Original Case: 2:16-cv-02794

Fourth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:17-cv.pr-01367
Typecivil private / private
Nature of Suit950 Other Statutes - Constitutionality of State Statutes
Case Filed:Mar 23, 2017
Terminated:Mar 15, 2018
Last checked: Friday Mar 16, 2018 4:37 AM EDT
Defendant - Appellee
W. H. (SKIP) HOLBROOK, Department of in his official capacity as the Chief of the Police Department of the City of Columbia, SC; on behalf of himself and others similarly situated
Represented By
William Michael Hemlepp Jr.
OFFICE OF THE CITY ATTORNEY
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
MICHAEL HANSHAW, in his official capacity as Interim Chief of the Police Department of the City of Simpsonville, SC; on behalf of himself and others similarly situated
Represented By
Kevin Desmond Maroney
OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF SOUTH CAROLINA
contact info
Robert D. Cook
OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF SOUTH CAROLINA
contact info
James Emory Smith Jr.
OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF SOUTH CAROLINA
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
W. H. (SKIP) HOLBROOK, in his official capacity as the Chief of the Police Department of the City of Columbia, SC; on behalf of himself and others similarly situated
Represented By
William Michael Hemlepp Jr.
OFFICE OF THE CITY ATTORNEY
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
A. KEITH MORTON, in his official capacity as the Chief of the Police Department of the City of Fountain Inn, SC; on behalf of himself and others similarly situated
Represented By
Kevin Desmond Maroney
OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF SOUTH CAROLINA
contact info
Robert D. Cook
OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF SOUTH CAROLINA
contact info
James Emory Smith Jr.
OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF SOUTH CAROLINA
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
DAN REYNOLDS, in his official capacity as the Chief of the Police Department of the City of Greer, SC; on behalf of himself and others similarly situated
Defendant - Appellee
M. BRYAN TURNER, in his official capacity as the Chief of the Police Department of the City of Mauldin, SC; on behalf of himself and others similarly situated
Represented By
Kevin Desmond Maroney
OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF SOUTH CAROLINA
contact info
Robert D. Cook
OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF SOUTH CAROLINA
contact info
James Emory Smith Jr.
OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF SOUTH CAROLINA
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
STEVE MOORE, in his official capacity as Interim Chief of the Police Department of the City of Simpsonville, SC; on behalf of himself and others similarly situated
Represented By
James Emory Smith Jr.
OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF SOUTH CAROLINA
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
LANCE CROWE, in his official capacity as the Chief of the Police Department of the City of Travelers Rest, SC; on behalf of himself and others similarly situated
Represented By
Kevin Desmond Maroney
OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF SOUTH CAROLINA
contact info
Robert D. Cook
OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF SOUTH CAROLINA
contact info
James Emory Smith Jr.
OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF SOUTH CAROLINA
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
KEN MILLER, in his official capacity as the Chief of the Police Department of the City of Greenville, SC; on behalf of himself and others similarly situated
Represented By
Michael Stuart Pitts
COLLINS & LACY
contact info
Robert Patrick Coler
CITY OF GREENVILLE
contact info
Logan McCombs Wells
CITY ATTORNEY'S OFFICE
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
STEVE LOFTIS, in his official capacity as the Sheriff of Greenville County, SC; on behalf of himself and others similarly situated
Represented By
Anne Ross Culbreath
WILLSON JONES CARTER & BAXLEY, P.A.
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
LEON LOTT, in his official capacity as the Sheriff of Richland County, SC; on behalf of himself and others similarly situated
Represented By
Steven R. Spreeuwers
DAVIDSON & LINDEMANN, PA
contact info
Robert David Garfield
DAVIDSON & LINDEMANN, PA
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
CARL RITCHIE, in his official capacity as the Chief of the Police Department of the City of Mt. Pleasant, SC; on behalf of himself and others similarly situated
Represented By
Andrew Lindemann
DAVIDSON & LINDEMANN, PA
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
EDDIE DRIGGERS, JR., in his official capacity as the Chief of the Police Department of the City of North Charleston, SC; on behalf of himself and others similarly situated
Represented By
Robin Lilley Jackson
SENN LEGAL, LLC
contact info
Sandra J. Senn
SENN LEGAL, LLC
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
GREGORY G. MULLEN, in his official capacity as the Chief of the Police Department of the City of Charleston, SC; on behalf of himself and others similarly situated
Represented By
Robin Lilley Jackson
SENN LEGAL, LLC
contact info
Sandra J. Senn
SENN LEGAL, LLC
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
J. ALTON CANNON, JR., in his official capacity as the Sheriff of Charleston County, SC; on behalf of himself and others similarly situated
Represented By
Robin Lilley Jackson
SENN LEGAL, LLC
contact info
Sandra J. Senn
SENN LEGAL, LLC
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
ALAN WILSON, in his official capacity as Attorney General of South Carolina, on behalf of himself and others similarly situated
Represented By
Kevin Desmond Maroney
OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF SOUTH CAROLINA
contact info
Robert D. Cook
OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF SOUTH CAROLINA
contact info
James Emory Smith Jr.
OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL OF SOUTH CAROLINA
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
NIYA KENNY, on behalf of herself and all others similarly situated
Represented By
Lenora Lapidus
AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION
contact info
Dennis David Parker
AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION
contact info
Sarah Hinger
AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION
contact info
Susan King Dunn
ACLU OF SOUTH CAROLINA
contact info
Galen Leigh Sherwin
AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
S. P., by and through her next of kin Melissa Downs, on behalf of herself and all others similarly situated
Represented By
Lenora Lapidus
AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION
contact info
Dennis David Parker
AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION
contact info
Sarah Hinger
AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION
contact info
Susan King Dunn
ACLU OF SOUTH CAROLINA
contact info
Galen Leigh Sherwin
AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
D. S., by and through her next of kin Juanita Ford, on behalf of herself and all others similarly situated
Represented By
Lenora Lapidus
AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION
contact info
Dennis David Parker
AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION
contact info
Sarah Hinger
AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION
contact info
Susan King Dunn
ACLU OF SOUTH CAROLINA
contact info
Galen Leigh Sherwin
AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
D.S., by and through her next of kin Juanita Ford, on behalf of herself and all others similarly situated
Represented By
Lenora Lapidus
AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION
contact info
Dennis D. Parker
AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION
contact info
Sarah Hinger
AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION
contact info
Susan King Dunn
ACLU OF SOUTH CAROLINA
contact info
Galen Leigh Sherwin
AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
S.P., by and through her next of kin Melissa Downs, on behalf of herself and all others similarly situated
Represented By
Lenora Lapidus
AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION
contact info
Dennis D. Parker
AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION
contact info
Sarah Hinger
AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION
contact info
Susan King Dunn
ACLU OF SOUTH CAROLINA
contact info
Galen Leigh Sherwin
AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
GIRLS ROCK CHARLESTON, INCORPORATED, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated
Represented By
Lenora Lapidus
AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION
contact info
Dennis David Parker
AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION
contact info
Sarah Hinger
AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION
contact info
Susan King Dunn
ACLU OF SOUTH CAROLINA
contact info
Galen Leigh Sherwin
AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
TAUREAN NESMITH, on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated
Represented By
Lenora Lapidus
AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION
contact info
Dennis David Parker
AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION
contact info
Sarah Hinger
AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION
contact info
Susan King Dunn
ACLU OF SOUTH CAROLINA
contact info
Galen Leigh Sherwin
AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION
contact info

GPO Mar 15 2018
PUBLISHED AUTHORED OPINION filed. Originating case number: 2:16-cv-02794-CWH. [1000258551]. [17-1367]

Docket last updated: 03/16/2018 4:31 AM EDT
Thursday, March 23, 2017
1 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 2:16-cv-02794-CWH. Case manager: AshleyWebb. 17-1367 AB [Entered: 03/23/2017 11:52 AM]
Related: [-]
2 2 DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1] Case Initial forms due within 14 days. Originating case number: 2:16-cv-02794-CWH. Mailed to: William Michael Hemlepp Jr. Dennis David Parker Galen Leigh Sherwin. 17-1367 AB [Entered: 03/23/2017 12:06 PM]
Related: [-]