South Carolina District Court
Judge:David C Norton
Case #: 2:16-cv-02794
Nature of Suit950 Other Statutes - Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Aug 11, 2016
Re-opened:Apr 06, 2018
Terminated:Oct 13, 2021
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 07, 2017 4:25 AM EST
Amicus
United States
Represented By
Robert M Sneed
Us Attorneys Office (cola)
contact info
Defendant
J Alton Cannon, Jr
Represented By
Sandra Jane Senn
Senn Legal
contact info
Defendant
Alan Wilson
Represented By
James Emory Smith, Jr
Sc Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Defendant
M Bryan Turner
Represented By
James Emory Smith, Jr
Sc Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Carl Ritchie
Represented By
Andrew F Lindemann
Davidson Morrison And Lindemann
contact info
Defendant
Dan Reynolds
Defendant
Gregory G Mullen
Represented By
Sandra Jane Senn
Senn Legal
contact info
Defendant
A Keith Morton
Represented By
James Emory Smith, Jr
Sc Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Steve Moore
Represented By
James Emory Smith, Jr
Sc Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Ken Miller
Represented By
Logan McCombs Wells
City Of Greenville
contact info
Robert P Coler
City Of Greenville
contact info
James Emory Smith, Jr
Sc Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Michael Stuart Pitts
Collins And Lacy (gvl)
contact info
Defendant
Leon Lott
Represented By
Robert David Garfield
Davidson Morrison And Lindemann
contact info
Steven Richard Spreeuwers
Davidson And Lindemann
contact info
Defendant
Steve Loftis
Represented By
Anne R Culbreath
Willson Jones Carter And Baxley
contact info
Defendant
W H Holbrook
Represented By
William Michael Hemlepp, Jr
City Of Columbia Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Eddie Driggers , Jr
Represented By
Sandra Jane Senn
Senn Legal
contact info
Defendant
Lance Crowe
Represented By
James Emory Smith, Jr
Sc Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Niya Kenny
Represented By
Susan King Dunn
Aclu Sc National Office
contact info
Galen Leigh Sherwin
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
contact info
Lenora Michelle Lapidus
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
contact info
Sarah Ann Hinger
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
contact info
Dennis David Parker
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
contact info
Plaintiff
Taurean Nesmith
Represented By
Susan King Dunn
Aclu Sc National Office
contact info
Galen Leigh Sherwin
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
contact info
Lenora Michelle Lapidus
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
contact info
Sarah Ann Hinger
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
contact info
Dennis David Parker
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
contact info
Plaintiff
Girls Rock Charleston Inc
Represented By
Susan King Dunn
Aclu Sc National Office
contact info
Galen Leigh Sherwin
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
contact info
Lenora Michelle Lapidus
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
contact info
Sarah Ann Hinger
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
contact info
Dennis David Parker
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
contact info
Plaintiff
SP
Represented By
Susan King Dunn
Aclu Sc National Office
contact info
Galen Leigh Sherwin
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
contact info
Lenora Michelle Lapidus
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
contact info
Sarah Ann Hinger
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
contact info
Dennis David Parker
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
contact info
Plaintiff
DS
Represented By
Susan King Dunn
Aclu Sc National Office
contact info
Galen Leigh Sherwin
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
contact info
Lenora Michelle Lapidus
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
contact info
Sarah Ann Hinger
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
contact info
Dennis David Parker
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Friday, December 01, 2023
278 278 misc Satisfaction of Judgment Fri 12/01 9:29 AM
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT re276 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees by Alan Wilson.(Smith, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Addendum Satisfaction of Judgment