Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:15-bk-44839

Michigan Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Maria L Oxholm
Case #: 2:17-ap-04238
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Mar 23, 2017
Terminated:May 02, 2017
Last checked: never
Defendant
Trilogy Capital Corporation, a California corporation
Represented By
Trilogy Capital Corporation
contact info
Plaintiff
Basil T. Simon
Represented By
Stephen P. Stella
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:07 PM EDT
Thursday, May 04, 2017
8 8 misc Certificate of Service Thu 05/04 10:09 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Basil T. Simon Related [+]. (Stella, Stephen)
Related: [-] 7 Order on Motion for Default Judgment
Tuesday, May 02, 2017
7 7 order Default Judgment Tue 05/02 2:44 PM
DEFAULT JUDGMENT Related [+]. (Mum, J)
Related: [-] 6
6 6 motion Default Judgment Tue 05/02 11:51 AM
Motion for Default Judgment Filed by Plaintiff Basil T. Simon (Stella, Stephen)
Related: [-]
utility Disposition of Adversary Tue 05/02 2:44 PM
Disposition of Adversary 2:17-ap-4238 : Granted by Default Judgment. (Mum, J)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Tue 05/02 2:45 PM
Adversary Case 2:17-ap-4238 Closed. (Mum, J)
Related: [-]
Sunday, April 30, 2017
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Mon 05/01 12:52 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 04/30/2017. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4 Clerk's Entry of Default
Friday, April 28, 2017
4 4 court Clerk's Entry of Default Fri 04/28 1:52 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default of Trilogy Capital Corporation - Default Judgment Motion due by 5/12/2017. (kcm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 29, 2017
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 03/29 12:34 PM
Summons Service Executed on Trilogy Capital Corporation 3/28/2017 (Stella, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 23, 2017
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Thu 03/23 1:23 PM
Summons Issued on Trilogy Capital Corporation Answer Due 04/24/2017 (Stella, Stephen)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 03/23 1:23 PM
Adversary case 17-04238 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)): Complaint by Basil T. Simon against Trilogy Capital Corporation. Receipt Number deferred, Fee Amount of $ 350 is Deferred. (Stella, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Transfers