National Credit Union Administration Board v. U.S. Bank National Association et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Paul A Engelmayer |
Case #: | 1:14-cv-09928 |
Nature of Suit | 850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange |
Cause | 15:77 Securities Fraud |
Case Filed: | Dec 16, 2014 |
Terminated: | Feb 14, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Jun 14, 2015 8:48 AM EDT |
Defendant
Bank of America
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
National Association
|
|
Defendant
U.S. Bank National Association
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
National Credit Union Administration Board
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
National Credit Union Administration Board on Behalf of the NGN Trusts
1775 Duke Street
Alexandria, VA 22314 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/29/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, August 23, 2018 | ||
197 | 197
appeal
USCA Mandate
Thu 08/23 2:15 PM
MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to189 Amended Notice of Appeal, filed by Graeme W. Bush, as Separate Trustee, National Credit Union Administration Board, National Credit Union Administration Board on Behalf of the NGN Trusts,186 Notice of Appeal, filed by Graeme W. Bush, as Separate Trustee, National Credit Union Administration Board, National Credit Union Administration Board on Behalf of the NGN Trusts,190 Amended Notice of Appeal, filed by NCUA GUARANTEED NOTES TRUST 2011-M1, NCUA GUARANTEED NOTES TRUST 2010-R3, NCUA GUARANTEED NOTES TRUST 2011-R2, NCUA GUARANTEED NOTES TRUST 2011-R6, NCUA GUARANTEED NOTES TRUST 2010-R2, NCUA GUARANTEED NOTES TRUST 2010-R1, National Credit Union Administration Board on Behalf of the NGN Trusts, Graeme W. Bush, as Separate Trustee, NCUA GUARANTEED NOTES TRUST 2011-R5, National Credit Union Administration Board, NCUA GUARANTEED NOTES TRUST 2011-R3, NCUA GUARANTEED NOTES TRUST 2011-R4, NCUA GUARANTEED NOTES TRUST 2011-R1 USCA Case Number 17-0756 Upon consideration thereof, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that the judgment of the district court is AFFIRMED. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 8/23/2018. (tp) |
|
appeal
Transmission of USCA Mandate/Order to District Judge
Thu 08/23 2:16 PM
Transmission of USCA Mandate/Order to the District Judge re:197 USCA Mandate. (tp) |