Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 6:16-bk-10759

Kansas Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Dale L Somers
Case #: 6:17-ap-05044
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Mar 20, 2017
Terminated:Feb 11, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
Westco International, Inc.
6924 E Reading Place
Tulsa, OK 74115
Represented By
Westco International, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Carl B. Davis
Davis & Jack, L.L.C. 2121 W Maple PO Box 12686
Wichita, KS 67277
Represented By
Kenneth H. Jack
Davis & Jack LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/22/2025 1:07 PM CDT
Thursday, October 14, 2021
court Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC auto) Thu 10/14 9:45 PM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Complaint. Receipt number 147203, Fee Amount $350.00. (adiuser)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2020
court Close Adversary Case Tue 02/11 3:23 PM
Adversary Case 6:17-ap-5044 Closed . (waa)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 22, 2018
39 39 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Wed 08/22 11:55 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 08/22/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 38 Judgment
Monday, August 20, 2018
38 38 order Judgment Mon 08/20 4:09 PM
Judgment On The Trustee's KAAPA Preference Claim Signed on 8/20/2018 (waa)
Related: [-]
Saturday, August 18, 2018
37 37 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 08/18 11:50 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 08/18/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 35 Order on Motion For Summary Judgment
Thursday, August 16, 2018
36 36 24 pgs order Opinion Thu 08/16 3:14 PM
Order Designated as Opinion Signed on 8/16/2018 - Memorandum Decision And Order Granting The Motion Of The KAAPA Defendants For Summary Judgment (waa)
Related: [-]
35 35 order Summary Judgment Thu 08/16 3:13 PM
Memorandum Decision And Order Granting The Motion Of The KAAPA Defendants For Summary Judgment Related [+] Signed on 8/16/2018. (waa)
Related: [-] 17
Wednesday, May 23, 2018
34 34 notice Service Wed 05/23 12:01 PM
Notice of Service of Supplemental Brief of KAAPA Defendants in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment Based on New Value Defense, with Certificate of Service. Filed by Defendant Westco International, Inc. . (Gilman, W.)
Related: [-]
33 33 misc Brief Wed 05/23 11:54 AM
Supplemental ReplyBrief, with Certificate of Service. (of KAAPA Defendants) Filed by W. Thomas Gilman on behalf of Westco International, Inc. Related [+] (Gilman, W.)
Related: [-] 31 Supplemental Support Brief, with Certificate of Service. On New Value Defense Filed by W. Thomas Gilman on behalf of Westco International, Inc. (RE: related document(s)29 Order Requesting Additional Briefs On The Motion Of KAAPA Defendants For Summary Judgment 17 Motion For Summary Judgment And Brief In Support By KAAPA Defendants Filed by Defendant Westco International, Inc. (Gilman, W.) filed by Defendant Westco International, Inc. Signed on 3/14/2018 (waa)) (Gilman, W.), 32 Opposition Brief, with Certificate of Service. (Response to Defendants' Supplemental Brief on New Value) Filed by Kenneth H. Jack on behalf of Carl B. Davis (RE: related document(s)31 Supplemental Support Brief, with Certificate of Service.On New Value Defense Filed by W. Thomas Gilman on behalf of Westco International, Inc. (RE: related document(s)29 Order Requesting Additional Briefs On The Motion Of KAAPA Defendants For Summary Judgment 17 Motion For Summary Judgment And Brief In Support By KAAPA Defendants Filed by Defendant Westco International, Inc. (Gilman, W.) filed by Defendant Westco International, Inc. Signed on 3/14/2018 (waa)) (Gilman, W.))
Wednesday, May 16, 2018
32 32 misc Brief Wed 05/16 4:15 PM
Opposition Brief, with Certificate of Service. Related [+] Filed by Kenneth H. Jack on behalf of Carl B. Davis (Jack, Kenneth)
Related: [-] sponse to Defendants' Supplemental Brief on New Value 31 Supplemental Support Brief, with Certificate of Service. On New Value Defense Filed by W. Thomas Gilman on behalf of Westco International, Inc. (RE: related document(s)29 Order Requesting Additional Briefs On The Motion Of KAAPA Defendants For Summary Judgment 17 Motion For Summary Judgment And Brief In Support By KAAPA Defendants Filed by Defendant Westco International, Inc. (Gilman, W.) filed by Defendant Westco International, Inc. Signed on 3/14/2018 (waa)) (Gilman, W.)
Tuesday, April 17, 2018
31 31 misc Brief Tue 04/17 10:22 AM
Supplemental Support Brief, with Certificate of Service. On New Value Defense Filed by W. Thomas Gilman on behalf of Westco International, Inc. Related [+] (Gilman, W.)
Related: [-] 29 Order Requesting Additional Briefs On The Motion Of KAAPA Defendants For Summary Judgment 17 Motion For Summary Judgment And Brief In Support By KAAPA Defendants Filed by Defendant Westco International, Inc. (Gilman, W.) filed by Defendant Westco International, Inc. Signed on 3/14/2018 (waa)
Friday, March 16, 2018
30 30 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 03/16 11:54 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 03/16/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 29 Order (Generic)
Wednesday, March 14, 2018
29 29 order Generic Wed 03/14 10:48 AM
Order Requesting Additional Briefs On The Motion Of KAAPA Defendants For Summary Judgment 17 Motion For Summary Judgment And Brief In Support By KAAPA Defendants Filed by Defendant Westco International, Inc. (Gilman, W.) filed by Defendant Westco International, Inc. Signed on 3/14/2018 (waa)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 02, 2018
28 28 notice Service Tue 01/02 4:31 PM
Notice of Service of Reply Brief, with Certificate of Service. Filed by Defendant Westco International, Inc. . (Gilman, W.)
Related: [-]
27 27 answer Reply Tue 01/02 4:16 PM
Reply to Related [+] In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment of KAAPA Defendants Filed by Defendant Westco International, Inc. (Gilman, W.)
Related: [-] 26 Response filed by Plaintiff Carl B. Davis
Thursday, December 21, 2017
26 26 answer Response Thu 12/21 1:09 PM
Opposition Response to Related [+] Filed by Plaintiff Carl B. Davis (Jack, Kenneth)
Related: [-] 17 Motion For Summary Judgment And Brief In Support By KAAPA Defendants filed by Defendant Westco International, Inc.
Att: 1 Appendix
Att: 2 Appendix
Wednesday, December 13, 2017
25 25 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Wed 12/13 11:54 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 12/13/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 24 Order on Motion to Extend/Shorten Time
Sunday, December 10, 2017
24 24 order Extend/Shorten Time Sun 12/10 4:18 PM
Order Granting Motion to Extend/Shorten Time Related [+] Signed on 12/10/2017. (wmd)
Related: [-] 23
Friday, December 08, 2017
23 23 motion Extend/Shorten Time Fri 12/08 2:48 PM
Second Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Motion of KAAPA Defendants for Summary Judgment Filed by Plaintiff Carl B. Davis (Jack, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 29, 2017
22 22 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Wed 11/29 11:53 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 11/29/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 21 Order on Motion to Extend/Shorten Time
Thursday, November 23, 2017
21 21 order Extend/Shorten Time Fri 11/24 8:40 PM
Order Granting Motion to Extend/Shorten Time Related [+] Signed on 11/23/2017. (wmd)
Related: [-] 20
Wednesday, November 22, 2017
20 20 motion Extend/Shorten Time Wed 11/22 1:06 PM
Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Motion of KAAPA Defendants for Summary Judgment Filed by Plaintiff Carl B. Davis (Jack, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 02, 2017
19 19 misc Certificate of Service Thu 11/02 2:26 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] and Appendix (Dkt 19) Filed by W. Thomas Gilman on behalf of Westco International, Inc. (Gilman, W.)
Related: [-] 17 Motion For Summary Judgment And Brief In Support By KAAPA Defendants filed by Defendant Westco International, Inc. 17 Motion For Summary Judgment And Brief In Support By KAAPA Defendants Filed by Defendant Westco International, Inc. (Gilman, W.)
18 18 misc Support Document Thu 11/02 2:25 PM
Document filed in support of : Motion For Summary Judgment And Brief In Support By KAAPA Defendants with Certificate of Service on 11/2/2017. APPENDIX Filed by W. Thomas Gilman on behalf of Westco International, Inc. Related [+] (Gilman, W.)
Related: [-] 17 Motion For Summary Judgment And Brief In Support By KAAPA Defendants Filed by Defendant Westco International, Inc. (Gilman, W.)
Att: 1 Appendix Exhibits 1 through 3-2
Att: 2 Appendix Exhibits 4 and 5
Att: 3 Appendix Exhibit 6
Att: 4 Appendix Exhibit 7 - Part 1
Att: 5 Appendix Exhibit 7 - Part 2
Att: 6 Appendix Exhibit 7 - Part 3
Att: 7 Appendix Exhibit 7 - Part 4
Att: 8 Appendix Exhibit 7 - Part 5
Att: 9 Appendix Exhibit 7 - Part 6
17 17 motion Summary Judgment Thu 11/02 2:22 PM
Motion For Summary Judgment And Brief In Support By KAAPA Defendants Filed by Defendant Westco International, Inc. (Gilman, W.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 06, 2017
16 16 order Scheduling Order Wed 09/06 10:59 AM
Agreed Modified Scheduling Order Signed on 9/6/2017 (wed)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 25, 2017
15 15 notice Service Tue 07/25 2:36 PM
Notice of Service of Trustee's Supplemental Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures, with Certificate of Service. Filed by Plaintiff Carl B. Davis . (Jack, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 01, 2017
14 14 notice Service Thu 06/01 2:49 PM
Notice of Service of Defendant's Rule 26(a)(1) and Rule 7026 Disclosures, with Certificate of Service. Filed by Defendant Westco International, Inc. . (Gilman, W.)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Generic Notice Thu 06/01 2:48 PM
Notice of Change of Firm Address. Filed by Defendant Westco International, Inc. . (Gilman, W.)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Service Thu 06/01 1:56 PM
Notice of Service of Trustee's Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures, with Certificate of Service. Filed by Plaintiff Carl B. Davis . (Jack, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 18, 2017
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 05/18 11:51 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 05/18/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Order Adopting Report of Parties Planning Meeting
Tuesday, May 16, 2017
10 10 order Order Adopting Report of Parties Planning Meeting Tue 05/16 11:37 AM
Order Adopting Report of Parties Planning Meeting Signed on 5/16/2017 Status hearing to be held on 11/21/2017 at 10:15 AM at Wichita Room 228. (wed)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 15, 2017
9 9 misc Report of Parties Planning Meeting Mon 05/15 9:13 AM
Report of Parties Planning Meeting Filed by W. Thomas Gilman on behalf of Westco International, Inc. . (Gilman, W.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 13, 2017
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Thu 04/13 11:56 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 04/13/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Notice of Hearing
Tuesday, April 11, 2017
7 7 notice Hearing Tue 04/11 9:49 AM
Notice of Hearing Filed by USBC. . (wed)
Related: [-]
court Hearing Set (Other) Tue 04/11 9:50 AM
Hearing Set Related [+]. Pre-Trial Scheduling Conference set for 5/23/2017 at 10:15 AM at Wichita Room 228. (wed)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 17-05044 Complaint by Kenneth H. Jack on behalf of Carl B. Davis against Westco International, Inc.. Receipt Number Deferred, Fee Amount $350 Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (Attachments: # 1 Adversary Cover Sheet) filed by Plaintiff Carl B. Davis
Monday, April 10, 2017
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 04/10 2:45 PM
Answer to Complaint with Certificate of Service Filed by Westco International, Inc. Related [+]. (Gilman, W.)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 17-05044 Complaint by Kenneth H. Jack on behalf of Carl B. Davis against Westco International, Inc.. Receipt Number Deferred, Fee Amount $350 Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (Attachments: # 1 Adversary Cover Sheet) filed by Plaintiff Carl B. Davis
5 5 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Mon 04/10 2:45 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by W. Thomas Gilman with Certificate of Service Filed by W. Thomas Gilman on behalf of Westco International, Inc. . (Gilman, W.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 21, 2017
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 03/21 2:54 PM
Summons Service Executed on Westco International, Inc. 3/21/2017 (Jack, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
3 3 court Summons Issued Tue 03/21 10:35 AM
Summons Issued on Westco International, Inc. Date Issued 3/21/2017, Answer Due 4/20/2017 . (wed)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 20, 2017
2 2 cmp Summons Request Mon 03/20 1:53 PM
Request for Issuance of Summons(es) by Kenneth H. Jack on behalf of Carl B. Davis - summons(es) requested on Westco International, Inc. (Jack, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 03/20 1:50 PM
Adversary case 17-05044 Complaint by Kenneth H. Jack on behalf of Carl B. Davis against Westco International, Inc.. Receipt Number Deferred, Fee Amount $350 Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (Jack, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Adversary Cover Sheet