National Credit Union Administ, et al v. U.S. Bank National Association, et al
Original Case: 1:14-cv-09928
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:17-cv-00756 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange |
Case Filed: | Mar 16, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 02, 2018 |
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 07, 2018 4:36 AM EDT |
Defendant
NCUA Guaranteed Notes Trust 2010-R1
|
|
Defendant
NCUA Guaranteed Notes Trust 2010-R2
|
|
Defendant
NCUA Guaranteed Notes Trust 2010-R3
|
|
Defendant
NCUA Guaranteed Notes Trust 2011-R1
|
|
Defendant
NCUA Guaranteed Notes Trust 2011-R2
|
|
Defendant
NCUA Guaranteed Notes Trust 2011-R3
|
|
Defendant
NCUA Guaranteed Notes Trust 2011-R4
|
|
Defendant
NCUA Guaranteed Notes Trust 2011-R5
|
|
Defendant
NCUA Guaranteed Notes Trust 2011-R6
|
|
Defendant
NCUA Guaranteed Notes Trust 2011-M1
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
U.S. Bank National Association
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Bank of America, National Association
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
National Credit Union Administration Board, as Liquidating Agent of U.S. Central Federal Credit Union, Western Corporate Federal Credit Union, Members United Corporate Federal Credit Union, Southwest Corporate Federal Credit Union, and Constitution Corpora
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
National Credit Union Administration Board, on Behalf of the NGN Trusts
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Graeme W. Bush, as Separate Trustee
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Aug 02 2018
OPINION, affirming the district court's judgment, by JAC, SLC, V. CAPRONI, FILED.[2357642] [17-756] |
Docket last updated: 08/07/2018 4:34 AM EDT |