Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:15-bk-71074

New York Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Robert E Grossman
Case #: 8:17-ap-08056
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Mar 16, 2017
Terminated:Jun 28, 2019
Last checked: never
Defendant
FALAK LTC
Represented By
FALAK LTC
contact info
Plaintiff
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of FEGS
Represented By
Ilan D Scharf
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 1:08 PM EDT
Friday, June 28, 2019
court Close Adversary Case Fri 06/28 12:57 PM
Adversary Case 8:17-ap-8056 Closed (srm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 18, 2019
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Mailing with Application/Notice/Order Fri 04/19 12:19 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Application/Notice/Order Notice Date 04/18/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 16, 2019
14 14 order Judgment (Signed by Judge) (1/1/11) Tue 04/16 12:08 PM
Judgment is entered in favor of Plaintiff, Robert Michaelson, in hiscapacity as Trustee of the FEGS Creditor Trust of Federation Employment and GuidanceService, Inc. d/b/a FEGS against Defendant FALAK LTC in the amount of $57,454.00, plus post-judgment interestpursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1961(a), plus costs in the amount of $350.00 Related [+]. Signed on 4/16/2019 (amp)
Related: [-] 13 Order on Motion for Default Judgment
Thursday, March 14, 2019
13 13 order Default Judgment Thu 03/14 2:50 PM
Order Granting Motion For Default Judgment against FALAK LTC; the Plaintiff shall submit a proposed judgment against defendant FALAK in the amount of $57,4554.00 plus judgement interest from the date of entry of judgment at the federal judgment rate. Related [+] Signed on 3/14/2019. (amp)
Related: [-] 11
Monday, March 11, 2019
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held (Case Owned AP) Wed 03/13 2:14 PM
Hearing Held; Related [+] Appearance: Adam Berkowitz & IIan Scharf: Settled; default granted. (mtagle)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held (Document BK & AP) Wed 03/13 2:14 PM
Hearing Held; Related [+] Appearance: Adam Berkowitz & IIan Scharf: no objection; Motion Granted; submit order (mtagle)
Related: [-] 11 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Robert N. Michaelson, in his capacity as Creditor Trustee of the FEGS Creditor Trust
Thursday, March 07, 2019
12 12 misc Affidavit/Certificate of Service Thu 03/07 1:33 PM
Affidavit/Certificate of Service Filed by Jeffrey P Nolan on behalf of Robert N. Michaelson, in his capacity as Creditor Trustee of the FEGS Creditor Trust Related [+] (Nolan, Jeffrey)
Related: [-] 11 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff Robert N. Michaelson, in his capacity as Creditor Trustee of the FEGS Creditor Trust
Friday, February 15, 2019
11 11 motion Default Judgment Fri 02/15 7:28 PM
Motion for Default Judgment / Motion For Entry of a Clerk's Certificate of Default and For Entry of Default Judgment . Objections to be filed on 3/4/19. Filed by Jeffrey P Nolan on behalf of Robert N. Michaelson, in his capacity as Creditor Trustee of the FEGS Creditor Trust. Hearing scheduled for 3/11/2019 at 01:30 PM at Courtroom 860 (Judge Grossman), CI, NY. (Nolan, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Complaint
Att: 2 Exhibit B - USPS Receipt
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Supplemental Summons
Att: 4 Exhibit D - AOS re Supplemental Summons
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Pincus Affidavit
Att: 6 Exhibit F - Nolan Affidavit
Att: 7 Exhibit G - Proposed Order
Monday, January 28, 2019
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Case Owned AP) Tue 01/29 7:11 AM
Hearing Held and Adjourned; Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 03/11/2019 at 01:30 PM at Courtroom 860 (Judge Grossman), CI, NY. Appearance: Ilan Scharf; Default Noted (atenneriello)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (Auto)
Monday, December 17, 2018
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Case Owned AP) Fri 12/21 10:32 AM
Hearing Held and Adjourned; Related [+] Appearance: Adam Berkowitz: Pre-Trial Conference set for 01/28/2019 at 01:30 PM at Courtroom 860 (Judge Grossman), CI, NY. (mtagle)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference
Monday, November 05, 2018
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Case Owned AP) Fri 11/09 9:52 AM
Hearing Held and Adjourned; Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 12/17/2018 at 01:30 PM at Courtroom 860 (Judge Grossman), CI, NY. (Defualt Noted) (mtagle)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (Auto)
Monday, April 09, 2018
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Case Owned AP) Fri 04/13 12:54 PM
Hearing Held and Adjourned; Related [+] Appearance: Ilan D Scharf : Pre-Trial Conference set for 11/05/2018 at 01:30 PM at Courtroom 860 (Judge Grossman), CI, NY. (mtagle)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference
Tuesday, April 03, 2018
10 10 misc Statement Tue 04/03 1:46 PM
Statement / Notice of Plaintiff Name Change Filed by Ilan D Scharf on behalf of Robert N. Michaelson, in his capacity as Creditor Trustee of the FEGS Creditor Trust (Scharf, Ilan)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 29, 2018
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Case Owned AP) Thu 02/01 12:11 PM
Hearing Held and Adjourned; Related [+] Appearance: Melanie FitzGeerald, Iian Scharf, Andrew Beatty and on phone: Jeffrey Nolan, Mark Moore, Robin Spigel, Gregg Iiardi, Grayson Walter, Camille Bent, Matthew Heimann, Max Schlan & Lori Lapin Jones Pre-Trial Conference set for 04/09/2018 at 01:30 PM at Courtroom 860 (Judge Grossman), CI, NY. (Default Noted) (mtagle)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference
Monday, December 11, 2017
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Adjourned Without Hearing (Case Owned AP) Mon 12/18 3:08 PM
Adjourned Without Hearing Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 01/29/2018 at 01:30 PM at Courtroom 860 (Judge Grossman), CI, NY. (mtagle)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (Auto)
Tuesday, November 07, 2017
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Case Owned AP) Tue 11/07 2:29 PM
Hearing Held and Adjourned; Related [+] Appearance: Burton Weston, Iian Scharf, Stan Yang, David Cheifetz, James Bernard and on phone: Louisa Soulard, Mark Salzbert, Carrie Hardman, Jeffrey Nolan, Matthew Heimann, Robin Spigel, Eric Haber & Yenisey Rodriguez-McCloskey: Pre-Trial Conference set for 12/11/2017 at 01:30 PM at Courtroom 860 (Judge Grossman), CI, NY. (mtagle)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference
Tuesday, September 26, 2017
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Case Owned AP) Thu 10/05 3:50 PM
Hearing Held and Adjourned; Related [+] Appearance: Burton Weston, Iian Scharf, Mark Samuels, Stan Yang, Veronique Ann-Urban, Michael Levin, on phone: Carrie Hardman, Latonica Williams, Robin Spigel, Eric Haber, Jeff Nolan, Camille Bent, Matthew Heimann, Grayson Walter & Yenisey Rodriguez-McCloskey: Pre-Trial Conference set for 11/07/2017 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 860 (Judge Grossman), CI, NY. (mtagle)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference
Tuesday, August 01, 2017
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Adjourned Without Hearing (Case Owned AP) Tue 08/01 3:24 PM
Adjourned Without Hearing Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 09/26/2017 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 860 (Judge Grossman), CI, NY. (cmoffett)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (Auto)
Friday, July 14, 2017
9 9 misc Letter of Adjournment - (Do not use to adjourn 341 meetings) Fri 07/14 3:08 PM
Letter of Adjournment: Hearing rescheduled from July 6, 2017 at 10:00 a.m. to August 1, 2017 at 10:00 a.m. Filed by Ilan D Scharf on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of FEGS (Scharf, Ilan)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Affidavit/Certificate of Service Fri 07/14 1:45 PM
Affidavit/Certificate of Service Filed by Ilan D Scharf on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of FEGS Related [+] (Scharf, Ilan)
Related: [-] 6 Alias/Supplemental Summons Issued (Auto)
Thursday, July 13, 2017
7 7 misc Letter of Adjournment - (Do not use to adjourn 341 meetings) Thu 07/13 4:16 PM
Letter of Adjournment: Hearing rescheduled from July 6, 2017 at 10:00 a.m. to September 12, 2017 at 10:00 a.m. Filed by Ilan D Scharf on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of FEGS (Scharf, Ilan)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 07, 2017
6 6 court Alias/Supplemental Summons Issued (Auto) Fri 07/07 10:35 AM
Alias/Supplemental Summons Issued by Clerk's Office against FALAK LTC Answer Due 8/7/2017. Adjourned Pre-Trial Conference set for 9/12/2017 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 860 (Judge Grossman), CI, NY. (dhc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 06, 2017
5 5 misc Letter Thu 07/06 7:13 PM
Letter Requesting Alias Summons Filed by Ilan D Scharf on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of FEGS Related [+] (Scharf, Ilan)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (Auto)
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Case Owned AP) Fri 07/07 11:14 AM
Hearing Held and Adjourned; Related [+] Appearance: Ilan D Scharf: Pre-Trial Conference set for 08/01/2017 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 860 (Judge Grossman), CI, NY. (mtagle)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference
Tuesday, April 25, 2017
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Adjourned Without Hearing (Case Owned AP) Thu 04/27 2:37 PM
Adjourned Without Hearing Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 07/06/2017 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 860 (Judge Grossman), CI, NY. (mtagle)
Related: [-] 2 Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference
Friday, April 21, 2017
4 4 misc Letter of Adjournment - (Do not use to adjourn 341 meetings) Fri 04/21 1:32 PM
Letter of Adjournment: Hearing rescheduled from April 24, 2017 at 1:30 p.m. or April 25, 2017 at 10:00 a.m. to July 6, 2017 at 10:00 a.m. Filed by Ilan D Scharf on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of FEGS Related [+]. (Scharf, Ilan)
Related: [-] 2
Tuesday, March 28, 2017
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 03/28 4:29 PM
Summons Served on FALAK LTC 3/24/2017 . (Scharf, Ilan)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 17, 2017
2 2 cmp Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference (Auto) Fri 03/17 3:53 PM
Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office against FALAK LTC Answer Due: 4/17/2017 Pre-Trial Conference set for 4/25/2017 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 860 (Judge Grossman), CI, NY. (dnb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 16, 2017
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 03/16 5:54 PM
Adversary case 8 17-08056 Complaint by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of FEGS against FALAK LTC. Fee Amount $350. Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)). (Scharf, Ilan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Adversary Cover Sheet