New York Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Robert E Grossman
Case #: 8:15-bk-71074
Case Filed:Mar 18, 2015
Creditor Meeting:May 19, 2015
Claims Deadline:Oct 05, 2015
Plan Confirmed:Feb 06, 2018

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1,000-5,000
Est. Assets$100,000,001 to $500 million
Est. Liabilities $100,000,001 to $500 million
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Federation Employment and Guidance Service, Inc.
445 Oak Street
Copiague, NY 11726
Represented By
Adam T Berkowitz
Garfunkel Wild, P.C.
contact info
Garfunkel Wild, P.C.
contact info
Burton S Weston
Garfunkel, Wild, P.C.
contact info
Frank A Oswald
Togut Segal & Segal LLP
contact info
Togut Segal & Segal LLP
One Penn Plaza
contact info
Last checked: Friday Jan 18, 2019 1:03 PM EST
Accountant
Crowe Horwath LLP
488 Madison Avenue Floor 3
New York, NY 10022
Represented By
Burton S Weston
Garfunkel, Wild, P.C.
contact info
Attorney
Garfunkel Wild, P.C.
111 Great Neck Road 6th Floor
Great Neck, NY 11021
Represented By
Burton S Weston
Garfunkel, Wild, P.C.
contact info
Attorney
Togut, Segal & Segal LLP
Represented By
Frank A Oswald
Togut Segal & Segal LLP
contact info
Broker
Citi Habitats
250 Park Avenue S. 12th Floor
New York, NY 10003
Claimant
SILVIA TUTHILL
Represented By
Mark J Goldsmith
Jakubowski Roberston & Goldsmith LLP
contact info
Claims Agent
Rust
Claims Agent
Rust Consulting/Omni Bankruptcy
Represented By
Adam T Berkowitz
Garfunkel Wild, P.C.
contact info
Burton S Weston
Garfunkel, Wild, P.C.
contact info
Cred Committee Aty
Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors, Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP
780 Third Ave
34th Fl, NY 10017
Represented By
Ilan D Scharf
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP
contact info
Robert J Feinstein
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP
contact info
Cred Committee Aty
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP
Creditor
125 West 96th Street Owners Corporation
Represented By
Jonathan L Flaxer
Golenbock Eiseman Assor Bell & Peskoe
contact info
Creditor
14-26 Broadway Terrace Associates LLC
Platzer, Swergold, et al. 475 Park Avenue South, 18th Fl.
New York, NY 10016
Represented By
Henry G Swergold
Platzer Swergold Karlin Levin Et Al
contact info
Creditor
147 Corp.
Represented By
Edward J LoBello
Meyer Suozzi English & Klein, P.C.
contact info
Creditor
2075-2081 Wallace Avenue Owners Corp.
600 Old Country Road Suite 410
Garden City, NY 11530
Represented By
Stuart P Gelberg
contact info
Creditor
3480-3496 Broadway Associates, LLC
369 Lexington Avenue 12th Floor
New York, NY 10017
Represented By
Eric C Zabicki
Pick & Zabicki LLP
contact info
Creditor
3636 Greystone Owners, Inc.
733 Yonkers Ave. Ste. 200
Yonkers, NY 10704
Represented By
Domenick J Tammaro
Smith Buss & Jacobs LLP
contact info
Mitchell A. Dix
Mitchell A. Dix & Associates
contact info
Creditor
6787 Realty Inc.
270 Madison Avenue, 5th Floor
New York, NY 10016
Represented By
S Stewart Smith
Belkin Burden Wenig & Goldman LLP
contact info
Creditor
Angel Acevedo
Represented By
Edward A Smith
Smith, Buss & Jacobs LLP
contact info
Creditor
Raphael Acosta
105-15 217th Street 5C
Queens, NY 11428
Creditor
Tangee Afflic-Young
30 Richman Plaza
Bronx, NY 10453
Creditor
Elizabeth Agosto
2985 Perry Avenue #1
Bronx, NY 10458
Creditor
Dora Akhazeta
1251 Hancock Street
Brooklyn, NY 11221
Creditor
American Express Travel Related Services Company Inc
POB 3001
Malvern, PA 19355
Represented By
Gilbert B Weisman
Becket & Lee
contact info
Creditor
American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc.
PO Box 3001
Malvern, PA 19355
Creditor
Andrews International, Inc.
Represented By
Michael J Levin
Hinshaw & Culbertson, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Jose Aponte
280 Suydan Street
Brooklyn, NY 11237
Creditor
Asm Capital V, l.p.
7600 Jericho Turnpike, Suite 302
Woodbury, NY 11797
Creditor
Lisa Houston Assent
544 Central Avenue Apartment 3
Brooklyn, NY 11221
Creditor
Claremont Bailey
100 Eardman Place
Bronx, NY 10475
Creditor
Steven Bailey
421 Penn Avenue
Brooklyn, NY 11207
Creditor
Banc of America Leasing & Capital, LLC
Represented By
Marie Polito Hofsdal
Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker
contact info
Daniel F Flores
Wilson Elser Moskowitz Et Al
contact info
Creditor
Mary Barfield
Edelman, Krasin & Jaye, PLLC 7001 Brush Hollow Road, Suite 100
Westbury, NY 11590
Represented By
Kara M Rosen
Edelman, Krasin & Jaye, PLLC
contact info
Creditor
Samuel Blanchett
108-112 West 124th Street
New York, NY 10027
Creditor
Jacqueline Bourdeau
2415 New Kirk Avenue Apartment 3H
Brooklyn, NY 11226
Creditor
Hughvette Brockington
230 W 131 Street # 6E
New York, NY 10027
Creditor
Venessa Brockman
1060 Beach Avenue 7G
Bronx, NY 10472
Creditor
Mary Brown
46 Park Lane
Medford, NY 11763
Creditor
Shanta Brown
1291-5 sheridan Avenue Apartment 4B
Bronx, NY 10456
Creditor
Robin Burnett
76 New Broadway
Sleepy Hollow, NY 10591
Creditor
Rick Bush
1400 Bergen Street Apt. 1E
Brooklyn, NY 11213
Represented By
Ryan Lawlor
Law Offices Of Micahel S Lamonsoff
contact info
Creditor
CIT Technology Financing Services, Inc.
One CIT Drive
Livingston, NJ 07039
Represented By
Lisa S Bonsall
Mccarter & English LLP
contact info
Matthew B Heimann
Mccarter & English, LLP
contact info
Creditor
CRG Financial LLC
100 Union Avenue Suite 240
Cresskill, NJ 07626
Creditor
Claudine Callum
925 Waring Ave #4 E
Bronx, NY 10469
Creditor
Veronica Camejo
535 Jackson Avenue #13A
Bronx, NY 10455
Creditor
Jody Ann Campbell
2924 Tiemann Avenue Apt 1B
Bronx, NY 10469
Creditor
Jordan Campbell
1409 Crotona Avenue
Bronx, NY 10456
Creditor
Marlene K Cardenas
377 N Broadway Apt 614
Yonkers, NY 10701
Creditor
Leslie Cesareo
114 Lawron Street
Yonkers, NY 10705
Creditor
Renise Charles
582 East 28th Street #2
Brooklyn, NY 11210
Creditor
Robin Clauberg
373 a Montauk Hwy
East Moriches, NY 11940
Creditor
Consolidated Edison Company of New York, Inc.
4 Irving Place
New York, NY 10003
Represented By
Rosalie G Zuckerman
Consolidated Edison Company Of New York
contact info
Creditor
Alberta Cosgrove
20 W 129th Street Apartment 1D
New York, NY 10027
Creditor
Melinda Cox
376 E 94th Street Apt A-10
Brooklyn, NY 11212
Creditor
Virginia G. Cruickshank
225 West 106th Street Apt. 7M
New York, NY 10025
Represented By
James H Shenwick
Shenwick & Associates
contact info
Creditor
Hyacinth Cummings
1155 E 80th Street
Brooklyn, NY 11236
Creditor
D.L. Peterson Trust
Represented By
Constantine D Pourakis
Stevens & Lee, P.C.
contact info
Camille C. Bent
Baker & Hostetler LLP
contact info
Creditor
Winsome Daley
2935 Fenton Avenue
Bronx, NY 10469
Creditor
Shalita Davis
5429 Kings Highway #A4
Brooklyn, NY 11203
Creditor
Dwight Dawson
426 E 115 Street # 1A
New York, NY 10029
Creditor
Orlando Diaz
155 Hart Street Apartment 3
Brooklyn, NY 11206
Creditor
Donna J Dillon
710 E 237th Street
Bronx, NY 10466
Creditor
Donskoi Realty, LLC
Represented By
Lewis W Siegel
contact info
Creditor
Frauline Douglas
891 Linden Blvd
Brooklyn, NY 11203
Creditor
Jean Edwards
110-14 Astoria Blvd Apartment 6D
Corona, NY 11369
Creditor
Element Vehicle Management Services, LLC f/k/a PHH Vehicle Management Services, LLC
Represented By
Constantine D Pourakis
Stevens & Lee, P.C.
contact info
Camille C. Bent
Baker & Hostetler LLP
contact info
Creditor
Executive Cleaning Services, LLC
Represented By
Denis J Kiely
Kiely LLP
contact info
Creditor
Fair Harbor Capital, LLC
PO Box 237037
New York, NY 10023
Creditor
Frances Farooq
540 West 159th Street # 1A
New York, NY 10032
Creditor
Marva K Felton-Brewster
2260 Crotona Avenue # 6L
Bronx, NY 10457
Creditor
Angela Fenton
98-25 Horace Harding Espressway Apt 9N
Corona, NY 11368
Creditor
Jessie Fernandez
1249 Clay Avenue Apartment 1-C
Bronx, NY 10456
Creditor
Fiorencio Fiores
2401 31st Street #2 H
Astoria, NY 11102
Creditor
Eeugene Fitzgerald
450 Hoyt Avenue
Staten Island, NY 10301
Creditor
Denika Fleming
24 Longworth Street
Newark, NJ 07102
Creditor
Benjamin Flores
177 Frontman Street Apt 1L
Brooklyn, NY 11206
Creditor
Fort I Group LP
Represented By
Dean Dreiblatt
Rose And Rose
contact info
Creditor
Fort II Group LP
Represented By
Dean Dreiblatt
Rose And Rose
contact info
Creditor
Fort IV Group LP
Represented By
Dean Dreiblatt
Rose And Rose
contact info
Creditor
Francisca Miranda, as Guardian for Luis Miranda, an incapacitated person
Represented By
Robert R. Arena
contact info
Creditor
Pema Gashon
3520 Leverich Street Apartment B224
Jackson Heights, NY 11372
Creditor
Diane Giordano
Citywide Care Coordination Program 232 Bruckner Avenue
Staten Island, NY 10303
Creditor
Adolfo A Gonzalez
1904 Vyse Avenue Apartment 2D
Bronx, NY 10460
Creditor
Robert Grant
2274 University Avenue
Bronx, NY 10457
Creditor
Deborah Green
755 White Plains Road # 15K
Bronx, NY 10473
Creditor
Mary Greene
1833 Amsterdam Avenue
New York, NY 10031
Creditor
Yessenia Hernandez
2357 Davidson Avenue Apt #3A
Bronx, NY 10468
Creditor
Shavonda Hickman
912 Courtlandt Avenue Apt 4E
Bronx, NY 10451
Creditor
JDJ Propoerties, LLC
Represented By
Gerard R Luckman
Forchelli Deegan Terrana LLP
contact info
Creditor
JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By
Joaquin C. De Baca
Mayer Brown LLP
contact info
Creditor
Mary Jackson
736 Willoughby Avenue 3F
Brooklyn, NY 11206
Creditor
Darryl Johnson
1700 Grand Concourse
Bronx, NY 10457
Creditor
Clarence Jones
1596 Bedford Avenue Apt. 2B
Brooklyn, NY 11225
Represented By
Ryan Lawlor
Law Offices Of Micahel S Lamonsoff
contact info
Creditor
Shalaine Jones
2284 Grand Avenue Apt 1D
Bronx, NY 10468
Creditor
Violet Joseph
2545 Grand Concourse
Bronx, NY 10468
Creditor
Dawn Joyner
2071 5th Avenue # 38
New York, NY 10035
Creditor
Ryszard Kata
56-56 61st Street
Maspeth, NY 11378
Creditor
Rosemary Kulp
21-40 Steinway Street 2nd Floor
Astoria, NY 11105
Creditor
Laurdes Laracuente
2175 Cedar Aveneu Apartment 2N
Bronx, NY 10468
Creditor
Carolina Hermida Lerebours
807 Riverside Drive Apt 4G
New York, NY 10032
Creditor
Loeb & Troper LLP
Represented By
Mark G Ledwin
Wilson Elser Moskowitz Et Al
contact info
Creditor
Timothy Lott
750 Faile Street #94
Bronx, NY 10474
Creditor
Gizella Luquis
114 Lawton Street 3 Floor
Yonkers, NY 10705
Creditor
Gail Magaliff
Represented By
Geri S. Krauss
Krauss PLLC
contact info
Creditor
Estella Mahadeo
380 E 161 Street apartment 2
Bronx, NY 10451
Creditor
Serena Mathews
2100 Tremont Avenue # 422
Bronx, NY 10457
Creditor
Elizabeth McMaker
180 Riverside Drive
New York, NY 10024
Creditor
Isabel Medina
PO Box 294
Bronx, NY 10458
Creditor
Regina Mercado
1020 Soundview Avenue #4G
Bronx, NY 10472
Creditor
Marie J Michaud
962 Kings Parkway
Baldwin, NY 11510
Creditor
Mitchell/Martin, Inc.
Represented By
Yenisey Rodriguez-McCloskey
contact info
Creditor
Jane Muchuku
PO Box 1115 Riverdale Avenue
Bronx, NY 10471
Creditor
New York State Dept. of Labor
120 Broadway, 26th Floor
New York, NY 10271
Represented By
Claude Michael Higgins
Office Of The Attorney Gerneral State Of
contact info
Creditor
Martin Nunez
835 Rivirside Drive Bsmt
New York, NY 10032
Creditor
Mary Owens
Represented By
Kieran J Conlon
Ryan & Conlon LLP
contact info
Creditor
Oxford Health Insurance, Inc.
One Constitution Plaza
Hartford, CT 06103
Represented By
Eric S. Goldstein
Shipman & Goodwin LLP
contact info
Creditor
Paymentech, LLC
14221 Dallas Pkwy Bldg II
Dallas, TX 75254
Creditor
Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation
Represented By
Colin B. Albaugh
Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation
contact info
Louisa A Fennell
Pension Benefit Guaranty Corp
contact info
Creditor
Agustus Placeres
1212 Grand Concourse Apt 1J
Bronx, NY 10456
Creditor
Alma Pryce
27 Sedgwick Avenue
Yonkers, NY 10705
Creditor
RA 6900 Jericho Turnpike LLC
Represented By
William P Caffrey, Jr
contact info
Creditor
Simone Richardson
105-19 Avenue K
Brooklyn, NY 11236
Creditor
Raquel Rijos
3195 Decatur Avenue Apt BB
Bronx, NY 10467
Creditor
Sherry Riley
3555 Bevona Street
Bronx, NY 10475
Creditor
Jennifer Rivera
26 Post Street #4C
Yonkers, NY 10705
Creditor
Riverside 1795 Associates, LLC
369 Lexington Avenue 12th Floor
New York, NY 10017
Represented By
Eric C Zabicki
Pick & Zabicki LLP
contact info
Creditor
Linda Robinson
563 W 150 Street #5A
New York, NY 10031
Creditor
Naquan Ross
40 Putnam Ave. Apt 5H
Brooklyn, NY 11238
Creditor
Gina Ruisi
Represented By
Richard F Artura
Phillips, Artura & Cox
contact info
Creditor
Joseph Ruisi
Represented By
Richard F Artura
Phillips, Artura & Cox
contact info
Creditor
Sean Sagles
270 1st Avenue Apt #10E
NY, NY 10009
Creditor
Donna Sayers
160 West 97 Street # 14 A
New York, NY 10025
Creditor
Beverly Slade
420 Kingsborough 4th Wk Apt 2C
Brooklyn, NY 11233
Creditor
Donna Smith
2095 Creston Avenue Apt 5K
Bronx, NY 10453
Creditor
Cynthia Tait
432 Crown Street
Brooklyn, NY 11225
Creditor
Claudia Tambone
616 Park Avenue
Yonkers, NY 10703
Creditor
Ana Terc
1075 Gerard Avenue 123B
Bronx, NY 10452
Creditor
The Bank of New York Mellon
120 Broadway 32nd Floor
New York, NY 10271
Represented By
Thomas A Pitta
Emmet Marvin & Martin LLP
contact info
Creditor
The Dormitory Authority of the State of New York
Squire Patton Boggs (US) LLP 30 Rockefellar Plaza
New York, NY 10112
Represented By
Stephen D Lerner
contact info
Mark A Salzberg
Squire Patton Boggs (us) LLP
contact info
Kristin E Richner
Squire Sanders LLP
contact info
Creditor
Alkia S Thompson
1295 Fifth Avenue Apartment 7D
New York, NY 10029
Creditor
Ursula Torres
1965 Lafayette Ave Apt 8K
Bronx, NY 10473
Creditor
Holly Tortora
514 Durham Road
Sayville, NY 11782
Creditor
Town of Islip Community Development Agency
267 Carleton Ave, Suite 301
Central Islip, NY 11722
Represented By
Jarrett M Behar
Sinnreich Kosakoff & Messina, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Glenn A Turnbull
852 East 46th Street
Brooklyn, NY 11203
Creditor
US Foods, Inc.
Represented By
Thomas J Schell
Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP
contact info
Creditor
Nijer Vanderhorst
426 Lenox Avenue Apt # 2
New York, NY 10037
Creditor
Gisela Vasquez
140 Casals Place #32J
Bronx, NY 10475
Creditor
Alicia A Vaughans
156 Richmond Street
Brooklyn, NY 11208
Creditor
Ahmodu Wasiu
1006 E 58th Street #1
Brooklyn, NY 11234
Creditor
Zina Watkins
3438 Fenton Avenue #1C
Bronx, NY 10469
Creditor
Anthia White
140 W174th St
Bronx, NY 10453
Creditor
Carmen Williams
12 Pulaski Street #3C
Brooklyn, NY 11206
Creditor
Lynette Williams
Creditor
Maranda Williams
39 Ocean Ave 5E
Brooklyn, NY 11225
Creditor Committee
Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors
Represented By
Ilan D Scharf
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP
contact info
Robert J Feinstein
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP
contact info
Jeffrey P Nolan
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP
contact info
Financial Advisor
Alvarez & Marsal Healthcare Industry Group LLC
600 Lexington Avenue 6th Floor
New York, NY 10022
Represented By
Ilan D Scharf
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP
contact info
Interested Party
1199SEIU United Healthcare Workers East
310 West 43rd Street
New York, NY 10036
Represented By
Laureve D Blackstone
Levy Ratner PC
contact info
Suzanne Hepner
Levy Ratner PC
contact info
Ryan J Barbur
Levy Ratner, P.C
contact info
Interested Party
845 Schenectady Avenue LLC
Joseph J. Haspel PLLC 1 West Main Street
Goshen, NY 10924
Represented By
Joseph J Haspel
contact info
Interested Party
ALLSector Technology Group, Inc.
Represented By
Arnold Mitchell Greene
Robinson Brog Leinwand Greene Et Al
contact info
Interested Party
Erick Aldea
3050 Perry Avenue Apartment 2A
Bronx, NY 10467
Represented By
Dominic T D'Ascoli
Reisman Kupferberg & Bernstein LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Sonia Allen
Interested Party
Altmark Group
360 Lexington Avenue, Suite 1200
New York, NY 10017
Represented By
Jerold C Feuerstein
Kriss & Feuerstein LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Wisseh Benedict
Interested Party
Citizens Options Unlimited, Inc.
Represented By
Jonathan Mark Agudelo
Kaye Scholer LLP
contact info
Interested Party
City of New York
100 Church Street
New York, NY 10007
Represented By
Zachary B Kass
New York City Law Department
contact info
Interested Party
Joey Delancey
Interested Party
FOJP Services Corporation
Represented By
Robin Spigel
Willkie Farr & Gallagher LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Harriet and Zachary Giozali
Attn. Leslie A. Berkoff 400 Garden City Plaza
Garden City, NY 11530
Represented By
Leslie A Berkoff
Moritt Hock & Hamroff LLP
contact info
Interested Party
HeartShare Human Services
Represented By
Jonathan Mark Agudelo
Kaye Scholer LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Human First, Inc.
Attn. Leslie A. Berkoff 400 Garden City Plaza
Garden City, NY 11530
Represented By
Leslie A Berkoff
Moritt Hock & Hamroff LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Interested Party
Represented By
Douglas J Pick
Pick & Zabicki LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Jewish Board of Family and Children's Services
Represented By
Jonathan Mark Agudelo
Kaye Scholer LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Shalaine Jones
2284 Grand Avenue Apt 1D
Bronx, NY 10468
Interested Party
Local 215, DC1707, AFSCME
Represented By
Christopher S Baluzy
Cary Kane LLP
contact info
Elizabeth Vladeck
contact info
Melissa Sy Chan
Cary Kane LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Ira Machowsky
Represented By
Shawn P. Naunton
Zuckerman Spaeder LLP
contact info
Interested Party
NYS Office for People With Developmental Disabilities
200 Park Avenue
New York, NY 10166
Represented By
David Neier
Winston & Strawn LLP
contact info
Carrie V Hardman
Winston & Strawn
contact info
Interested Party
NYS Office of Mental Health
200 Park Avenue
New York, NY 10166
Represented By
David Neier
Winston & Strawn LLP
contact info
Carrie V Hardman
Winston & Strawn
contact info
Interested Party
NYSARC, Inc (aka AHRC-Suffolk)
Moritt Hock & Hamroff LLP Attn. Leslie A. Berkoff 400 Garden City Plaza
Garden City, NY 11530
Represented By
Leslie A Berkoff
Moritt Hock & Hamroff LLP
contact info
Interested Party
New York Foundling Hospital
400 Garden City Plaza
Garden City, NY 11530
Represented By
Leslie A Berkoff
Moritt Hock & Hamroff LLP
contact info
Interested Party
New York State Industries for the Disabled
333 West Washington Street Suite 200
Syracuse, NY 13202
Represented By
Lee E Woodard
Harris Beach PLLC
contact info
Interested Party
Evette Perkins
Interested Party
Monic'ka Phillips
Interested Party
Kelsey Robbins
Interested Party
Kia Robinson
Interested Party
Gilbert Rosenberg
Interested Party
The Harry & Jeanette Weinberg Foundation, Inc.
Represented By
Jamila Willis
Dla Piper Llp (us)
contact info
Interested Party
Ultimate Psychological Consultation and Evaluation, P.C.
Represented By
Eric H Horn
Vogel Bach & Horn, LLP
contact info
Interested Party
United Cerebral Palsy of New York City, Inc.
Represented By
Jonathan Mark Agudelo
Kaye Scholer LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Alia Yasin
Intervenor
Carlyle Williamson
Represented By
Randall Hirsch
The Wiesner Law Firm
contact info
Other Prof.
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP
550 E Swedesford Rd. Suite 270
Wayne, PA 19087
Other Prof.
Navigant Consulting Inc.
Other Prof.
Robert N. Michaelson, in his capacity as Creditor Trustee of the FEGS Creditor Trust
Represented By
Ilan D Scharf
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP
contact info
Jeffrey P Nolan
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP
contact info
Other Prof.
Smith & Henzy Advisory Group, Inc.
1079 Mulberry Way
Boca Raton, FL 33428
Realtor
Cushman & Wakefield Realty of the Bronx LLC
Realtor
Kalmon Dolgin Affiliates, Inc
101 Richardson Street
Brooklyn, NY 11211
Spec. Counsel
Drinker Biddle
1177 Avenue of the Americas 41st Floor
New York, NY 10036
Spec. Counsel
Novick, Edelstein, Lubell, Reisman, Wasserman & Leventhal, P.C.
733 Yonkers Ave. #600
Yonkers, NY 10704
Spec. Counsel
Seyfarth Shaw LLP
620 8th Avenue #33
New York, NY 10018
Represented By
Burton S Weston
Garfunkel, Wild, P.C.
contact info
Spec. Counsel
Westerman Ball Ederer Miller Zucker & Sharfstein LLP
1201 RXR Plaza
Uniondale, NY 11556
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Long Island Federal Courthouse 560 Federal Plaza - Room 560
Central Islip, NY 11722
US Trustee Trial Attorney
Stan Y Yang
Office of the United States Trustee Central Islip Office Alfonse M D'Amato US Courthouse 560 Federal Plaza
Central Islip, NY 11722
TERMINATED PARTIES
Creditor
InterAgency Council of Developmental Disabilities Agencies, Inc.
Terminated: 01/06/2017
Attn: Stephen A. Donato, Esq. One Lincoln Center
Syracuse, NY 13202
Represented By
Stephen A Donato
Bond Schoeneck King PLLC
contact info
Interested Party
315 Hudson LLC
Terminated: 08/28/2015
Represented By
Gary L Kaplan
Fried Frank Shriver & Jacobson LLP
contact info


1. Bankruptcy filings detail FEGS descent (capitalnewyork.com)
Submitted Fri 03/20/2015
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
1349 1349 misc Letter of Adjournment - (Do not use to adjourn 341 meetings) Tue 04/29 1:01 PM
Letter of Adjournment: Hearing rescheduled from June 4, 2025 at 9:30 a.m. to June 9, 2025 at 9:30 a.m. Filed by Adam T Berkowitz on behalf of Federation Employment and Guidance Service, Inc. (Berkowitz, Adam)
Related: [-]
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Adjourned Without Hearing (Case Owned BK) Tue 04/29 1:04 PM
Adjourned Without Hearing - Status hearing to be held on 06/09/2025 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 860 (Judge Grossman), CI, NY. (amp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Adjourned Without Hearing (Case Owned BK) Wed 04/23 12:26 PM
Adjourned Without Hearing - Status hearing to be held on 06/04/2025 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 860 (Judge Grossman), CI, NY. (amp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
1348 1348 misc Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report Tue 04/22 1:08 PM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for the Quarter Ending: 03/31/2025 Filed by Burton S Weston on behalf of Federation Employment and Guidance Service, Inc. (Weston, Burton)
Related: [-]
1347 1347 misc Letter of Adjournment - (Do not use to adjourn 341 meetings) Tue 04/22 9:56 AM
Letter of Adjournment: Hearing rescheduled from April 23, 2025 at 9:30 a.m. to June 4, 2025 at 9:30 a.m. Filed by Adam T Berkowitz on behalf of Federation Employment and Guidance Service, Inc. (Berkowitz, Adam)
Related: [-]