Adversary case 17-04211 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)): Complaint by Basil T. Simon against James R Phillips, Michael Walker, Pegasus Capital Management, LLC. Receipt Number Exempt, Fee Amount of $ 350.00 is Exempt. (Finn, Andrew)
Related: [-]