Michigan Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Maria L Oxholm
Case #: 2:15-bk-44839
Case Filed:Mar 27, 2015
Creditor Meeting:Dec 10, 2015
Claims Deadline:Jan 27, 2016
Converted:Oct 28, 2015
Terminated:Oct 26, 2020

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Health Care Business
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Lifestyle Lift Holding, Inc.
110 Kirts, Suite A
Troy, MI 48084
Represented By
William C. Blasses
contact info
Jeffrey H. Bigelman
Osipov Bigelman, P.C.
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Basil T. Simon
645 Griswold Suite 3466
Detroit, MI 48226
Represented By
Edward Todd Sable
contact info
Steven G. Howell
Dickinson Wright PLLC
contact info
Lawrence J. Acker
contact info
Stephen P. Stella
contact info
U.S. Trustee
Daniel M. McDermott
Represented By
Leslie K. Berg (UST)
contact info
Jill M. Gies (UST)
contact info
U.S. Trustee
Andrew R. Vara
Represented By
Leslie K. Berg (UST)
contact info
Jill M. Gies (UST)
contact info


1. Lifestyle Lift Seeks Bankruptcy Protection (wsj.com)
Submitted Mon 03/30/2015
Docket last updated: 01/16/2025 9:44 PM EST
Friday, March 27, 2015
crditcrd none Fri 03/27 4:50 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 15-44839 [misc,volp11at] (1717.00) filing fee. Receipt number 24871069, amount . (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 13 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Fri 03/27 4:48 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Fee Amount $1717 Filed by Lifestyle Lift Holding, Inc. Attorney Disclosure Statement due 04/10/2015. Schedules A-J due 04/10/2015. Statement of Financial Affairs due 04/10/2015. Summary of schedules due 04/10/2015. Incomplete Filings due by 04/10/2015. Chapter 11 Plan due by 07/27/2015. Disclosure Statement due by 07/27/2015.Appointment of health care ombudsman due by 04/27/2015 (Bigelman, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Bankruptcy Cover Sheet Fri 03/27 4:48 PM
Bankruptcy Petition Cover Sheet Filed by Debtor In Possession Lifestyle Lift Holding, Inc.. (Bigelman, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors Fri 03/27 4:49 PM
20 Largest Unsecured Creditors Filed by Debtor In Possession Lifestyle Lift Holding, Inc.. (Bigelman, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Statement of Corporate Ownership (debtor) or (motion) Fri 03/27 4:49 PM
Debtors Statement of Corporate Ownership Filed by Debtor In Possession Lifestyle Lift Holding, Inc.. (Bigelman, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Employ Fri 03/27 5:59 PM
Application to Employ Osipov Bigelman, P.C. as Counsel for the Debtor Filed by Debtor In Possession Lifestyle Lift Holding, Inc. (Blasses, William)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Statement Regarding Authority to Sign and File Petition Fri 03/27 6:02 PM
Statement Regarding Authority to Sign and File Petition Filed by Debtor In Possession Lifestyle Lift Holding, Inc. Related [+]. (Bigelman, Jeffrey)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)