Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:15-bk-44839

Michigan Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Maria L Oxholm
Case #: 2:17-ap-04234
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Mar 23, 2017
Terminated:May 10, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
Fisher & Associates, P.C. a/k/a Bennett G. Fisher, P.C.
Represented By
Fisher & Associates, P.C. a/k/a Bennett G. Fisher, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Basil T. Simon
Represented By
Stephen P. Stella
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:07 PM EDT
Tuesday, March 12, 2019
37 37 notice Req to be Removed from Receiving Electronic Filings in a Case Tue 03/12 3:57 PM
Request to be Removed from Receiving Notices of Electronic Filings in a Adversary Case for Defendant Fisher & Associates, P.C.. (Egan, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 22, 2018
court Minute Entry Tue 05/22 8:44 AM
Minute Entry. Trial not held. Case closed. Related [+] (jmurp)
Related: [-] 33 Notice of Adjourned Hearing (AP)
Thursday, May 10, 2018
36 36 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (sorder) Thu 05/10 12:22 PM
ORDER FOR DISMISSAL Related [+]. (Mum, J)
Related: [-] #35 Statement of Consent to Entry of Order for Dismissal
35 35 motion Stipulated Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Thu 05/10 11:53 AM
Stipulated Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding By and Between Stephen P. Stella, Dennis K. Egan . Filed by Plaintiff Basil T. Simon. (Stella, Stephen)
Related: [-]
utility Disposition of Adversary Thu 05/10 12:22 PM
Disposition of Adversary 2:17-ap-4234 : Dismissed by Stipulation. (Mum, J)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Thu 05/10 12:23 PM
Adversary Case 2:17-ap-4234 Closed. (Mum, J)
Related: [-]
court Minute Entry Thu 05/10 1:17 PM
Minute Entry. Final Pre-Trial Conference not held. The adversary case was dismissed and closed. Related [+] (jmurp)
Related: [-] 32 Notice of Adjourned Hearing (AP)
Friday, April 20, 2018
34 34 court Copy of Mon 04/23 8:51 AM
Copy of: Order Authorizing Chapter 7 Trustee To Enter Into Settlement Agreement And Compromise Claim Against Fisher & Associates, P.C. a/k/a Bennett G. Fisher, P.C. (entered in debtor's bankruptcy). (Mum, J)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 10, 2018
court Minute Entry Tue 04/10 8:43 AM
Minute Entry. Trial not held. Adjourned to 5/22/18 at 10:00 a.m. Related [+] (jmurp)
Related: [-] 23 Scheduling Order
Thursday, March 29, 2018
court Minute Entry. Hearing Adjourned (AP) Thu 03/29 3:24 PM
Minute Entry. Hearing Adjourned. Related [+] Final Pre-Trial Conference scheduled for 05/10/2018 at 02:00PM at Courtroom 1975. (csiku)
Related: [-] 23 Scheduling Order
Monday, March 26, 2018
33 33 court Notice of Adjourned Hearing (AP) Mon 03/26 1:39 PM
Notice of Adjourned Trial. Trial date set for 5/22/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 1825. (csiku)
Related: [-]
32 32 court Notice of Adjourned Hearing (AP) Mon 03/26 1:35 PM
Notice of Adjourned Final Pretrial Conference. Final Pre-Trial Conference scheduled for 5/10/2018 at 02:00PM at Courtroom 1975. (csiku)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 31, 2017
31 31 misc Certificate of Service Tue 10/31 12:08 PM
Corrected Certificate of Service re: Defendant's Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's Request for Production of Documents Filed by Defendant Fisher & Associates, P.C. Related [+]. (Egan, Dennis)
Related: [-] 29 Deficiency Notice
30 30 misc Certificate of Service Tue 10/31 12:06 PM
Corrected Certificate of Service re: Defendant's Objections and Responses to Plaintiff's Requests for Admission Filed by Defendant Fisher & Associates, P.C. Related [+]. (Egan, Dennis)
Related: [-] 29 Deficiency Notice
Monday, October 30, 2017
29 29 court Deficiency Notice (AP) Mon 10/30 2:42 PM
Notice of Deficient Pleading: Proof of Service is Non-Compliant. (See ECF Procedure 12(h) Certificate of Service) Related [+] Proof of Service Due on 11/6/2017. (csiku)
Related: [-] 27 Objection filed by Defendant Fisher & Associates, P.C.,28 Objection filed by Defendant Fisher & Associates, P.C.
Friday, October 27, 2017
28 28 misc Objection - Other than motions Fri 10/27 8:30 AM
Objection and Responses to Plaintiff's Request for Production of Documents Filed by Defendant Fisher & Associates, P.C. Related [+]. (Egan, Dennis)
Related: [-] 25 Interrogatories
27 27 misc Objection - Other than motions Fri 10/27 8:29 AM
Objection and Responses to Plaintiff's Requests for Admission Filed by Defendant Fisher & Associates, P.C. Related [+]. (Egan, Dennis)
Related: [-] 25 Interrogatories
Monday, September 18, 2017
26 26 misc Initial Disclosure Parties Rule 26(a)(1) Mon 09/18 12:16 PM
Initial Disclosure Parties Rule 26(a)(1), Filed by Defendant Fisher & Associates, P.C. Related [+]. (Egan, Dennis)
Related: [-] 20 Notice of Initial Scheduling Conference.
Friday, September 15, 2017
25 25 misc Interrogatories Fri 09/15 10:16 AM
Interrogatories Plaintiff's First Set Of Interrogatories, Requests For Admissions And Requests For Production Of Documents To Fisher & Associates, P.C. a/k/a Bennett G. Fisher, P.C. Filed by Plaintiff Basil T. Simon. (Stella, Stephen)
Related: [-]
24 24 misc Initial Disclosure Parties Rule 26(a)(1) Fri 09/15 9:54 AM
Plaintiff's Initial Disclosure Parties Rule 26(a)(1), Filed by Plaintiff Basil T. Simon. (Stella, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 05, 2017
23 23 order Scheduling Order Tue 09/05 11:08 AM
ADVERSARY PROCEEDING SCHEDULING ORDER - Final Pretrial Conference scheduled for 03/29/2018 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom 1975; Trial date set for 04/10/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 1825. (Mum, J)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 31, 2017
22 22 audio . Thu 08/31 5:05 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 8/31/2017 2:01:39 PM ]. File Size [ 520 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:02:10 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
court Minute Entry. Initial Scheduling Conference Held Thu 08/31 2:26 PM
Minute Entry. Initial Scheduling Conference Held. Final Pre-Trial Conference to be scheduled for 3/29/2018 at 2:00 PM. Trial to be scheduled for 4/10/2018 at 10:00 AM. Scheduling Order to follow. Related [+] (csiku)
Related: [-] 20 Notice of Initial Scheduling Conference.
Monday, August 28, 2017
21 21 misc Report of Parties Rule 26(f) Conference Mon 08/28 10:03 AM
Report of Parties' Rule 26(f) Conference Filed by Plaintiff Basil T. Simon. (Stella, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 21, 2017
20 20 court Notice of Initial Scheduling Conference Fri 07/21 8:10 AM
Notice of Initial Scheduling Conference - Initial Scheduling Conference to be held on 08/31/2017 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom 1975. (Mum, J)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 17, 2017
19 19 misc Statement of Corporate Ownership Mon 07/17 5:01 PM
Corrected Statement of Corporate Ownership Filed by Defendant Fisher & Associates, P.C. Related [+]. (Egan, Dennis)
Related: [-] 17 Deficiency Notice
18 18 misc Certificate of Service Mon 07/17 4:54 PM
Corrected Certificate of Service re: Answer to Complaint Filed by Defendant Fisher & Associates, P.C. Related [+]. (Egan, Dennis)
Related: [-] 17 Deficiency Notice
17 17 court Deficiency Notice (AP) Mon 07/17 8:28 AM
Notice of Deficient Pleading: Proof of Service Non-Compliant, and Statement of Corporate Ownership Missing Related [+] - Defendant's Corrected Proof of Service, and Statement of Corporate Ownership, due on 07/24/2017. (Mum, J)
Related: [-] No.16 Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant Fisher & Associates, P.C.
Friday, July 14, 2017
16 16 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 07/14 9:55 AM
Answer to Complaint w/Certificate of Service Filed by Fisher & Associates, P.C.. (Egan, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 13, 2017
15 15 order Extend Thu 07/13 2:23 PM
Order Setting Aside Entry Of Default And Extending Time For Defendant To Answer The Complaint - Extended to 07/14/2017 Related [+]. (Mum, J)
Related: [-] Dkt. No.13 Motion filed by Defendant
Tuesday, July 11, 2017
14 14 misc Certification of Non-Response Tue 07/11 4:20 PM
Certification of Non-Response Filed by Defendant Fisher & Associates, P.C. Related [+]. (Egan, Dennis)
Related: [-] 13 Amended Motion to Vacate/Set Aside (related documents10 Clerk's Entry of Default) , Amended Motion to Extend Re: Time for Defendant to Answer Complaint; Extend To July 14, 2017 w/Exhibits 1 through 6
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, June 22, 2017
13 13 motion Extend Thu 06/22 1:02 PM
Amended Motion to Vacate/Set Aside Related [+] , in addition to Amended Motion to Extend Re: Time for Defendant to Answer Complaint; Extend To July 14, 2017 w/Exhibits 1 through 6 Filed by Defendant Fisher & Associates, P.C. (Egan, Dennis)
Related: [-] 10 Clerk's Entry of Default
Wednesday, June 14, 2017
12 12 motion Extend Wed 06/14 1:41 PM
Motion to Vacate/Set Aside Related [+] Entry of Default , in addition to Motion to Extend Re: Time for Defendant to Answer the Complaint; Extend To June 21,2017 Filed by Defendant Fisher & Associates, P.C. (Egan, Dennis)
Related: [-] 10 Clerk's Entry of Default
11 11 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 06/14 1:27 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice w/Certificate of Service Filed by Defendant Fisher & Associates, P.C.. (Egan, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 07, 2017
10 10 court Clerk's Entry of Default Wed 06/07 8:46 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default of Fisher & Associates, P.C. - Default Judgment Motion due by 06/21/2017. (Mum, J)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 23, 2017
9 9 order File Paper Documents Tue 05/23 4:14 PM
Order Denying Fisher & Associates, P.C.'s Motion To File By Paper Filing And An Order Granting An Extension To File An Answer To The Complaint - Extended to 06/06/2017 Related [+]. (Mum, J)
Related: [-] Dkt. No.8
8 8 motion File Paper Documents Tue 05/23 11:55 AM
Ex-Parte Motion to File Paper Documents Filed by Defendant Fisher & Associates, P.C. (Mum, J)
Related: [-]
court Certificate of Mailing (generic virtual) Tue 05/23 4:23 PM
Certificate of Mailing: A Copy of this Related Document was Mailed on 5/23/2017 by the United States Postal Service to the non-ECF Participant, Bennett G. Fisher, at His Respective Address Appearing in the Records of the Court, Fisher & Associates, 55 Waugh Drive, Suite 603, Houston, Texas 77007. Related [+] (csiku)
Related: [-] 9 Order Denying Fisher & Associates, P.C.'s Motion to File By Paper Filing And An Order Granting An Extension To File An Answer To The Complaint
Sunday, May 14, 2017
7 7 order stipulated order Mon 05/15 10:11 AM
Order Setting Aside Default And Extending Time For Defendant To Answer The Complaint To 5/23/17. Related [+]. (kcm)
Related: [-] 4 Clerk's Entry of Default,6 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff Basil T. Simon
Thursday, May 11, 2017
6 6 misc Stipulation Thu 05/11 12:03 PM
Stipulation By and Between Stephen P. Stella, Sean Kozar-King Re: Setting Aside Default and Extending Time For Defendant To Answer The Complaint . Filed by Plaintiff Basil T. Simon. (Stella, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Sunday, April 30, 2017
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Mon 05/01 12:52 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 04/30/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4 Clerk's Entry of Default
Friday, April 28, 2017
4 4 court Clerk's Entry of Default Fri 04/28 3:26 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default of Fisher & Associates, P.C. - Default Judgment Motion due by 5/12/2017. (kcm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 29, 2017
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 03/29 12:10 PM
Summons Service Executed on Fisher & Associates, P.C. 3/28/2017 (Stella, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 23, 2017
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Thu 03/23 11:09 AM
Summons Issued on Fisher & Associates, P.C. a/k/a Bennett G. Fisher, P.C. Answer Due 04/24/2017 (Stella, Stephen)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 03/23 11:09 AM
Adversary case 17-04234 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)): Complaint by Basil T. Simon against Fisher & Associates, P.C. a/k/a Bennett G. Fisher, P.C.. Receipt Number DEFERRED, Fee Amount of $ 350 is Deferred. (Stella, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Transfers